Turano v. County of Alameda et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia N Turano
Defendant: County of Alameda, Alameda County Sheriff's Office, Gregory J. Ahern, Brett Keteles, Tom Madigan, D Skoldqvist, City Of Oakland, Oakland Police Department, J Durant, J Adaya and Ryan Paul Tloyao
Case Number: 3:2017cv06953
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 18 25 Motions to Dismiss; denying 27 Motion for Leave to Amend. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
April 27, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 24 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Phone Conference filed by City Of Oakland, J Adaya, Tom Madigan, Cynthia N Turano, J Durant, County of Alameda, Oakland Police Department, Alameda County Sheriff's Office, Ryan Paul Tloyao, D Skoldqvist, Brett Keteles, Gregory J. Ahern. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2018 01:30 PM. ADR deadline continued to 8/31/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/27/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
March 14, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC re 15 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Continue Case Management Conference filed by Cynthia N Turano. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/14/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
February 27, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 11 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by City Of Oakland, J Adaya, Tom Madigan, Cynthia N Turano, J Durant, County of Alameda, Ryan Paul Tloyao, D Skoldqvist, Brett Keteles, Gregory J. Ahern. Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2018 01:30 PM. ADR deadline set for 4/13/18. Answer due by 4/27/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/27/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turano v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia N Turano
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Keteles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Skoldqvist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Adaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Paul Tloyao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?