Black v. T-Mobile USA, Inc

Plaintiff: Jesse Black
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv04151
Filed: July 21, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Stipulation On Parties' Proposed Case Schedule. Close of Fact Discovery due by 8/1/2018; Designation of Experts due by 8/1/2018; Motions due by 8/10/2018; Replies due by 10/19/2018; Responses due by 9/24/2018; Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/12/2018; Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
November 16, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference.. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
October 11, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Joint Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
August 31, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation re Docket No. 15 Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. T-Mobile USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Black
Represented By: Arnab Banerjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc
Represented By: Sophia Behnia
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Represented By: Perry Kim Miska, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?