Garcia et al v. United States of America et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Dulce Garcia, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Saul Jimenez Suarez, Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Jirayut Latthivongskorn and Norma Ramirez
Defendant: United States of America, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Elaine Duke
Case Number: 3:2017cv05380
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SALLIE KIM FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/26/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/4/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 85 USCA Acknowledgment of Receipt for Permission to Appeal: Case Number 18-80037 USCA 9th Circuit (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER of USCA re motion and panel of Ninth Circuit Judges. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO MOVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/8/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 82 U.S. Supreme Court Receipt acknowledging Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed on 1/18/18 as No. 17-1003. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER of Supreme Court of U.S. Washington DC re filing of petition for writ of certiorari as to (92 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 251 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 75 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 69 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 57 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) USCA Case Number,,, (62 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 97 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 75 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 255 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 80 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) USCA Order, (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 80 USCA Case Number 18-15134 USCA 9th Circuit and Time Schedule Order (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 79 USCA Case Number 18-15133 USCA 9th Circuit and Time Schedule Order (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 78 USCA Case Number 18-15128 USCA 9th Circuit and Time Schedule Order (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER of USCA granting petition for permission to appeal as to (79 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 96 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 61 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 74 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 254 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) USCA Case Number 18-80008 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER of USCA granting petition for permission to appeal as to (253 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 73 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 60 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 95 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 78 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) USCA Case Number 18-80007 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER of USCA granting petition for permission to appeal as to (92 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 251 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 75 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 69 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 57 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) USCA Case Number 18-80004 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 74 USCA Case Number 18-80008 USCA 9th Circuit acknowledgment receipt of Petition for Permission to Appeal. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 73 USCA Case Number 18-80007 USCA 9th Circuit for Acknowledgment of Receipt for Permission to Appeal. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 72 Judgment of Supreme Court of United States Washington DC re Writ of Mandamus (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 71 Notice of Appeal FEE PAID (Filing fee$505,receipt number 0971-12068485). (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 70 USCA Case Number 18-15071 USCA 9th Circuit for 66 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 69 USCA Acknowledgment of Receipt of Permission to Appeal 18-80004 USCA 9th Circuit for (89 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, United States Department of Homeland Security, (241 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security, (72 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (66 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (54 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING (246) STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS AND TO SEEK LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS by Judge William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Discovery Hearing currently set for 1/30/2018 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kirstjen Nielson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 60 , Order on Motion to Dismiss 65 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 114 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Discovery Hearing held on 1/11/2018. The Court and parties discuss the status of discovery. Further Discovery Hearing set for 1/30/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Defense counsel may appear by telephone. (FTR Time: 10:32-10:41.) Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Davidson; James Zahradka; Eric Brown; Justin Berger; Kelsey Helland. Defendant Attorney: Brad Rosenberg (by telephone). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY HEARING ON 1/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/10/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 62 CLERK'S NOTICE Correcting Date/Time of Discovery Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 1/11/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018) Modified on 1/10/2018 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2018 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE: Discovery Hearing set for 1/10/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Personal appearances are preferred, but given the short notice counsel may appear by telephone. Only one attorney per party to speak if appearing by telephone, although other attorneys for the same party may listen to the hearing. Attorneys wishing to participate by telephone shall contact the Court by email to SKCRD@cand.uscourts.gov to request the dial-in information. In the email, counsel shall identify which party they represent and the name(s) of the attorney(s) that will be appearing. The Court will issue a follow up order with specific topics to be addressed during the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING 114 FRCP 12(b)(1) DISMISSAL AND GRANTING 111 PROVISIONAL RELIEF (granting 227 ) by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER of USCA regarding Government's threshold arguments and certification for appeal (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STAY OF NOVEMBER 20 ORDER 197 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/21/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 57 PER CURIAM of Supreme Court of the United States on Petition for Writ of Mandamus vacating judgment of USCA and remanding case. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 56 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/20/2017, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (222 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order, (220 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2018. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2017 re 114 MOTION to Dismiss All N.D. Cal. DACA Cases and Memorandum in Support filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security; 111 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -- Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relie filed by UC Regents, Janet Napolitano. Motions are submitted. Total Time in Court: 3 Hours; 40 Minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorneys: Jeffrey Davidson, Megan Crowley, Alexander Berengaut, Mark Lynch, Lanny Breuer, James Zahradka, Brian Danitz, Mark Rosenbaum, Ethan Dettmer, Eric Brown. Defendant Attorneys: Brad Rosenberg, Kate Bailey, Brett Shumate. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATEMENT OF DISTRICT COURT IN RESPONSE TO APPLICATION FOR A STAY Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/6/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE by Elaine Duke, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America of Filing of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Application for a Stay in the United States Supreme Court (Attachments: # 1 Petition for a Writ of Mandamus, # 2 Application for a Stay)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER of USCA denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 51 Memorandum of USCA regarding Administrative Record. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER of USCA regarding Motion for Stay. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER of USCA Dismissing Motion for Stay filed by government. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER of USCA denying petition (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 47 ONE-MONTH CONTINUANCE OF DUE DATE FOR AUGMENTED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND TEMPORARY STAY OF DISCOVERY by Judge Alsup re (190) Motion to Stay; re (191) Motion to Stay; re (192) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TENTATIVE ORDER RE MOTIONS TO STAY DISCOVERY AND COMPLETION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Tentative Order)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO FILE COMPLETED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND PROPOSE SCHEDULE Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/16/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE MOTION TO MAINTAIN ANONYMITY by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part (125) Administrative Motion maintain anonymity; granting in part and denying in part (126) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS by Judge William Alsup granting (110) Administrative Motion leave to file amicus curiae brief in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 40 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by National Education Association Of The United States, Association of California School Administrators, Berkeley Unified School District, Moreno Valley Unified School District, San Diego Unified School District, West Contra Costa Unified School District, California Faculty Association, California Federation of Teachers, California School Boards Association, California Teachers Association, Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools, Los Angeles County Board of Education, Los Angeles Unified School District, Oakland Unified School District, Sacramento City Unified School District. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief)(Leheny, Emma) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting (115) Motion for Protective Order in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER of USCA regarding amicus briefs as to (21 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 38 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 95 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 47 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 34 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO AMEND PAGE LIMITS IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR PROVISIONAL RELIEF by Judge William Alsup granting (103) Administrative Motion to alter page limits in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER of USCA regarding oral arguments and amicus briefs as to (21 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 38 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 95 in 317-cv-05211-WHA, 47 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 34 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING AMICUS BRIEFING AS MODIFIED by Judge William Alsup granting as modified (101) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE MOTION SCHEDULE Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF ACTING SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY DUKE by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim (Re: (88) Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA). (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting (91) Unopposed Administrative Motion for Additional Pages for Joint Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 31 ANSWER BY DISTRICT COURT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/23/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER of USCA re Petition for Writ of Mandamus (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 34 USCA Case Number 17-72917 USCA 9th Circuit re Petition for Writ of Mandamus (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE by Elaine Duke, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America of Filing of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Attachments: # 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Judge William Alsup denying (81) Motion to Stay in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Terminate Hearing re (15 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) Order on Stipulation, (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS by Judge William Alsup granting (82) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO COMPILE SUPPLEMENT FORTHWITH re (12 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/18/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPLETE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part (65) Motion Complete Administrative Record in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 25 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/16/17, before Judge Alsup. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (74 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RELATING CASE by Judge William Alsup granting (69) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2017 re (65 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) MOTION for an Order Directing Defendants to Complete the Administrative Record filed by UC Regents, Janet Napolitano. Written Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 1:15. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffery Davidson (Regents)Plaintiff Attorney: James Zahradka (State of CA)Plaintiff Attorney: Nancy Fineman (City of San Jose)Plaintiff Attorney: Kevin Yea (Garcia) Defendant Attorney: Brad Rosenberg (all defendants). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/16/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR BRIEFING ON MOTION TO COMPLETE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Judge William Alsup re 66 Motion to Shorten Time in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2017 Filing 21 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 3, 2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (62 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order, (24 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2018. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 3, 2017 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Tutorial Hearing held on 10/3/2017.Total Time in Court: 2 Hours, 15 Minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Regents: Jeffrey Davidson, Mark Lynch, Monica Almadani; Garcia: Mark Rosenbaum, Kelsey Helland, Ethan Dettmer, Luis Romero; City of San Jose: Nancy Fineman; State of CA: James Zahradka, Ronald Lee. Defendant's Attorneys: Brad Rosenberg, Jeffrey Robins.Also Present via Videoconference: District Judge Nicholas Garaufis (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2017)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting (57) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Elaine Duke, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 26, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/21/2017. Motion(s) hearing set for 12/20/2017 at 8:00 AM. Tutorial set for 10/3/2017 at 8:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2018 at 2:00 PM. Bench Trial set for 2/5/2018 at 7:30 AM. Case referred to Magistrate Sallie Kim for Discovery.Total Time in Court: 1:22. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Davidson; Alexander Berengaut; Alex Covington; Mark Lynch; James Zahradka; Nancy Fineman; Mark Rosenbaum; Ethan Dettmer. Defendant Attorney: Brad Rosenberg; Sara Winslow; Brett Shumate. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Kim's Standing Order)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 15 FURTHER NOTICE RE TUTORIAL re (12 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) Case Management Scheduling Order, Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 14 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/21/17, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (45 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2017. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Tutorial Hearing set for 10/3/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Dulce Garcia, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Saul Jimenez Suarez, Jirayut Latthivongskorn, Norma Ramirez re 1 Complaint, 8 Summons Issued, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 12 Case Management Scheduling Order, 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR ALL DACA ACTIONS IN THIS DISTRICT: Bench Trial set for 2/5/2018 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/22/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Shumate (Shumate, Brett) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Prescott Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 20, 2017 Related cases: Create association to 3:17-cv-05235-WHA. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Related cases: Create association to 3:17-cv-05211-WHA. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Elaine Duke, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RELATING CASES Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/20/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Dulce Garcia, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Saul Jimenez Suarez, Jirayut Latthivongskorn, Norma Ramirez (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE RE SEPTEMBER 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/19/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filed by Saul Jimenez Suarez, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Dulce Garcia, Jirayut Latthivongskorn. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Payment of Fees)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/18/2017) (Filing fee $400.00, receipt # 0971-11722776) Modified on 9/18/2017 (haS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/20/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dulce Garcia
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Luis Alberto Cortes Romero
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Jesse S Gabriel
Represented By: Leah M. Litman
Represented By: Judith Maura London
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Marquart
Represented By: Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Represented By: Laurence H. Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Gonzalez Avila
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Luis Alberto Cortes Romero
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Jesse S Gabriel
Represented By: Leah M. Litman
Represented By: Judith Maura London
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Marquart
Represented By: Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Represented By: Laurence H. Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Jimenez Suarez
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Luis Alberto Cortes Romero
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Jesse S Gabriel
Represented By: Leah M. Litman
Represented By: Judith Maura London
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Marquart
Represented By: Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Represented By: Laurence H. Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Luis Alberto Cortes Romero
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Jesse S Gabriel
Represented By: Leah M. Litman
Represented By: Judith Maura London
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Marquart
Represented By: Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Represented By: Laurence H. Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jirayut Latthivongskorn
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Luis Alberto Cortes Romero
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Jesse S Gabriel
Represented By: Leah M. Litman
Represented By: Judith Maura London
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Marquart
Represented By: Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Represented By: Laurence H. Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Ramirez
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Luis Alberto Cortes Romero
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Jesse S Gabriel
Represented By: Leah M. Litman
Represented By: Judith Maura London
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Marquart
Represented By: Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Represented By: Laurence H. Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Duke
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?