Stewart v. City of Oakland, et al

Plaintiff: Juleana Stewart
Defendant: City of Oakland, Sean Whent, Frank Morrow, Alameda County Sheriff's Department and Gregory J. Ahern
Case Number: 3:2017cv04478
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2018 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FRANK MORROW'S MOTION TO DISMISS; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The motion is granted with leave to amend. Stewart's Second Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than June 29, 2018. Morrow shall respond to any such Second Amended Complaint no later than July 20, 2018. A Further Case Management Conference is hereby set for October 12, 2018. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/25/18. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
April 18, 2018 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CITY OF OAKLAND AND SEAN WHENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 18, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 17, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING COUNTY OF ALAMEDA'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 17, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
February 21, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARING ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT FRANK MORROW SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 21, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
January 18, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT FRANK MORROW SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than February 16, 2018, why plaintiff's claims against Frank Morrow should not be dismissed for failure to serve within the time required by Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 18, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. City of Oakland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juleana Stewart
Represented By: David M. Helbraun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Whent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?