Gillard et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Gillard, Mike Mandani, Shant Bakalian, Eric Walley and Richard DeVico
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Volkwagen AG and Audi AG
Case Number: 3:2017cv07287
Filed: December 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 126 Stipulation Re 119 Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS 91 MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Carr, Brian. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 92 Stipulation Re Docket No. 91 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 89 Stipulation Setting Schedule for Case Through Class Certification. Discovery / Motions due by 9/11/2020; Responses due by 11/11/2020; Replies due by 1/7/2021 and. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 87 Stipulation to Extend Due Date to File Stipulation Setting Forth Schedule for Case Through Class Certification Re Docket No. 84 . Motion (Stipulation and Proposed Order) due by 8/28/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 72 MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion (stipulation and proposed order) due by 8/21/2019 and Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 76 Stipulation To Extend Briefing Schedule, Reschedule Case Management Conference and Reschedule Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2019 and Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 56 MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2019; Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2019; and Further Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Homer Ramsey.(terminating 66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, since re-filed as docket no. 67 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 59 Stipulation.Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018 and Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2017 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS, AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED FILINGS Re Docket No. 54 . Motions terminated: 45 MOTION to Dismiss and 47 MOTION for Joinder to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/30/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mitchell M. Breit. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Gallub.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and Continuing Case Management Conference. Motions due by 4/2/2017; Responses due by 5/2/2018; Replies due by 5/23/2018; Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2018; Initial Case Management Conference / Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Adam A. Edwards. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillard et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkwagen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gillard
Represented By: Deborah R. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Mandani
Represented By: Deborah R. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shant Bakalian
Represented By: Deborah R. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Walley
Represented By: Deborah R. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard DeVico
Represented By: Deborah R. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?