Go Daddy Operating Company, LLC v. Ghaznavi et al

Plaintiff: Go Daddy Operating Company, LLC
Defendant: Usman Ghaznavi, Salman Ghaznavi and Silicon Valley Graphic, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv06545
Filed: November 10, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2018 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and deferring ruling on in part 37 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike; denying in part and deferring ruling on in part 32 Motion to Quash and Motion to Dismiss. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 16, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J.Hamilton on 2/16/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
December 20, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 24 Motion for TRO. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Go Daddy Operating Company, LLC v. Ghaznavi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Go Daddy Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Dooley
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Monhait
Represented By: Paula Lynn Zecchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Usman Ghaznavi
Represented By: Brenda Ann Prackup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salman Ghaznavi
Represented By: Brenda Ann Prackup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Valley Graphic, LLC
Represented By: Brenda Ann Prackup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?