Finjan, Inc. v. Zscaler, Inc.

Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Defendant: Zscaler, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv06946
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT ZSCALER, INC.'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 19, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by Finjan, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 19, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
March 15, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Zscaler, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 15, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finjan, Inc. v. Zscaler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Represented By: James R. Hannah
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zscaler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?