Bakhtiar v. Information Resources, Inc.

Plaintiff: Iram Bakhtiar
Defendant: Information Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04559
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Rule 502(d) Order filed by Information Resources, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 12, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 7, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Production of Class List filed by Iram Bakhtiar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
February 22, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 24 Motion to Transfer Case. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
January 8, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Iram Bakhtiar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 8, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakhtiar v. Information Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iram Bakhtiar
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Schwartz
Represented By: Logan McMillan Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Information Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?