Symantec Corporation v. Zscaler, Inc.

Plaintiff: Symantec Corporation
Defendant: Zscaler, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04426
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Discovery Order re 262 , 274 Regarding Zscaler's Response to Symantec's Request for Production Nos. 68 and 77. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/29/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Discovery Order re: 262 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Zscaler's Response to Symantec's Request for Production Nos. 68 and 77. The parties shall meet and confer and thereafter file an updated joint letter brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/16/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING THE SCHEDULING ORDER re 252 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order Amending The Scheduling Order filed by Symantec Corporation. Fact discovery cut-off 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 224 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Request for Claim Construction Order filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 197 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 200 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Request for Order Continuing Markman Hearing and Case Management Conference Date) filed by Symantec Corporation. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2018 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Claim Construction Hearing set for 7/31/2018 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 1, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Discovery Order re Dkt. Nos. 165, 166, 174. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/18/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 149 Motion to Dismiss; granting 155 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 169 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Request for Order Extending the Deadline in Which to Hold ADR) filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Discovery Order re Dkt. Nos. 165 & 166. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/20/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending the Time in Which to Complete Claim Construction Discovery and Briefing filed by Zscaler, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 22, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Discovery Order re: Dkt. Nos. 125, 126, 127 and 128. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/9/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 133 Joint Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Zscaler's Motion to Stay; [Proposed] Order) filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 3, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 108 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Symantec Corporation filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symantec Corporation v. Zscaler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symantec Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rich Harrison
Represented By: Kurt Max Pankratz
Represented By: Harrison Gheens Rich
Represented By: Wayne O. Stacy
Represented By: Jennifer C Tempesta
Represented By: Jeremy Alexander Tigan
Represented By: Chad C Walters
Represented By: James Collin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zscaler, Inc.
Represented By: Bailey Wilson Heaps
Represented By: Corey Johanningmeier
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Neha Mehta
Represented By: Justina K Sessions
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Represented By: Matthew M. Werdegar
Represented By: Matthew Mickle Werdegar
Represented By: Grace Yang
Represented By: Grace Yu-Ting Yang
Represented By: Michelle Sabrina Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?