Hampton v. Aqua Metals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arlis Hampton
Defendant: Aqua Metals, Inc., Stephen R. Clarke, Thomas Murphy and Mark Weinswig
Case Number: 3:2017cv07142
Filed: December 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 133 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants Reply Brief to Plaintiffs' Opposition Brief. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 123 Administrative Relief to Exceed Page Limits for Their Motions to Dismiss.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 120 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RELIEF TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR THEIR MOTIONS TO DISMISS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 117 Stipulation Re Extension of Time to File Amended Consolidated Complaint for Violation of Securities Laws. Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 115 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Added attorney Steven M. Schatz for Aqua Metals, Inc.,Steven M. Schatz for Stephen R. Clarke,Steven M. Schatz for Selwyn Mould,Steven M. Schatz for Thomas Murphy,Steven M. Schatz for Mark Weinswig. Attorney Michael Ross Hogue and Robert Allen Horowitz terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 93 MOTION TO DISMISS AND 97 MOTION TO STRIKE. Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 107 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Potrepka, Gregory. ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING REQUEST FOR PAGE EXTENSION AND GRANTING REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE Docket No. 99 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 90 Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Motion to Dismiss and 91 Stipulation Re 90 Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stern, Leslie. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bartone, Stephanie. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hopkins, Shannon. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING SINGERS AND JORDANS ( 13 , 21 ) MOTIONS AND GRANTING THE PLYMOUTH GROUPS 23 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2018 and Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP re 3:17-cv-07196-JST Heath v. Aqua Metals, Inc. et al. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 1, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Aqua Metals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlis Hampton
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Charles Henry Linehan
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua Metals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Weinswig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?