Rearden LLC et al v. Crystal Dynamics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rearden LLC and Rearden Mova LLC
Defendant: Crystal Dynamics, Inc. and Square Enix Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04187
Filed: July 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting 203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (rmilc1s, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Order Extending Time by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 195 Stipulation. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 186 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File Response to re 184 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Crystal Dynamics, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 8, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 176 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 136 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT SQUARE ENIX, INC. UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(2) filed by Rearden Mova LLC, Rearden LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 25, 2019. The 136 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS is terminated as moot. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 170 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Reply in Support of re 136 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT SQUARE ENIX, INC. UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(2), filed by Rearden Mova LLC, Rearden LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 20, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER EXTENDING TIME re 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulation and Proposed Order Granting Additional Time to File Declarations to Defendants' Administrative Motions to File Under Seal Dkts 120 & 141 filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 11, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 128 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Rearden Mova LLC, Rearden LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 6, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL re 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 128 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Rearden Mova LLC, Rearden LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 31, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 128 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Rearden Mova LLC, Rearden LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 24, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING PRODUCTION AND DESIGNATION OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Rearden Mova LLC, Rearden LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ADOPTING DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Rearden Mova LLC, Rearden LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 7, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 49 Amended Complaint, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline for Defendants to Answer First Amended Complaint filed by Crystal Dynamics, Inc., Square Enix Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 25, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56(D) by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Filing First Amended Complaint filed by Rearden Mova LLC, Rearden LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 8, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint) Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Hearing and Case Management Conference Scheduling filed by Rearden Mova LLC, Rearden LLC. Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rearden LLC et al v. Crystal Dynamics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rearden LLC
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Mark S Carlson
Represented By: Rio Shaye Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rearden Mova LLC
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Mark S Carlson
Represented By: Rio Shaye Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Dynamics, Inc.
Represented By: Karineh Khachatourian
Represented By: Daniel Todd McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square Enix Inc.
Represented By: Karineh Khachatourian
Represented By: Daniel Todd McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?