Lou v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Raymond W. Lou
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Chase Home Finance LLC, Summit Management Company, LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04157
Filed: July 21, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Mr. Lou shall respond to this order by filing an opposition to the Caliber Defendants' motion to dismiss by 5/18/2018. The case management conference currently set for May 29, 2018 is VACATED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/14/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
March 21, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/21/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
February 26, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CHASE'S 8 MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S 37 MOTION TO WITHDRAW by Judge William H. Orrick. Lou's complaint against Chase is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff counsel's motion to withdraw is granted conditionally in accordance with Civil L.R. 11-5(b). Papers may continue to be served on counsel for forwarding purposes unless and until the client appears by other counsel or pro se. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
January 30, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, as modified, 39 STIPULATION to continue CMC and deadline to respond. Motion Hearing as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss reset for 2/28/2018 02:00 PM. Case Management Conference continued to 4/24/2018 02:00 PM (Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2018). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/29/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lou v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond W. Lou
Represented By: Vartkes Artinian
Represented By: Jack Ter-Saakyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Russ M. Fukano
Represented By: Kenneth James MacArthur
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Management Company
Represented By: Russ M. Fukano
Represented By: Kenneth James MacArthur
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Russ M. Fukano
Represented By: Kenneth James MacArthur
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Russ M. Fukano
Represented By: Kenneth James MacArthur
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?