Hardin v. Mendocino Coast District Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Ellen Hardin
Defendant: Mendocino Coast District Hospital, Bob Edwards, Steve Lund and Wade Sturgeon
Case Number: 3:2017cv05554
Filed: September 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 REDACTED Discovery Order re 211 Discovery Order. Unredacted version under seal at ECF No. 245. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/23/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Discovery Order re: 234 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ellen Hardin, 253 Discovery Letter Brief Re 241 Discovery Order filed by Steve Lund, Wade Sturgeon, Bob Edwards, Mendocino Coast District Hospital. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/11/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Discovery Order re two joint letters filed at ECF No. 251 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/9/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Discovery Order re 237 Discovery Order, Terminate Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/6/2019. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Discovery Order re 211 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/5/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/30/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Discovery Order re 185 191 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/26/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/23/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Discovery Order Denying 193 MOTION to Quash filed by Ellen Hardin. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/21/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Discovery Order re: Depositions. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/19/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Discovery Order: Plaintiff's motion to quash depositions due 8/19/2019, Defendants' opposition due 8/21/2019. Defendants shall file their responses to 185 Discovery Letter Brief by 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/14/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Discovery Order re depositions. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/12/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Discovery Order re 161 165 166 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/17/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/12/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Discovery Order: Pursuant to Judge Tigar's case management order and Local Rule 37-3, any discovery letter briefs are due by July 12, 2019. If Plaintiff seeks relief from the July 12 deadline, she must seek such relief from the presiding judge. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/17/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Discovery Order re 142 Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/12/2019. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Discovery Order re: Depositions. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/6/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Discovery Order re 120 Declaration in Support. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/20/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Discovery Order re: ECF Nos. 108 , 109 , 112 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/25/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Discovery Order re: ECF Nos. 107 , 108 , 109 . Defendant's response to issue #3 due by 4/17/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/12/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order denying Defendants' discovery motions re: ECF Nos. 86 , 96 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/4/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING TO: 4/3/2019 at 12:00 p.m. re 86 Discovery Letter Brief and 96 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/2/2019. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Mediation Deadline filed by Steve Lund, State of California, Wade Sturgeon, Bob Edwards, Mendocino Coast District Hospital. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Discovery Order re Docket Nos. 86 and 88. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/27/2019. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Discovery Order: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants letter brief, ECF No. 86, not to exceed two and a half pages, no later than February 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/22/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/3/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Protective Order filed by Steve Lund, Wade Sturgeon, Bob Edwards, Mendocino Coast District Hospital. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 7/16/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Bob Edwards, Steve Lund, Mendocino Coast District Hospital, Wade Sturgeon , and Ellen Hardin filed by Steve Lund, Wade Sturgeon, Bob Edwards, Mendocino Coast District Hospital. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 20, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Steve Lund, Wade Sturgeon, Bob Edwards, Mendocino Coast District Hospital. Case Management Statement due 3/26/2018 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin v. Mendocino Coast District Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendocino Coast District Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Sturgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Hardin
Represented By: Twila S White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?