January 28, 2021 |
Filing
139
ORDER (1) GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE DR. GARY ALLEN; (2) DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE MR. STEFAN BOEDEKER; (3) DENYING RENEWED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;denying 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 116 Motion to Certify Class; denying 117 Motion to Strike ; granting 118 Motion to Strike ; denying 127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Joint Statement re scheduling of case is due by 2/19/2021. Compliance Deadline set for 2/26/2021 09:01 AM in Oakland, Chambers before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
|
June 19, 2019 |
Filing
113
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER No. 3: Set/Reset Deadlines as to Renewed Class Certification Motion and Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures re Class Certification filed by 12/13/2019. Defendant's Opposition to Renewed Class Certification Motion including Daubert Challenges and Defendant's Expert Disclosures re Class Certification filed by 2/14/2020. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Class Certification and Response to Daubert Challenges re Class Certification and Rebuttal Ex pert Disclosures by 3/27/2020. Deadline to file Reply in Support of Daubert Challenges re Class Certification 4/3/2020. Hearing on Renewed Motion for Class Certification is set for Tuesday, 4/21/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court VACATES the compliance hearing set Friday, 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/19/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
|
January 22, 2019 |
Filing
83
ORDER GRANTING 78 Amended MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cree, Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/22/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
|
January 18, 2019 |
Filing
77
Discovery Order re: 75 Consent MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/18/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
|
January 16, 2019 |
Filing
72
Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/16/2019. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
|
November 7, 2018 |
Filing
66
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/7/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
|
August 2, 2018 |
Filing
61
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 49 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing set for August 7, 2018 is VACATED. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
|
April 25, 2018 |
Filing
45
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR for Private Mediation to be completed by 10/10/18. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2018. Class Certification Motion filed by 12/14/2018. Further Case Management Con ference set for 11/5/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Jury Selection set for 2/3/2020 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4 th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Pretrial Statement filed by 1/3/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing re pretrial preparation is set for 12/20/2019 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
|
April 9, 2018 |
Filing
42
ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
|