State of California v. Health and Human Services et al

Plaintiff: State of California, State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Maryland and State of New York
Defendant: Health and Human Services, Department of Labor, Secretary of United States Department of Labor, Health and Human Services, Secretary, Department of the Treasury and Department of the Treasury, Secretary
Case Number: 3:2017cv05783
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 291 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Olson, Eric. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 289 Motion for Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey Blumenfeld.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 284 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 262 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 210 Motion to Intervene. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 264 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Spottswood, Eleanor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 257 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Unopposed Granting 246 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Mgmt. Conf. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 192 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cammarata, Kimberly. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING Plaintiffs' 174 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Issued on 1/13/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 217 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bruno, Leah. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 220 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lau, Erin. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 201 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Young, Alicia. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 191 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jacob Campion.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 182 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Crane, Anna. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 163 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Connelly, Kenneth. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 152 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO LIFT STAY.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 159 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 149 Motion to Withdraw. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 146 Stipulation to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeals. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 133 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lyons, David. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANT-INTERVENOR'S 87 MOTION TO INTERVENE(terminating 132 Administrative Motion as moot). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 122 JOINT REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM REFERRAL TO ADR PROGRAM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS BY NON-PARTIES. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/3/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS 38 MOTION TO INTERVENE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jessica M. Willey. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 28 MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2018; Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2018 10:00 AM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING 88 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin H, Theriot. Attorney Kevin H Theriot for March for Life Education and Defense Fund added. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/11/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rienzi, Mark. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing and Briefing Schedule re Motion to Intervene. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Stipulation SETTING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON THE STATES 28 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REQUESTING TO RESCHEDULE THE HEARING. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 30 Motion to Shorten Time. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California v. Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Karli Ann Eisenberg
Represented By: R Matthew Wise
Represented By: Michele Li Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Human Services
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Human Services, Secretary
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Secretary
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?