Sampath v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tina Sampath
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc. and Medivation, Inc. 2015 Severance Plan
Case Number: 3:2017cv04851
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 Protective Order filed by Tina Sampath. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/27/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 and 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Medivation, Inc. 2015 Severance Plan, Pfizer, Inc.. CMC reset for 3/15/18 at 9:30 a.m. instead of 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (16) Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, (26) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Pfizer, Inc.'s Counterclaims filed by Medivation, Inc. 2015 Severance Plan, Pfizer, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/16/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Pfizer, Inc.'s Counterclaims filed by Medivation, Inc. 2015 Severance Plan, Pfizer, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Responses due by 12/27/2017. Replies due by 1/10/2018. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS re 17 Stipulation filed by Tina Sampath. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/26/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampath v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha Newland Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medivation, Inc. 2015 Severance Plan
Represented By: Samantha Newland Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Sampath
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?