Falk et al v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michelle Falk, Indhu Jayavelu, Patricia L. Cruz, Danielle Trotter and Amanda Macri
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04871
Filed: August 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 107 Stipulation FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting Defendant Nissan North America, Inc's 92 Request for In-Person Appearance of Counsel at March 5, 2019 Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 77 Stipulation To Modify Briefing Schedule Re Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Paul, Russell. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/15/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 65 Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and NNA's Response. Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 35 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Joint Stipulation to Permit Amendment of Complaint to Add Plaintiff. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jay Brody. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 52 Stipulation to Extend Page Limit of NNA's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to for Gary S. Graifman. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation Re Docket No. 35 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Stipulation To Extend Page Limit of NNA's Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Migliaccio, Nicholas. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mason, Gary. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Joint Stipulation Regarding the Filing of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Defendant's Response Thereto: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2017; Motions due by 10/26/2017; Replies due by 12/21/2017; Responses due by 12/1/2017; Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Deutsch, Lawrence. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falk et al v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Falk
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Shimon Yiftach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indhu Jayavelu
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Shimon Yiftach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia L. Cruz
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Shimon Yiftach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Trotter
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Shimon Yiftach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Macri
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Shimon Yiftach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Stortz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?