Blanchard et al v. Fluent, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mira Blanchard, Ryan Cooper, Mark Davis, Chandra Greenberg, James Jobe, Debra Kottong, Ogen Lama, Maria Marquez, Vanessa Powers and Gail Taylor
Defendant: Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA LLC, Rewardsflow LLC, American Prize Center LLC, Mohit Singla, Sauphtware, Inc., Adreaction, Anglo Iditech, Fortanalysis8 Develop, Concept Network, Diego Rufino, Priscila Arekelian and Andres Mary
Case Number: 3:2017cv04497
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SAUPHTWARE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS FURTHER LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Panda Mail's motion to dismiss is granted, and the SAC, to the extent alleged against Panda Mail, is dismissed with leave to amend. Should plaintiffs wish to file a TAC, plaintiffs shall file such pleading no later than December 22, 2017. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 15, 2017, to March 2, 2018, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management shall be filed no later than February 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
October 26, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM AGAINST NORTH ISLAND MARKETING CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Maine M. Chesney on October 26, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
September 22, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SAUGHTWARE INC. D/B/A PANDA MAIL'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CORRECT NAMES OF DOE DEFENDANTS; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS ' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Panda Mail's motion to dismiss is granted, and the FAC, to the extent alleged against Panda Mail, is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiffs' motion to correct the names of Doe defendants is denied wi thout prejudice. Plaintiffs' motion to substitute "Fluent LLC" for "Fluent Inc." is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend is denied without prejudice to the extent plaintiffs seek to add defendants, and in all o ther respects is granted. Should plaintiffs wish to file an SAC for purposes of amending their claim against Panda Mail and/or to make the other changes the Court has allowed, plaintiffs shall file such SAC no later than October 6, 2017. To the extent plaintiffs wish to add any new defendant(s), plaintiffs shall file a renewed motion for leave to amend. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
August 16, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchard et al v. Fluent, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mira Blanchard
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Cooper
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Davis
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Greenberg
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jobe
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kottong
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ogen Lama
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Marquez
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Powers
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Taylor
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluent, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Represented By: Justin Ananda Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reward Zone USA LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Represented By: Justin Ananda Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rewardsflow LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Represented By: Justin Ananda Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Prize Center LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Represented By: Justin Ananda Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohit Singla
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Represented By: Justin Ananda Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sauphtware, Inc.
Represented By: Damian M Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adreaction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo Iditech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortanalysis8 Develop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concept Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diego Rufino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscila Arekelian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Mary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?