Micron Technology, Inc. v. United Microelectronics Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Micron Technology, Inc.
Defendant: United Microelectronics Corporation and Fujian Jinhua Integrated Circuit Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2017cv06932
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2018 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE MATERIALS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 14, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFERRED PORTION OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 13, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
August 27, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING IN PART RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micron Technology, Inc. v. United Microelectronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Randall Evan Kay
Represented By: Marcus S. Quintanilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Microelectronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujian Jinhua Integrated Circuit Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?