Lemberg v. San Francisco Opera Association
Plaintiff: Ann Lemberg
Defendant: San Francisco Opera Association
Case Number: 3:2017cv06641
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ORDER PAYMENT OF TRANSCRIPTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2021. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER CERTIFYING APPEAL TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING DEFERRED PART OF DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Defendant's request for attorney's fees is granted, and defendant is awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $9292.50. Signed by Judge Maxine M . Chesney on September 4, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S RULE 59(e) MOTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 1, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANT. Defendant's Motion to Enforce Settlement is granted, and the above-titled action is dismissed. To the extent defendant seeks attorney's fees incurred in connection with the court-ordered settlement conference, the request is denied. If defendant wishes to pursue its request for the b alance of the fees it seeks, it shall file, no later than August 31, 2020, a supplemental declaration providing a detailed breakdown as to how those hours were expended. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FILED MARCH 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO AMEND, QUASH, AND EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING DATE; STAYING ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION; CONDITIONALLY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/19/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemberg v. San Francisco Opera Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Opera Association
Represented By: Nick C. Geannacopulos
Represented By: Tiffany T Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?