Salazar-Leyva v. Sessions et al

Petitioner: Christian Felipe Salazar-Leyva
Respondent: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, John F. Kelly, Thomas D. Homan, Matthew Albence and David W. Jennings
Case Number: 3:2017cv04213
Filed: July 24, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 to reset CMC. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/3/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
May 1, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 to reset CMC filed by Matthew Albence, Thomas D. Homan, John F. Kelly, Jefferson Sessions, David W. Jennings. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
March 6, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 to vacate case management conference filed by Matthew Albence, Thomas D. Homan, John F. Kelly, Jefferson Sessions, David W. Jennings. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/10/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
January 16, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ***Deadlines terminated. STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for Tuesday 3/6/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/16/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
December 19, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 40 to vacate case management conference filed by Matthew Albence, Thomas D. Homan, John F. Kelly, Jefferson Sessions, David W. Jennings Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/8/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
July 28, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 2 Petitioner's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar-Leyva v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christian Felipe Salazar-Leyva
Represented By: Barbara Plantiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Represented By: Hans H Chen
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John F. Kelly
Represented By: Hans H Chen
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas D. Homan
Represented By: Hans H Chen
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Represented By: Hans H Chen
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David W. Jennings
Represented By: Hans H Chen
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?