Stardock Systems, Inc. v. PAUL REICHE III, et al.
Plaintiff: Stardock Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Paul Reiche III and Robert Frederick Ford
Case Number: 3:2017cv07025
Filed: December 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 77 Discovery Letter Brief.(kawlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 48 6/28/18 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating Defendants' 40 Motion to Quash. The parties are ordered to meet and confer and file a joint letter that complies with the undersigned's standing order if they fail to resolve the pending dispute. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stardock Systems, Inc. v. PAUL REICHE III, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stardock Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Noel Valentine
Represented By: Robert Ahlefeld Weikert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Reiche III
Represented By: Stephen Cory Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Frederick Ford
Represented By: Stephen Cory Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?