In re Capacitors Antitrust Litigation (No.III)
Plaintiff: Chip-Tech, Ltd., Michael Brooks, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Gossett Motor Cars, Inc., WE 3 Gossett, LLC, Beverly Hills Leasing LLC, BHRAC, LLC, Walker Component Group, Inc., Autorama, Inc., Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Dependable Component Supply Corp., Johnny Walker, Jamie Thaemert, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Michael W. Davis, Fredrick P. Hege, Jr., Charles Rusher, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Computing Solutions, Inc., David A Bennett, Timothy Duffy, Avnet, Inc., David C. Keller, The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, Digi-Key Corporation, Flextronics International USA, Inc., CAE SOUND, Toy-Knowlogy Inc., Sean G Tarjoto, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Everett Ellis, Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Marta Michaud, eIQ Energy Inc., Scott Huffman, Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., John E. McDowell, Arrow Electronics, Inc., Mike Fisher, Jennifer Rusher, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Garth Russell, M.D., Cetacea Sound, Inc., David Standridge, Steve Wong, Plexus Corp., Scot Dunlap, In Home Tech Solutions, Inc., Todd Stowater, Troy Gibson, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Jaco Electronics Incorporated and Vermont Street Acquisition LLC
Defendant: Capacitors Antitrust Litigation (No.III), Panasonic Corporation, KEMET Corporation, NEC Tokin America, Inc., Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., Toshin Kogyo Co., Ltd., Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated, Kemet Electronics Corporation, FPCAP Electronics (Suzhou) Co., Ltd., Okaya Electric America Inc., Sanyo Electronic Device (U.S.A.) Corporation, AVX Corporation, Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc., Samsung Electro Mechanics America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited, Nichicon Corporation, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd., Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc., Soshin Electric Company Limited, Nissei Electric Company Limited, Rubycon Corporation, Taitsu America, Inc., Shizuki Electric Co., Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Taiyo Yuden (USA) Inc., Alfred H. Siegel, Liquidating Trustee of the Circuit City Stores, Inc., Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd., Fujitsu Components America, Inc., Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Taitsu Corporation, Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Shinyei Kaisha, Shizuki Electric Co., Ltd, Nichicon (America) Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Elna Co. Ltd., Nissei Electronic Co. LTD., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., HolyStone International, TDK Corporation, Samsung Electro-Mechanics, Sanyo North America Corporation, Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd., NEC Tokin Corporation, American Shizuki Corporation, Electronics of America Incorporated, Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd., Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd., Rohm Co., Ltd, Elna America Inc., Schuten Electronics, Inc., HOLY STONE POLYTECH CO. LTD., Nitsuko Electronics Corporation, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., Sanyo Electric Group, Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., Rubycon America Inc., United Chemi-con Corporation and Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC
Petitioner: Quathimatine Holdings, Inc., HP, Inc. and Dell Inc.
Respondent: Cisco Systems, Inc. and Aptiv Services US, LLC
Intervenor: United States of America
Claimant: Certain Members of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Settlement Class
Interested Party: Top Floor Home Improvements
Case Number: 3:2017md02801
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 1407 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 9-17-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2724 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1406 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1405 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1404 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/17/2020 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1403 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2020 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1402 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/17/20 before Judge James Donato by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1401 Proposed Order re #1400 MOTION To Adopt the Report and Recommendations of Special Master Monica Ip re #1397 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (2704 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXP by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1400 MOTION To Adopt the Report and Recommendations of Special Master Monica Ip re #1397 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (2704 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 ORDER. The sealing requests at Dkt. Nos. 2524, 2561, 2567 and 2575 in Case No. 14-3264 are granted for good cause. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/15/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1398 ORDER GRANTING (2717 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) STIPULATION WITHDRAWING CISCO AND APTIV'S OBJECTIONS TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/15/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1397 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (2704 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Objections due by 9/29/2020.. Signed by Special Master M. Monica Ip on 9/14/2020. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1396 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #1340 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, NOTICE OF EXCLUSIONS AS TO SETTLEMENTS WITH AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1395 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1386 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 ORDER granting (2474 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Stipulation of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Taitsu Corporation and Taitsu America, Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/14/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 ORDER. The DPPs' final approval hearing on September 17, 2020, at 10 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party or party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by September 16, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: #https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/11/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1392 REPLY (re #1360 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra, #3 Proposed Order Granting Settlements, #4 Proposed Order AVX Proposed Final Judgment, #5 Proposed Order ELNA Proposed Final Judgment, #6 Proposed Order Holy Stone Proposed Final Judgment, #7 Proposed Order KEMET Prop Final Judgment, #8 Proposed Order Panasonic Proposed Final Judgment, #9 Proposed Order Shinyei Proposed Final Judgment, #10 Proposed Order Shizuki Prop Final Judgment, #11 Proposed Order Taitsu Proposed Final Judgment)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1391 REPLY (re #1362 MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1390 Joinder re #1388 Supplemental Brief, in Support of Certain Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1389 Brief Direct Action Plaintiffs' Supplemental Daubert Briefing filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Jaco Electronics Incorporated, The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of DAPs' Supplemental Daubert Briefing, #2 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibits G-J (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit M, #12 Exhibit N, #13 Exhibit O, #14 Exhibit P, #15 Exhibit Q, #16 Exhibit R, #17 Exhibit S, #18 Exhibits T-X (Filed Under Seal))(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1388 Supplemental Brief IN SUPPORT OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX filed byHitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration JUSTIN A. COHEN, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1387 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to DAPs' Supplemental Daubert Briefing filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Jaco Electronics Incorporated, The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of DAPs' Supplemental Daubert Briefing, #4 Unredacted Version of DAPs' Supplemental Daubert Briefing, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit T, #13 Exhibit U, #14 Exhibit V, #15 Exhibit W, #16 Exhibit X)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1386 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1360 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU ) and Notice of Intent to Appear at Fairness Hearing filed byAptiv Services US, LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse In Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1385 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 7-9-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1378 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1384 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/11/2020 before Judge James Donato by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1383 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Meredith Lys Schultz (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1382 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 8-11-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2132 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1381 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/11/2020 before Judge James Donato by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1380 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Concurrent Expert Witness Proceeding held on 8/11/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1379 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/11/2020 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1378 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/09/2020 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1377 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 11, 2020 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1376 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/11/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1375 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 11, 2020 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Petkoski, Djordje) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1374 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 11, 2020 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1373 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/11/2020 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1372 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/11/20 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 ORDER. The concurrent expert proceeding in the DAP cases will be held on August 11, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., by Zoom Webinar. The parties are directed to email Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark (jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov) by 5 p.m. on August 10, 2020, the names of their lead counsel and experts who will be speaking during the proceeding. The experts and lead counsel are requested to call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW CERTAIN PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/7/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1369 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER WITHDRAWING CERTAIN PENDING MOTIONS filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1368 NOTICE by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Johan Tatoy (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1367 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Bonnie Lau Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Stephen Kam (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER MONICA IP. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/29/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 ORDER RE CONCURRENT EXPERT WITNESS PROCEEDING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 25, 2020 Filing 1364 Proposed Order re #1362 MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/25/2020)
July 25, 2020 Filing 1363 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri Dec in Support of #1362 MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 16 to Joseph R. Saveri Dec)(Related document(s) #1362 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/25/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1362 MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/7/2020. Replies due by 8/14/2020. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1361 Proposed Order re #1360 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1360 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/7/2020. Replies due by 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A - J to Joseph R. Saveri Dec., #3 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1359 Proposed Order to Appoint Monica Ip as Special Master by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1358 MOTION to Appoint Monica Ip as Special Master filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/4/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monica Ip)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1357 REPLY (re #1316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Avnet (Redacted) ) (Redacted), filed byPanasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to Reply in Support of Panasonic Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment Against Avnet, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sofia Arguello, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply in Support of Panasonic Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Avnet, #4 Unredacted Reply in Support of Panasonic Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Avnet)(Donovan, Molly) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1355 REPLY (re #1314 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx ) (Redacted) filed byPanasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly M. Donovan in Support, #2 Exhibits 1 - 6 to Donovan Decl. (Submitted Under Seal))(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1354 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to the Panasonic Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael P. Toomey, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx, #4 Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx, #5 Unredacted Exhibit 1 to Donovan Decl., #6 Unredacted Exhibit 2 to Donovan Decl., #7 Unredacted Exhibit 3 to Donovan Decl., #8 Unredacted Exhibit 4 to Donovan Decl., #9 Unredacted Exhibit 5 to Donovan Decl., #10 Unredacted Exhibit 6 to Donovan Decl.)(Donovan, Molly) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1353 REPLY (re #1312 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Darrell L. Williams ) filed byAvnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibits A-B to Turken Decl. (Submitted Under Seal))(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Darrell L. Williams filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Darrell L. Williams, #4 Unredacted Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Darrell L. Williams, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 ORDER. Despite multiple requests to the parties to remove all of their belongings from the courtroom, several laptops and other items are still there from the DPPs' trial. The parties are advised that all remaining items will be removed and repurposed on July 28, 2020, and will not be recoverable after that. This is the last opportunity to claim an item. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/20/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1350 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT PANASONIC CORPORATION FROM IPPS' ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1349 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO NICHICON DEFENDANTS FROM IPPS' ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1348 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT MATSUO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. FROM IPPS' ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1347 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ELNA DEFENDANTS FROM IPPS' ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1346 NOTICE by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd. NOTICE OF FILING OF JOINT STATEMENT FOR CONCURRENT EXPERT WITNESS PROCEEDING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pak, Chul) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 ORDER RE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1344 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH ELNA, MATSUO, NICHICON, AND PANASONIC. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1343 ORDER RE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. MDL Dkt. Nos. 821, 995. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/15/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1342 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 ORDER. All materials and equipment left in Courtroom 11 from the DPPs' trial must be removed by July 27, 2020. The parties are directed to reach out to Ms. Clark to coordinate a pick-up time. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/13/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 ORDER GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS'S MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS, MDL Dkt. Nos. 1300, 1068. Fairness Hearing set for 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1339 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2020 in case 3:17-md-02801-JD and 3:14-cv-03264-JD.Total Time in Court: 43 minutes. Court Reporter: Debbie Pas. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1338 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1337 Proposed Order re #1300 MOTION for Settlement PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU Revised Proposed Order by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1336 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/3/2020; 3/4/2020; 3/5/2020; 3/11/2020 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Petkoski, Djordje) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1335 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 8, held on 3-12-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1334 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 7, held on 3-11-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1333 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 6, held on 3-10-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1332 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 5, held on 3-9-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1331 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 4, held on 3-5-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1330 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 3, held on 3-4-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1329 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 2, held on 3-3-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1328 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 1, held on 3-2-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2532 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1327 ORDER. The Court sets a hearing for July 9, 2020, at 2 p.m., on all issues relating to DPP class members Cisco and Aptiv's distribution dispute with the DPPs' Class Counsel. The hearing will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by July 8, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1326 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Avnet (Redacted) ) filed byAvnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibits A-L Filed Under Seal)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1325 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Avnet's Opposition to Panasonic's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit I, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit J, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1324 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1314 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx ) filed byAvnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken, #2 Exhibits A-G Filed Under Seal)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Avnet's Opposition to Panasonic's Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Marx, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Marx, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1322 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1312 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Darrell L. Williams ) (Redacted) filed byPanasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1321 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Panasonic Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Darrell L. Williams, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael P. Toomey in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Panasonic Defendants' Opposition, #4 Unredacted Version of Panasonic Defendants' Opposition)(Donovan, Molly) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1320 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri Requesting Entry of Preliminary Approval Order. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 ORDER. The Court finds the DPPs' motion for preliminary approval of class action settlements, MDL Dkt. No. 1300, to be suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for June 25, 2020, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/22/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1318 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Meredith Lys Schultz Arrow Electronics, Inc.s Notice Of Withdrawal Of William A. Isaacson (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1317 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Concurrent Expert "Hot Tub" by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Jaco Electronics Incorporated, The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Avnet (Redacted) filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/29/2020. Replies due by 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly M. Donovan in Support, #2 Exhibits 1 - 14 to Donovan Decl. (Submitted Under Seal), #3 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1315 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to the Panasonic Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Avnet, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sofia Arguello, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Panasonic Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Avnet, #4 Unredacted Panasonic Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Avnet, #5 Unredacted Exhibit 1 to Donovan Decl., #6 Unredacted Exhibit 2 to Donovan Decl., #7 Unredacted Exhibit 3 to Donovan Decl., #8 Unredacted Exhibit 4 to Donovan Decl., #9 Unredacted Exhibit 5 to Donovan Decl., #10 Unredacted Exhibit 6 to Donovan Decl., #11 Unredacted Exhibit 7 to Donovan Decl., #12 Unredacted Exhibit 8 to Donovan Decl., #13 Unredacted Exhibit 9 to Donovan Decl., #14 Unredacted Exhibit 10 to Donovan Decl., #15 Unredacted Exhibit 11 to Donovan Decl., #16 Unredacted Exhibit 12 to Donovan Decl., #17 Unredacted Exhibit 13 to Donovan Decl., #18 Unredacted Exhibit 14 to Donovan Decl.)(Donovan, Molly) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1314 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/29/2020. Replies due by 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael P. Toomey, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx, #4 Unredacted Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx)(Donovan, Molly) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1312 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Darrell L. Williams filed by Avnet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/29/2020. Replies due by 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Exclude, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Darrell L. Williams filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Motion to Exclude Testimony of Darrell L. Williams, #4 Unredacted Motion to Exclude Testimony of Darrell L. Williams, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 ORDER. The jurors for the DPPs' trial have now been discharged. The Court orders that the parties may not contact the jurors for any reason. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/5/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1309 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference re DPPs' Trial held on 6/5/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1308 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Working Group Meeting with Judge re DPPs' Trial held on 6/2/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1307 Clerks Notice re: Cameras in the Courtroom. Due to the remote nature of proceedings during the Covid-19 emergency, Cameras in the Courtroom will not be used for the rest of the trial. There will be a Zoom link available to view the trial live when it resumes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 ORDER. A status conference regarding the DPPs' trial is set for June 4, 2020, at 1:30 p.m., to be held by Zoom Webinar. As with previous status conferences, Ms. Clark will circulate the panelist invitation to all lead counsel by email. The parties should email Ms. Clark by 4 p.m. on June 2, 2020, if there is a change in their lead counsel who will be speaking at the status conference. All lead counsel must call in ten minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://us02web.zoom.us/j/89706087591?pwd=b3JUMFlsdWlLdlVvelN3TCtmaUNjZz09 Webinar ID: 897 0608 7591 Password: 407064Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13462487799,,89706087591# or +16699006833,,89706087591# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799International numbers available: # https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kdVpAxgdWN PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, record ing, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/29/2020. (This is a te xt-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1305 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 5/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 ORDER. The Court declines defendants' two proposed revisions to the supplemental juror questionnaire. MDL Dkt. No. 1303. As the Court has advised the parties, each side will present a recap of the evidence to refresh the jury's recollection of the prior testimony, and the jurors have been equipped to take notes. The memory question is unnecessary in these circumstances. The catch-all question at the end of the questionnaire is intended to ensure that the Court does not miss any concerns a juror might have. The parties will be advised of the specifics of any telephonic follow-up, in the manner typically used for communications from the jury. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/29/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1303 Letter from Defendants Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd., Nippon Chemi-Con Corp., and United Chemi-Con, Inc. regarding the Court's proposed Supplemental Jury Questionnaire Dkt. No. 1302. (Cross, David) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 ORDER. The Court proposes to use the attached Supplemental Jury Questionnaire for the DPPs' trial. Any objections to the form or content should be filed by May 29, 2020, at 10 a.m. California time. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 ORDER. A further status conference for the DPPs' trial will be held on May 28, 2020, at 1 p.m., by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by May 26, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for th e appropriate Zoom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://us02web.zoom.us/j/83041176638?pw d=V2hUYThNSUtmdU5IUmpJNTl4dElVZz09 Webinar ID: 830 4117 6638 Password: 152037 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16699006833,,83041176638# or +19292056099,,83041176638# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799International numbers available: #ht tps://us02web.zoom.us/u/keoOKl4yRC PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/21/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1300 MOTION for Settlement PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/2/2020. Replies due by 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A-J to Saveri Dec., #3 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra, #4 Exhibit A-C of Zylstra Dec., #5 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 ORDER. The further status conference for the DPPs' trial will be set for May 28, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/14/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 1298 Statement RE: REMAINING TRIAL WITNESSES by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 1297 MOTION for Leave to File OVERSIZED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1296 Transcript of Telephonic Proceedings held on March 25, 2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1292 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2020. (Related documents(s) #1292 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1295 ORDER granting (1046 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Supplemental Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/7/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION BETWEEN AVNET AND PANASONIC RE CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/7/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1293 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 5/7/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1292 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/25/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1291 Letter from Defendants Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd., Nippon Chemi-Con Corp., and United Chemi-Con, Inc. regarding Trial. (Cross, David) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1290 NOTICE by Aptiv Services US, LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc. OF SERVICE OF LETTER TO SPECIAL MASTER BLEICH (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1289 NOTICE by Aptiv Services US, LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc. TO THE COURT RE NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 11:00 AM via Zoom Webinar. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 ORDER. As previously stated, the status conference in the DPPs' case set for May 7, 2020, at 11 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by May 5, 2020, at 6:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Zoom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://us02web.zoom.u s/j/87290818113?pwd=T1M5QUlMczRoV0VRUGw1OTVwK2Z1QT09 Webinar ID: 872 9081 8113 Password: 179022Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13462487799,,87290818113# or +16699006833,,87290818113# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 International numbers available: https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kO2EeRqYN PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand .uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/4/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 ORDER. Pursuant to General Orders 72-2 and 73, a re-start of the DPP trial on May 11, 2020, is not possible. The Court would like to discuss a possible June trial re-start date at a status conference to be held by Zoom webinar on May 7, 2020, at 11 a.m. The webinar details will follow. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1286 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Avnet and Panasonic Regarding Case Schedule, #1259 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1077 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1023 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Avnet and Panasonic Regarding Case Schedule ,1077 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1023 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Avnet and Panasonic Regarding Case Schedule , #1023 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Avnet and Panasonic Regarding Case Schedule filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Case Schedule)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1285 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/9/2020; 3/10/2020; 3/12/2020 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Petkoski, Djordje) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1284 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1283 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1282 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 1281 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 4-16-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1278 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1280 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 1280 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 16, 2020 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 1279 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 4/16/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 1278 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER. The status conference set for April 16, 2020, at 11 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by April 15, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Z oom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://zoom.us/j/98659502400?pwd=L1gvYlg5c0p5UmxkWkJLNVF2VGJzZ z09 Webinar ID: 986 5950 2400 Password: 858633 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +12532158782,,98659502400# or +13017158592,,98659502400# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099International numbers available: #https://zoom.us/u/auEUH85xn < br
April 14, 2020 Filing 1276 Letter from Jonathan M. Jacobson to the Court on behalf of DAP Defendants in advance of April 16, 2020 Telephonic Status Conference. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 ORDER. In light of General Order 72, the IPPs' motion for final approval of settlements (MDL Dkt. No. 1063) and motion for attorney's fees (MDL Dkt. No. 1011) will be decided on the papers. The hearing that was set for April 16, 2020, is VACATED. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/9/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1274 STATUS REPORT (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Update on Claims Status in Support of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic) by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Schachter Regarding Claims Status in Support of IPPs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1273 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/9/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1272 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Christopher Matthew Megaw (Megaw, Christopher) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 ORDER. For the telephone conferences set for the DPPs' case on 4/9/2020 at 10:30 a.m. and the DAPs' cases on 4/16/2020 at 11 a.m., all participating parties are directed to be on the line 15 minutes in advance of the start of the conference in order to check in with the courtroom deputy. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 ORDER. The Court sets a telephonic status conference for April 16, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. for the following DAP cases: Case Nos. 17-7046, 17-7047, 18-2657, 19-1902, and 19-3296. The status conference will be held on the Court's conference call line. The dial-in number is 1-877-402-9753, and the access code is 5266369. The parties are requested to dial in from a landline if at all possible, and to mute themselves whenever they are not speaking. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER. The Court sets a telephone conference in the DPPs' case to discuss trial scheduling issues on April 9, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., using the Court's conference call line. The dial-in number is 1-877-402-9753, and the access code is 5266369. The parties are requested to dial in from a landline if at all possible, and to mute themselves whenever they are not speaking. The jury will be informed that they should not return to the courthouse on April 6, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1268 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Elizabeth R. Odette (Odette, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1267 Statement re #1262 Telephone Conference Joint Statement Concerning Trial by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1266 Letter from Panasonic defendants in response to the letter submitted by Direct Action Plaintiffs Avnet, Inc., Jaco Electronics, Inc. and Benchmark Electronics, Inc. (DAPs) requesting a telephonic status conference (MDL ECF No. 1264) . (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1265 Letter from Arrow Electronics, Inc. re: Certain DAPs' Letter Requesting Telephonic Conference. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1264 Letter from Certain DAPs Requesting Telephonic Status Conference . (Turken, Robert) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1263 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Intent to Object to Final Approval of Class Action Settlements with Defendants Kemet and Shizuki; Notice of Intent to Appear at Final Approval Hearing (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse In Support of Cisco Systems, Inc.s Notice of Intent to Object to Final Approval of Class Action Settlements with Defendants Kemet and Shizuki; Notice of Intent to Appear at Final Approval Hearing)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1262 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/25/2020. Joint statement due 3/31/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/26/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Nichicon Corporation and Nichicon (America) Corporation. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/24/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 ORDER. The Court sets a telephone conference for March 25, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. to discuss scheduling issues for the DPP trial. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by March 24, 2020, to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/20/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1259 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1077 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1023 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Avnet and Panasonic Regarding Case Schedule , filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Case Schedule)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1258 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1257 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1256 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Sarah Goekler. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1255 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Skolky, Shawn) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1254 Transcript of FTR Proceedings held on March 16, 2020, before Judge Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, telephone number sgoekler.csr@gmail.com; (530)941-2621. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1253 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2020. (slgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1253 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1252 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1251 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/16/2020.FTR Time: 8:45-8:58. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2020) Modified on 3/17/2020: Matter transcribed by Sarah Goekler. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2020 Filing 1250 Brief re #1237 Brief, DEFENDANT UNITED CHEMI-CONS RESPONSE TO DPPS PROFFER IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF ADVERSE INFERENCE REGARDING FIFTH AMENDMENT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF ANTHONY OLITA filed byUnited Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #1237 ) (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2020)
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 ORDER. The parties should be prepared to discuss at 8:45 a.m. on Monday, March 16, 2020, a suspension of the trial in light of the current public health situation. Pending further order, all parties are directed to keep non-essential personnel out of the courthouse and the courtroom gallery. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 3/14/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1248 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF SHINOBU ISHIGAMIS TESTIMONY ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1247 Declaration of Farrah Berse in Support of #1246 Brief and Exhibits A-R filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Related document(s) #1246 ) (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1246 Brief DEFENDANTS SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS REQUEST REGARDING DR. SINGER filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1245 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF TADAAKI NISHIZAKAS TESTIMONY ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1244 Brief DPP's Brief Regarding Curative Instruction For Dr. Singer's Testimony filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1243 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF ADVERSE INFERENCE REGARDING FIFTH AMENDMENT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF IKUO UCHIYAMA filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1242 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GORDON HOEY ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1241 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/12/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours & 3 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debbie Pas. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1240 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/11/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours & 13 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/11/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1239 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/10/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours & 3 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas/Belle Ball. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2020: #2 Amended Trial Log) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2020 Filing 1238 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF SHINICHI TORIIS TESTIMONY ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1237 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF ADVERSE INFERENCE REGARDING FIFTH AMENDMENT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF ANTHONY OLITA filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1236 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/9/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours & 44 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas/Belle Ball. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 ORDER. DPPs may play the deposition testimony identified in proposed inference No. 2 from the Fifth Amendment proffer relating to Akitsugu Miyanishi. MDL Dkt. No. 1234 at 1-2. DPPs did not show a substantial need to play the deposition questions and answers offered in support of proposed inference No. 1, MDL Dkt. No. 1234 at 1, and so the testimony will not be allowed. The questions concern only the terms of Matsuo's guilty plea, which are stipulated to in detail. Miyanishi's Fifth Amendment invocations also did not prevent DPPs from discovering any information that substantive answers would have provided. In addition, DPPs did not demonstrate that proposed inference No. 3, MDL Dkt. No. 1234 at 3-4, is a permissible adverse inference. DPPs did not state a foundation for attributing Miyanishi's Fifth Amendment invocations to AVX. DPPs also fail to point to independent evidence supporting the proposed adverse inference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/9/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 7, 2020 Filing 1234 Brief Amended Proffer of Evidence in support of Adverse Inferences regarding Fifth Amendment Deposition Testimony of Akitsugu Miyanishi filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2020)
March 7, 2020 Filing 1233 Brief AMENDED PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF NORIAKI KAKIZAKIS TESTIMONY ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2020)
March 7, 2020 Filing 1232 Brief AMENDED PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF TESTIMONY OF HIDEAKI SATO ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2020)
March 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 ORDER. The DPPs' Fifth Amendment proffer for witness Miyanishi, Dkt. No. 1229, does not provide the substance of the questions and answers from his deposition, or attach the independent evidence DPPs contend supports a possible inference. The Court cannot evaluate the proffer without that material. DPPs' articulation of the "substantial need" is also deficient -- for many items, DPPs are simply stating the adverse inference they are seeking, not the substantial need for the inference under the relevant case law. DPPs have also not attached the full documents containing the coconspirator statements they are seeking to admit through witnesses Hideaki Sato, Dkt. No. 1227, and Noriaki Kakizaki, Dkt. No. 1228. Again, the Court needs those documents in their entirety to evaluate these proffers. The Court will allow amended proffers in these instances, so long as that does not reduce the Court's time to evaluate them. DPPs should note in the proffers the trial day on which they intend to call the witness subject to the proffer, although DPPs are advised that the Court may not be able to rule on these proffers on their desired schedule unless the necessary documents are submitted in a timely manner. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2020)
March 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 ORDER. The Court is advised that the video of proceedings on 3/3/2020 (opening statements) has been posted and may be accessed via this link: https://www.uscourts.gov/cameras-courts/re-capacitors-antitrust-litigation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 3/7/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1229 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF ADVERSE INFERENCE REGARDING FIFTH AMENDMENT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF AKITSUGU MIYANISHI filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1228 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF NORIAKI KAKIZAKIS TESTIMONY ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1227 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF TESTIMONY OF HIDEAKI SATO ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1226 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF TRIAL EXHIBIT 2813 PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 801(d)(2), 803(6), AND 804(b)(3) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1225 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/5/2020.Total Time in Court: 4 Hours 58 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debbie Pas/Belle Ball. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2020: #1 Trial Log) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2020 Filing 1224 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/4/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours. Court Reporter: Debra Pas/Belle Ball. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #1 Trial Log) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2020 Filing 1223 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1222 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF NORIO KASUGAS TESTIMONY ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1221 ORDER. The DPPs' Rule 801(d)(2)(E) proffer for witness Norio Kasuga does not contain a list of the co-conspirator statements DPPs will seek to admit through him. Dkt. No. 1212. DPPs are directed to re-file his proffer with that list and in a revised form that is consistent with the discussion with the Court on the record today. DPPs should not plan on admitting any co-conspirator statements through Kasuga on the March 4, 2020 trial day, should they call him to the stand. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/3/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1220 Brief Proffer of Satoshi Okubo's Coconspirator Statement Testimony Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1219 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Trial Sheet) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1218 Brief PROFFER OF HIROYUKI IMAIS COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENT TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Video Camera hearing set for 3/4/2020, 3/5/2020, 3/9/2020-3/12/2020, 3/16/2020-3/19/2020, 3/23/2020-3/26/2020, 3/30/2020-4/3/2020 09:00 AM. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1217 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc., Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd.. (Maddox, Claire) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1216 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS -- REVISED FINAL SET FOR JURY. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/3/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing: Video Camera hearing set for 3/3/2020 09:00 AM. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1215 Proposed Order Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion To Bring Demonstratives Into The Courthouse For Trial by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1214 Brief RE: PLAINTIFFS OPENING STATEMENT SLIDES filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 ORDER re (1207 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE FOR TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/2/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1212 Brief PROFFER PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1211 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial began on 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Trial Sheet) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1210 Brief PROFFER PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1209 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1208 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri . (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1207 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE FOR TRIAL filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Responses due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 1, 2020 Filing 1206 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 27, 2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1193 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1188 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1192 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1190 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1196 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1189 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1191 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1197 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2020)
March 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 ORDER. In light of the multiple settlement agreements submitted in the last several days, the trial hours are changed to 33 hours per side. The Shinyei defendants are excused from trial. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 3/1/2020)
February 29, 2020 Filing 1204 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri . (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1203 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS -- FINAL SET. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1202 ORDER EXCUSING ELNA CO. LTD. AND ELNA AMERICA INC. FROM MARCH 2, 2020 TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1200 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1199 Letter from Steven N. Williams . (Attachments: #1 Settlement agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1198 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1197 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/27/2020 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1196 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/27/2020 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Hartley, Jason) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #1132 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Breton Leone-Quick. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1194 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1193 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/27/20 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1192 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/27/2020 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1191 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/27/2020 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1190 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/27/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1189 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/27/2020 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1188 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 27, 2020 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Nissei Electric Company Limited, Nissei Electronic Co. LTD., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1187 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1186 Letter to Court re verdict form. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (2582) Administrative Motion to Bring Equipment into Courthouse for Trial ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE FOR TRIAL in case 3:14-cv-03264-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 REQUEST AND ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT FOR MARCH 2, 2020 TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/27/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1183 OBJECTIONS to re #1176 Letter DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS'S OPPOSITION TO TAITSU'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF MR. SHINOBU ISHIGAMI by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1181 RESPONSE re #1047 Pretrial Conference Statement Joint Notice of Deposition Designations by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1180 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by AVX Corporation. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1179 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri re Settlement Agreement with Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc. d/b/a HolyStone International, and Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/26/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 ORDER. The final pretrial conference is continued to 2:00 p.m. on February 27, 2020. No proceedings will be heard at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 02/26/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1176 Letter from Alexandra Shear re: Plaintiffs' deposition designations relating to foreign investors. (Shear, Alexandra) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1175 Witness List by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Potential Witness List and Attorney List. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1174 Proposed Order REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT FOR MARCH 2, 2020 TRIAL by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1173 MOTION to Strike - Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike DPP Proffer filed by AVX Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/10/2020. Replies due by 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1172 PROPOSED PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/25/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1171 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rule 1006 Charts filed by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. Responses due by 3/10/2020. Replies due by 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bonnie Lau in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rule 1006 Charts, #2 Exhibit One, #3 Exhibit Two, #4 Exhibit Three, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rule 1006 Charts)(Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1170 REPLY (re #1163 MOTION TO (I) ALLOW UCHIYAMA TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AND (II) PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF HIS PRIOR INVOCATION OF FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1169 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE FOR TRIAL filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Responses due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 ORDER RE TRIAL EXPERTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/25/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1167 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1163 MOTION TO (I) ALLOW UCHIYAMA TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AND (II) PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF HIS PRIOR INVOCATION OF FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1166 Brief PROFFER PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Exhibit Part 1, #4 Exhibit Part 2, #5 Exhibit Part 3)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1165 STIPULATION re #1140 Pretrial Order, Terminate Motions Joint Master Stipulation List filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1164 ERRATA re #1163 MOTION TO (I) ALLOW UCHIYAMA TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AND (II) PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF HIS PRIOR INVOCATION OF FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS - Corrected Declaration of Farrah Berse with Exhibits by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1163 MOTION TO (I) ALLOW UCHIYAMA TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AND (II) PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF HIS PRIOR INVOCATION OF FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Responses due by 3/9/2020. Replies due by 3/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Farrah Berse, #2 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1162 Letter from J. Bial (NCC) re: Testimony of Dr. Stiroh and Dr. Williams. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1161 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1160 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1159 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply ISO Petition for Disclosure of Grand Jury Materials [Dkt No. 1157] filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Farrah Berse, #2 Reply ISO Petition of Disclosure of Grand Jury Materials [REDACTED], #3 Jury Materials [UNREDACTED]], #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1157 REPLY (re #1142 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony and Exhibits [REDACTED] ) [REDACTED] filed byUnited Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1156 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS NICHICON CORPORATION AND NICHICON (AMERICA) CORPORATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1155 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS RUBYCON CORPORATION AND RUBYCON AMERICA INC. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 ORDER GRANTING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH NICHICON AND RUBYCON DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 OMNIBUS ORDER RE DAUBERT MOTIONS AND MOTION FOR DECERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1152 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri re Settlement Agreement with Panasonic and SANYO. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Parker, Howard) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the United States' Opposition to United Chemi-Con Inc.'s Petition for Disclosure filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Howard J. Parker, #2 Proposed Order, #3 United States' Opposition to United Chemi-Con Inc.'s Petition for Disclosure [REDACTED], #4 United States' Opposition to United Chemi-Con Inc.'s Petition for Disclosure [UNREDACTED])(Parker, Howard) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1149 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1142 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony and Exhibits [REDACTED] ) filed byUnited States of America. (Parker, Howard) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1148 REPLY (re #1110 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Dr. Darrell Williams and for Protective Order, ) filed byPanasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1147 NOTICE by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs And Nichicon And Rubycon Defendants Local Rule 7-13 Notice Regarding Submitted Proposed Orders For Final Approval Of Settlement And Final Judgment Of Dismissal (Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1146 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1142 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony and Exhibits [REDACTED] ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1145 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Franklin Bozdech on behalf of Flextronics International USA, Inc. (Bozdech, Joseph) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 15, 2020 Filing 1144 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 13, 2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1136 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1133 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1141 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1135 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1134 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1139 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1131 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt 1142 [Petition to Disclose Grand Jury Testimony] filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Farrah Berse, #2 Petition to Disclose Grand Jury Testimony [UNREDACTED], #3 Petition to Disclose Grand Jury Testimony [REDACTED], #4 Proposed Order Granting Petition [UNREDACTED], #5 Proposed Order Granting Petition [REDACTED], #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1142 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony and Exhibits [REDACTED] filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. Responses due by 2/20/2020. Replies due by 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1141 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/13/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 FOR DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/14/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1139 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/13/2020 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1138 Letter from Steven N. Williams re: Disputed Jury Instruction No. 43A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Pretrial Conference No. 3 held on 2/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 11:00 AM. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1136 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/13/2020 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/13/2020 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1134 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/13/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1133 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/13/2020 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1132 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Breton Leone-Quick ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14180051.) filed by AVX Corporation. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1131 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/13/2020 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1130 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/13/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 1129 Request for Judicial Notice re #1120 Request for Judicial Notice,, Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven N. Williams)(Related document(s) #1120 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1128 REPLY (re #1096 MOTION for Hearing TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS INTRODUCTION OF UNDISCLOSED, DUPLICATIVE AND NEEDLESSLY CUMULATIVE EXPERT EVIDENCE AT TRIAL ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joshua P. Davis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1127 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1110 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Dr. Darrell Williams and for Protective Order, ) of Certain Defendants filed byTaitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1126 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Anne Brammer Webb on behalf of Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd. (Webb, Margaret) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1125 Exhibit List Amended Joint Trial Exhibit List by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Admissible Trial Exhibit List, #2 Disputed Trial Exhibit List)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1124 Response re #1088 Trial Brief byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1123 Proposed Jury Instructions by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs FINAL. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1122 Proposed Jury Instructions by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs PRELIMINARY. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1121 Joinder re #1110 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Dr. Darrell Williams and for Protective Order, by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1120 Request for Judicial Notice of Plea Agreements and Associated Judgments filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven N. Williams, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1119 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Arrow Electronics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate NIC Components Corporation, Other Affiliate Richardson RFPD for Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1118 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to (2520 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) MOTION in Limine Defendants' Omnibus Motions in Limine and DPPs' Responses Thereto, (1085 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) MOTION in Limine Defendants' Omnibus Motions in Limine and DPPs' Responses Thereto. Motion Hearing moved to 2/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1117 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1096 MOTION for Hearing TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS INTRODUCTION OF UNDISCLOSED, DUPLICATIVE AND NEEDLESSLY CUMULATIVE EXPERT EVIDENCE AT TRIAL ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric R. Sega ISO Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Preclude, #2 Exhibit 1 to Sega Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Sega Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Sega Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Sega Declaration)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #1112 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexandra G. Calistri. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #1111 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shawn N. Skolky. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1114 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Arrow Electronics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate NIC Components Corporation, Other Affiliate Richardson RFPD for Arrow Electronics, Inc.. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15 and Federal Rule 7.1(a) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 ORDER. The proposed jury instructions for the DPP trial are not in a form suitable for discussion at the final pretrial conference. The parties are directed to jointly file a revised set that separates preliminary and final instructions, and that follows the Ninth Circuit model instructions as closely as possible. Please consult the Court's prior instructions for guidance. The parties may propose a custom instruction only if there is no circuit model. To the greatest extent possible, any custom instruction should draw on an established source, such as the ABA antitrust model instructions. Do not put any entries re "given" etc., or a signature line for the Court, on the proposed instructions. The revised instructions should be filed by 12:00 pm on February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 02/03/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1112 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Alexandra G. Calistri ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14127896.) filed by AVX Corporation. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1111 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Shawn N. Skolky ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14127866.) filed by AVX Corporation. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1110 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Dr. Darrell Williams and for Protective Order, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 2/13/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly M. Donovan, #2 Exhibit A to Donovan Decl. - Subpoena, #3 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1109 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/7/2019 before Judge James Donato by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1108 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-23-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2532 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2020. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 23, 2020 before Judge James Donato by Shizuki Electric Co., Ltd, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Nangia, Sanjay) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1106 Proposed Order re 1105 Order,,, Terminate Hearings,, by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER. The Court finds the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class's Supplemental Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses, MDL Dkt. No. 1046, to be suitable for decision without oral argument under Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), and vacates the hearing that was set for January 30, 2020. DPPs' counsel are directed to file a proposed order and email a copy to jdpo@cand.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/28/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1104 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S Elias on behalf of Walker Component Group, Inc. (Elias, Jordan) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/23/2020 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1102 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/23/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/23/2020 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1099 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/23/2020 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1098 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/23/2020 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing & Pretrial Conference No. 2 held on 1/23/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1097 Letter from Defendants re DPPs' Pretrial Filings. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1096 MOTION for Hearing TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS INTRODUCTION OF UNDISCLOSED, DUPLICATIVE AND NEEDLESSLY CUMULATIVE EXPERT EVIDENCE AT TRIAL filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Capacitors Examples of Overlap in Defense Expert Opinions, #2 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER. The Court continues the hearing on the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' motion for final approval of settlements, MDL Dkt. No. 1063, and motion for attorneys' fees, expenses, and service awards, MDL Dkt. No. 1011, to April 16, 2020, at 10 a.m., after the claims period has closed. IPPs' counsel are directed to file an update by April 9, 2020, with the information requested in the "Class Members' Response" section of the N.D. Cal. Procedural Guidance for Class Action Settlements. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/22/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1094 Exhibit List Joint Trial Exhibit List by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1093 Proposed Jury Instructions by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1092 TRIAL BRIEF by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1091 Pretrial Conference Statement by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1090 MOTION in Limine filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/4/2020. Replies due by 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Opp to DPP MIL 1, #2 Redacted Version of Defendants' Exhibits ISO Opp to MIL 2, #3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Exhibits ISO Opp to MIL 7)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal on behalf of Defendants' filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Omnibus DPP MILs, #4 Unredacted Omnibus DPP MILs, #5 Redacted Version of Defendants' Opp to MIL 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Opp to MIL 2, #7 Redacted Version of Defendants' Opp to MIL 7, #8 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Opp to MIL 7)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1088 TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' Joint and Individual Supplemental Trial Briefs by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1087 Witness List by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Trial Witness List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1086 Proposed Voir Dire by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd. Joint Proposed Voir Dire Questions. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1085 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Omnibus Motions in Limine and DPPs' Responses Thereto filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration Ex. 1 - Nyong'o Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2, #3 Declaration Ex. 2 - Enson Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5, #4 Declaration Ex. 3 - Tatoy Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 9, #5 Declaration Ex. 4 - Hasskamp Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 10, #6 Declaration Ex. 5 - Enson Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 11)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1084 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Direct Purchaser Class's Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Settlement Administration Fees and Expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 2/4/2020. Replies due by 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason M. Stinehart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 ORDER. Witness Kakizaki's deposition will go forward on January 27, 2020. Counsel has established good cause for that in this circumstance, MDL Dkt. No. 1082, but the Court expects that similar delays will not be encountered for other witnesses. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/17/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1082 Letter from Joseph J. Bial to Judge James Donato. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1081 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1037 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 ORDER. In response to the deposition letter, MDL Dkt. No. 1079, the Court expects the parties will work together to the fullest extent possible on scheduling issues. The Court believes that seven to eight calendar days of notice for a deposition should accommodate the needs of both sides. Defendants are reminded that any witness not made available pursuant to the terms of the Court's order, MDL Dkt. No. 1076, will not be allowed to withdraw the assertion of the privilege or testify at trial. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/17/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1079 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri to Judge James Donato regarding the Court's Order re Fifth Amendment Assertions. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1078 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Nadel - Notice of Appearance of Counsel Ralph A. Campillo (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1077 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1023 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Avnet and Panasonic Regarding Case Schedule filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed amended case schedule)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER RE FIFTH AMENDMENT ASSERTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/15/2020. (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 1075 REPLY (re #1045 MOTION Order allowing Mr. Noriaki Kakizaki to testify substantively at trial and precluding evidence that Mr. Kakizaki had previously invoked his Fifth Amendment rights at an earlier deposition ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #1073 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David D. Cross. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1073 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14050919.) filed by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Cross, David) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1072 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra H Shear (Shear, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 FOR DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/7/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1069 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1045 MOTION Order allowing Mr. Noriaki Kakizaki to testify substantively at trial and precluding evidence that Mr. Kakizaki had previously invoked his Fifth Amendment rights at an earlier deposition ) Direct Purchaser Class's Opposition to Defendants Nippon Chemi-Con Corp.'s and United Chemi-Con, Inc.'s Motion for an Order (I) Allowing Noriaki Kakizaki to Testify Substantively at Trial and (II) Precluding Plaintiffs From Offering Evidence of Mr. Kakizaki's Prior Invocation of His Fifth Amendment Rights at an Earlier Deposition filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher K.L. Young, #2 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1068 MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS KEMET AND SHIZUKI filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A - E to Saveri Dec, #3 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra, #4 Exhibit A - C Zylstra Dec, #5 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1067 Proposed Order re #1063 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Panasonic Defendants by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1066 Proposed Order re #1063 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Nichicon Defendants by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1065 Proposed Order re #1063 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd. by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1064 Proposed Order re #1063 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Elna Defendants by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1063 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements With Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1062 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1045 MOTION Order allowing Mr. Noriaki Kakizaki to testify substantively at trial and precluding evidence that Mr. Kakizaki had previously invoked his Fifth Amendment rights at an earlier deposition ) on Behalf of DAPs filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Jaco Electronics Incorporated, The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1061 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/2/2020, before Judge James Donato. Court ReporterKatherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1056 Transcript Order, #1054 Transcript Order, #1051 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2020. (Related documents(s) #1056 , #1054 , #1051 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #1055 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexandra Shear. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1059 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 2, 2020 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1058 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/02/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1057 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/02/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1056 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/2/2020 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1070 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Pretrial Conference No. 1 held on 1/2/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1055 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14033205.) filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Shear, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1054 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/02/2020 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Powell. (Reddy, Anupama) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1053 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Blanquez (Blanquez, Luis) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1052 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/2/2020 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1051 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/2/2020 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Nissei Electronic Co. LTD., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1050 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Andrew Hasskamp (Hasskamp, Luke) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1049 NOTICE of Appearance by David Charles Codell (Codell, David) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1048 Statement In Advance of Pretrial Conference by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1047 Pretrial Conference Statement by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Initial Pretrial Conference Statement. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1046 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2020. Replies due by 1/16/2020. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1045 MOTION Order allowing Mr. Noriaki Kakizaki to testify substantively at trial and precluding evidence that Mr. Kakizaki had previously invoked his Fifth Amendment rights at an earlier deposition filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/6/2020. Replies due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 to Berse Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Berse Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Berse Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Berse Decl., #7 Exhibit 5 to Berse Decl., #8 Exhibit 6 to Berse Decl., #9 Exhibit 7 to Berse Decl., #10 Exhibit 8 to Berse Decl., #11 Exhibit 9 to Berse Decl., #12 Exhibit 10 to Berse Decl., #13 Exhibit 11 to Berse Decl., #14 Exhibit 12 to Berse Decl.)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1044 Declaration of Christopher K.L.Young in Support of #1043 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #1043 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1043 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1030 MOTION to (1) Admit Trial Testimony and (2) Preclude Evidence of Prior Invocations of the Fifth Amendment of Messrs. Inoue, Kinoshita, Imai, and Okubo ) Opp.to ELNA-Matsuo Motion to Admit: Preclude Fifth Am. Testimony filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1042 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1030 MOTION to (1) Admit Trial Testimony and (2) Preclude Evidence of Prior Invocations of the Fifth Amendment of Messrs. Inoue, Kinoshita, Imai, and Okubo ) filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1041 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1030 MOTION to (1) Admit Trial Testimony and (2) Preclude Evidence of Prior Invocations of the Fifth Amendment of Messrs. Inoue, Kinoshita, Imai, and Okubo ) on Behalf of Certain DAPs filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Jaco Electronics Incorporated, The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert W. Turken, #2 Exhibit A)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 ORDER. The original trial date was continued shortly before the pretrial filings were due, and the continuance has been of a brief duration. Consequently, the Court is confident the parties can pick up trial preparation where they left off, with ample time to be fully prepared for trial in March 2020. There are a variety of ways to handle a witness with a genuine scheduling conflict, so that will not be a problem. An initial pretrial conference is set for January 2, 2020, at 1:30 pm to help focus and streamline trial preparation. The parties may file by December 30, 2019, a joint statement identifying any issues they would like to discuss at the conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/9/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/12/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/17/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/18/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/23/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/24/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/25/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/26/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/31/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1039 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Reset Trial Date filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. Responses due by 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric P. Enson, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Proposed Order)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/17/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 ORDER. In light of an opening in the Court's docket, the DPP trial is restored to roughly the previous date. Jury selection and trial will begin on 03/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11. The pretrial conference is set for 02/13/2020 at 01:30 PM. All pretrial filings must be completed no later than 01/20/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/17/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF SPECIAL MASTER IP ON THE DPP COUNSEL'S REQUEST FOR FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/16/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1035 CLERK'S NOTICE. Motion hearing on #1017 Motion Requesting Consideration of and Decision on KEMET's MSJ re-set for 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM, per defendants' notice, Dkt. No. 1025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1034 Discovery Letter Brief Response to Direct Purchaser Class Motion to Quash Cisco and Aptivs Subpoena filed by Aptiv Services US, LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1033 Discovery Letter Brief Motion to Quash Cisco and Aptivs Subpoena filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Reddy, Anupama) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1032 REPLY (re #1017 MOTION Requesting Consideration of and Decision on KEMET's MSJ ) filed byHoly Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1031 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1029 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Enlarge Time to File Objection to the Special Masters Supplemental Report and Recommendation; Reply In Support of Motion to Enlarge Time to File Objection to the Special Masters Sup ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1030 MOTION to (1) Admit Trial Testimony and (2) Preclude Evidence of Prior Invocations of the Fifth Amendment of Messrs. Inoue, Kinoshita, Imai, and Okubo filed by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Ceremonial Courtroom, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/20/2019. Replies due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather Nyong'o, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Order)(Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1029 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Enlarge Time to File Objection to the Special Masters Supplemental Report and Recommendation; Reply In Support of Motion to Enlarge Time to File Objection to the Special Masters Supplemental Report and Recommendation re #1014 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to the Special Master's Supplemental Report and Recommendation filed by Aptiv Services US, LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse In Support of Cisco and Aptivs Administrative Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Their Motion to Enlarge Time to File Objection to the Special Masters Supplemental Report and Recommendation, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order Granting Cisco and Aptivs Administrative Motion for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Motion to Enlarge Time to File Objection to the Special Masters Supplemental Report and Recommendation)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1028 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1017 MOTION Requesting Consideration of and Decision on KEMET's MSJ ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1027 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants KEMET Corporation and KEMET Electronics Corporation's #679 Motion for Summary Judgment (Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1026 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1017 MOTION Requesting Consideration of and Decision on KEMET's MSJ ) on behalf of Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Turken, Robert) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1025 NOTICE by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd. re #1017 MOTION Requesting Consideration of and Decision on KEMET's MSJ (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1024 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1014 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to the Special Master's Supplemental Report and Recommendation ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. Dallal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Declaration of Anupama K. Reddy)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1023 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Avnet and Panasonic Regarding Case Schedule filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed amended case schedule)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1022 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1020 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re (307 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1021 MOTION re #1019 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re (498 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Adopt the Report and Recommendations of Special Master on the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class Counsel's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/9/2019. Replies due by 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1020 Report and Recommendations of Special Master on the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class Counsels Request for Reimbursement of Expenses. Objections due by 12/6/2019. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1019 Report and Recommendations of Special Master on the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class Counsels Request for Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Objections due by 12/6/2019. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1018 RESPONSE re #995 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1017 MOTION Requesting Consideration of and Decision on KEMET's MSJ filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/5/2019. Replies due by 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric P. Enson, #2 Exhibit 1-3, #3 Proposed Order)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1016 REPLY (re #992 MOTION for Decertification of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class re #385 Order, Terminate Motions ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1015 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 7, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Arrow Electronics, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1014 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to the Special Master's Supplemental Report and Recommendation filed by Aptiv Services US, LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1013 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 7, 2019 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1012 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/07/19, before Judge James J. Donato. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1004 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2020. (Related documents(s) #1004 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1011 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/29/2019. Replies due by 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of IPPs Motion for Attorneys Fees. Expenses, and Service Awards, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ben Barenz, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Gilvan Angelini, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of John Schneider, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jorge Valdes, #7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Mark McClure, #8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Mark Williams, #9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Matt Schwamb, #10 Exhibit I - Declaration of Michael Brooks, #11 Exhibit J - Declaration of Peter Miller, #12 Exhibit K - Declaration of Steve Wong)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of IPPs Administrative Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1009 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Kar-Lun Young on behalf of DPPs' (Young, Christopher) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1008 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri to Judge James Donato regarding KEMET Settlement Agreement. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #996 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Kam. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1006 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #992 MOTION for Decertification of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class re #385 Order, Terminate Motions ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1005 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/7/2019 before Judge James Donato by HOLY STONE POLYTECH CO. LTD., Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1004 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/07/2019 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Crump, Daniel) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1003 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/07/2019 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1002 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/07/2019 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1001 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/07/2019 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1000 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/07/2019 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 999 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 11/7/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 998 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Taitsu Corporation and Taitsu America, Inc. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 997 NOTICE by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (MARC E. FOTO) (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 996 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Kam ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13853687.) filed by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kam, Stephen) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 995 Special Master's Supplemental Report and Recommendation.Signed by Special Master Jeffrey L. Bleich on 10/28/2019. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 994 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Conference Statement by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 993 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt Nos. 992 and 992-3 filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Sega, #2 REDACTED Motion for Decertification, #3 UNREDACTED Motion for Decertification, #4 REDACTED Exhibit 2, #5 UNREDACTED Exhibit 2, #6 Proposed Order)(Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 992 MOTION for Decertification of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class re #385 Order, Terminate Motions filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/12/2019. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 [REDACTED], #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 991 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri to Judge James Donato regarding Shizuki Settlement Agreement. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 990 NOTICE by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel Ryan A. Shores (Petkoski, Djordje) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 989 ORDER. The Court sets a status conference for November 7, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. to discuss scheduling issues. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/21/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 988 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES filed by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 987 NOTICE by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Petkoski, Djordje) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 986 ORDER re (984 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Motion to Appoint Expert Pursuant to FRE 706. Defendants' expert appointment request is denied. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/4/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 985 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion)(Related document(s) #914 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 984 MOTION to Appoint Expert Pursuant to FRE 706 filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/17/2019. Replies due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Sega, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 983 Supplemental Brief of Film-Only Defendants in Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Redacted) filed byTaitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 982 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Film-Only Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Film-Only Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Unredacted Version of Film-Only Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER RE CISCO AND APTIV'S OBJECTION TO SECTION D OF THE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, AND DPPS' RESPONSE. The Court would like the Special Master to address the discussion in MDL Docket Nos. 902 and 930, and submit a supplemental report within 30 days if his schedule permits. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/25/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 980 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 979 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #925 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Roberto Finzi. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #924 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Farrah R. Berse. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 977 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #926 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Theodore V. Wells, Jr.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 976 NOTICE by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd. re #674 MOTION for Summary Judgment on DAPs' Claims Redacted of Filing Joint Fact Statement Chart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 975 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fact Statement Chart re Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Fact Statement Chart, #4 Unredacted Fact Statement Chart)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 974 NOTICE by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd. re #671 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal of Filing Joint Fact Statement Chart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 973 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fact Statement Chart re Holy Stone's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Fact Statement Chart, #4 Unredacted Fact Statement Chart)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 972 Appendix re #651 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byAVX Corporation. (Related document(s) #651 ) (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 971 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of AVX Corporation's and Direct Action Plaintiffs' Joint Statement of Fact Chart Related to AVX's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert G. Kidwell, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Factual Statement Chart (Redacted), #5 Factual Statement Chart (Sealed))(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 970 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR FILING UNDER PROVISIONAL SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF FACTUAL STATEMENT CHART filed by Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Loomis, C.) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 969 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR FILING UNDER PROVISIONAL SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF FACTUAL STATEMENT CHART filed by Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. Responses due by 9/23/2019. (Loomis, C.) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 968 Appendix re #655 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SALLY QIN; PROPOSED ORDER /FILING OF FACTUAL STATEMENT CHART FOR FILM ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION filed bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Related document(s) #655 ) (Loomis, C.) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 967 Appendix re #676 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI AIC INC., AND HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byHitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Redacted Version])(Related document(s) #676 ) (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 966 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Hitachi Chemical's Factual Statement Chart In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 676 filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin Cohen, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Hitachi Chemical's Factual Statement Chart In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 676, #4 Unredacted Version of Hitachi Chemical's Factual Statement Chart In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 676)(Pak, Chul) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 965 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt Nos. 964-1 and 964-2 filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Sega, #2 Exhibit 1 [NCC SJ Facts Chart UNDER SEAL], #3 Errata 2 [UCC SJ Facts Chart UNDER SEAL], #4 Proposed Order)(Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 964 Appendix re #656 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #665 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [NCC SJ Facts Chart], #2 Exhibit 2 [UCC SJ Facts Chart])(Related document(s) #656 , #665 ) (Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 963 Appendix re #627 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byNichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Related document(s) #627 ) (Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 962 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Factual Statement Chart filed by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martinez, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Factual Statement Chart, #4 Unredacted Version of Factual Statement Char)(Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 961 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 17, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Avnet, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 960 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 17, 2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (945 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2019. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 959 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 958 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 17, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 957 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Concurrent Expert Witness Proceeding held on 9/17/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 956 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 955 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Weiss, Mark) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 954 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Arrow Electronics, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 953 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 952 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 17, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Nissei Electronic Co. LTD., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 951 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 950 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 949 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Submission of Demonstratives Used During Concurrent Expert Witness Proceeding Held on September 17, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 948 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 947 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 946 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 945 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 944 Appendix re #685 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment against Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs [Factual Statement Chart] filed byTaitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Related document(s) #685 ) (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 943 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Factual Statement Chart for Film-Only Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment on IPPs' Claims (ECF 685) filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 FODs' Summary Judgment chart with IPP insertions (Redacted), #4 FODs' Summary Judgment chart with IPP insertions (Under Seal))(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 942 NOTICE by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd. of Filing of Joint Factual Statement Chart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 941 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Fact Statement Chart, #4 Unredacted Fact Statement Chart)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 940 Appendix re #687 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Film-Only Defendants as to DPP Claims [Factual Statement Chart] filed byTaitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Related document(s) #687 ) (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 939 Appendix re #679 MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted Version of Filing of Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byKEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Related document(s) #679 ) (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 938 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by KEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura C. Hurtado in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Granting KEMET's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Filing of Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Filing of Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 937 Appendix JOINT FACTUAL STATEMENT CHART filed byShizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 936 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Factual Statement Chart for Film-Only Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment on DPPs' Claims (ECF 687) filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 FODs' Summary Judgment chart with DPP insertions (Redacted), #4 FODs' Summary Judgment chart with DPP insertions (Under Seal))(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 935 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Statement of Fact Charts Related to NCC and UCC Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Sega, #2 Exhibit 1 [NCC SJ Fact Chart Public], #3 Exhibit 1 [NCC SJ Fact Chart Under Seal], #4 Exhibit 2 [UCC SJ Fact Chart Public], #5 Exhibit 2 [UCC SJ Fact Chart Under Seal], #6 Proposed Order)(Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 934 Appendix re #656 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #665 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Fact Charts filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [NCC SJ Fact Charts], #2 Exhibit 2 [UCC SJ Fact Charts])(Related document(s) #656 , #665 ) (Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 933 CLERK'S NOTICE. The concurrent expert witness proceeding is re-set for 10:00 a.m. on September 17, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 932 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AVX Corporation re #931 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of AVX Corporation's Statement of Fact Chart Related to AVX's Motion for Summary Judgment (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 931 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of AVX Corporation's Statement of Fact Chart Related to AVX's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert G. Kidwell, #2 Proposed Order, #3 AVX summary judgment chart with DPP insertions (Under Seal), #4 AVX summary judgment chart with DPP insertions (Redacted))(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 930 RESPONSE re #902 Objection Direct Purchaser Class's Reply to Cisco and Aptiv's Objections to Section D of the Special Master's Report and Recommendation by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER granting (923 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Stipulation Between DAPs and Certain Defendants Regarding Case Schedule. The jointly requested one-week extension is granted, and the DAP-specific charts are due by September 23, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/12/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 928 ORDER granting (189 in 3:17-cv-07047-JD) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 927 ORDER granting IPPs' Administrative Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 926 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Theodore Wells Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13693839.) filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 925 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Roberto Finzi ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13693821.) filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 924 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Farrah Berse ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13693716.) filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 923 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between DAPs and Certain Defendants Regarding Case Schedule filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Turken, Robert) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 922 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPanasonic Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 921 Supplemental Brief re #920 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (IPPs' Admin Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review) Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Report and Materials to the Special Master (Monica Ip) in Support of Their Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO Supplemental Report and Materials to the Special Master (Monica Ip) ISO Their Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - 57)(Related document(s) #920 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 920 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (IPPs' Admin Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO IPPs' Admin Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 45, #15 Exhibit 46, #16 Exhibit 47, #17 Exhibit 48, #18 Exhibit 49, #19 Exhibit 50, #20 Exhibit 51, #21 Exhibit 52, #22 Exhibit 53, #23 Exhibit 54, #24 Exhibit 55, #25 Exhibit 56, #26 Exhibit 57)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 919 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 918 ERRATA re #656 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 917 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EX 35A To Errata [Dkt 916-1] filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Sega, #2 Exhibit 35A [REDACTED], #3 Exhibit 35A [UNREDACTED], #4 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 916 ERRATA re #665 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Ex 35 to Tatoy Declaration) by United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 35A)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 915 NOTICE by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd. re #828 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 914 Supplemental Brief Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification [REDACTED] filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 913 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #3 Redacted Version, #4 Submitted Under Seal, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 912 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #910 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John M. Majoras. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER. The Court finds that the ACPERA motion, Dkt. No. 407, is more suitably resolved at a later date. It is terminated without prejudice to refiling after discussion with the Court at a status conference. The hearing set for August 29, 2019, is VACATED. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/28/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 910 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26JPFF76.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/27/2019 filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Majoras, John) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 909 ORDER re #902 Cisco and Aptiv's Objection to Section D of the Special Master's Report and Recommendation. The Court calls for a response from the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by September 12, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/27/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER granting (907 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Stipulation to Withdraw Panasonic's Motion for a Determination that the Panasonic Defendants Have Satisfied ACPERA to Date (re: MDL ECF No. 643). Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/26/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 907 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Withdrawing Panasonic's Motion for a Determination that the Panasonic Defendants Have Satisfied ACPERA to Date (re: MDL ECF No. 643), filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 906 Joinder re #905 Reply to Opposition/Response, in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 905 REPLY (re #652 Joint MOTION to Strike CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX ) filed byHitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration JUSTIN A. COHEN, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit J)(Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 904 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration JUSTIN A. COHEN, #2 Proposed Order, #3 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX (redacted), #4 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX (unredacted), #5 Exhibit H to Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #6 Exhibit I to Declaration of Justin A. Cohen)(Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER MONICA IP. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/23/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 902 OBJECTIONS to re #821 Special Masters Order by Aptiv Services US, LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 901 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Claims, filed byPanasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 900 NOTICE by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Paul C. Southwick (Southwick, Paul) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 899 EXHIBITS re #636 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byShizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit)(Related document(s) #636 ) (Fendall, Kaley) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 898 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc. re #869 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) (Fendall, Kaley) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 897 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd. re #866 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Defendants' Reply Brief, #845 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony as to the Holy Stone Defendants, #889 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Holy Stone's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 896 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #894 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket #891 (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 895 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation re #877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to Reply in Support of Certain Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment,, #883 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to Reply in Support of Certain Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave, (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 894 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket #891 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of James Dallal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Simons Reply Brief, #5 Unredacted Version of Simons Reply Brief, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D)(Dallal, James) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 893 REPLY (re #680 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byHoly Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Enson, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20-26 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28 Redacted, #7 Exhibit 29 Redacted, #8 Exhibit 30, #9 Exhibit 31, #10 Exhibit 32 Redacted, #11 Exhibit 33, #12 Exhibit 34, #13 Exhibit 35, #14 Exhibit 36 Redacted, #15 Exhibit 37 Redacted, #16 Exhibit 38, #17 Exhibit 39)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 892 REPLY (re #672 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class and IPPs' Motion to Exclude, in part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of James Dallal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 891 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Direct Purchaser Class and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude, in Part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of James Dallal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Simons Reply Brief, #5 Unredacted Version of Simons Reply Brief, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 890 REPLY (re #685 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment against Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs ) filed byTaitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Gott, Aaron) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 889 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Holy Stone's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply ISO Holy Stone Defendants' MSJ, #4 Unredacted Reply ISO Holy Stone Defendants' MSJ, #5 Exhibit 20 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 20 Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 21 Redacted, #8 Exhibit 21 Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 22 Redacted, #10 Exhibit 22 Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 23 Redacted, #12 Exhibit 23 Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 24 Redacted, #14 Exhibit 24 Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 25 Redacted, #16 Exhibit 25 Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 26 Redacted, #18 Exhibit 26 Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 28 Redacted, #20 Exhibit 28 Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 29 Redacted, #22 Exhibit 29 Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 32 Redacted, #24 Exhibit 32 Unredacted, #25 Exhibit 36 Redacted, #26 Exhibit 36 Unredacted, #27 Exhibit 37 Redacted, #28 Exhibit 37 Unredacted)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 888 REPLY (re #689 Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell Lamb ) filed byTaitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Gott, Aaron) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 887 REPLY (re #687 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Film-Only Defendants as to DPP Claims ) filed byTaitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Gott, Aaron) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 886 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Film-Only Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment as to IPP Claims, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Film-Only Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment as to IPP Claims, #5 Exhibit 1 under seal, #6 Exhibit 2 under seal, #7 Exhibit 3 under seal, #8 Exhibit 4 under seal, #9 Exhibit 5 under seal, #10 Exhibit 6 under seal, #11 Exhibit 7 under seal, #12 Exhibit 8 under seal, #13 Exhibit 9 under seal, #14 Exhibit 10 under seal, #15 Exhibit 11 under seal)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 885 REPLY (re #661 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave by Defendants (redacted), ) (Redacted version) filed byPanasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin C. Geagan in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit 1 (under seal))(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 884 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Certain Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb, #4 Unredacted Version of Certain Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb, #5 Exhibit 1 under seal, #6 Exhibit 2 under seal, #7 Exhibit 3 under seal, #8 Exhibit 4 under seal, #9 Exhibit 5 under seal, #10 Exhibit 6 under seal, #11 Exhibit 7 under seal, #12 Exhibit 8 under seal)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 883 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to Reply in Support of Certain Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick S. Opdyke, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Martin C. Geagan in Support of Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave)(Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 882 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Film-Only Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment as to DPP claims, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Film-Only Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment as to DPP claims, #5 Exhibit 1 under seal, #6 Exhibit 2 under seal, #7 Exhibit 3 under seal, #8 Exhibit 4 under seal, #9 Exhibit 5 under seal, #10 Exhibit 6 under seal, #11 Exhibit 7 under seal, #12 Exhibit 8 under seal, #13 Exhibit 9 under seal, #14 Exhibit 10 under seal, #15 Exhibit 11 under seal)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 881 Joinder re #858 Reply to Opposition/Response in Support of Joint Motion to Exclude the Proposed Testimony of Dr. Hal J. Singer by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 880 Joinder re #863 Reply to Opposition/Response in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Joseph P. Russoniello by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 879 REPLY (re #673 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Certain Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment Against Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Claims, ) (Redacted) filed byPanasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 878 Joinder re #846 Reply to Opposition/Response, in Support of Joint Motion to Exclude the Proposed Testimony of Dr. Leslie M. Marx by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to Reply in Support of Certain Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sofia Arguello, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Certain Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Certain Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment)(Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 876 REPLY (re #676 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI AIC INC., AND HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) filed byHitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Justin A. Cohen, #2 Ex 46 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #3 Ex 47 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #4 Ex 48 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #5 Ex 49 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #6 Ex 50 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #7 Ex 51 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #8 Ex 52 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #9 Ex 53 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #10 Ex 54 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #11 Ex 55 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #12 Ex 56 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #13 Ex 57 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen)(Pak, Chul) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 875 REPLY (re #640 MOTION to Strike (IPPs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton, #2 Exhibit 1)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 874 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil and Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton - Redacted, #4 Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton - Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 873 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Justin A. Cohen, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Ex 53 (sealed), #4 Ex 54 (sealed), #5 Ex 55 (sealed), #6 Ex 56 (sealed))(Pak, Chul) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 872 REPLY (re #674 MOTION for Summary Judgment on DAPs' Claims Redacted ) filed byMilestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 871 REPLY (re #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byShizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kaley L. Fendall, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Fendall, Kaley) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 870 REPLY (re #648 MOTION TO EXCLUDE the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover ) filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Exhibits 1-5 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 6 to Tompkins Declaration, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 869 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kaley L. Fendall, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Fendall, Kaley) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 868 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NCC Reply ISO MSJ filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Sega, #2 [REDACTED] Reply ISO NCC MSJ, #3 [UNREDACTED] Reply ISO NCC MSJ, #4 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 867 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Janusz A. Ordover, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Janusz A. Ordover, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 2, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 4, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 5)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 866 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Defendants' Reply Brief filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply Brief ISO Certain Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Reply Brief ISO Certain Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 865 REPLY (re #679 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byKEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 864 REPLY (re #656 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 863 REPLY (re #681 Joint MOTION for Joinder in Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Proposed Testimony of Joseph P. Russoniello ) filed byElna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 862 REPLY (re #655 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SALLY QIN; PROPOSED ORDER ) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF SALLY QIN IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sally Qin in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 36 (Under seal), #3 Exhibit 37 (Under seal), #4 Exhibit 38, #5 Exhibit 39 (Under seal), #6 Exhibit 40 (Under seal), #7 Exhibit 41 (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 42 (Under seal), #9 Exhibit 43, #10 Exhibit 44, #11 Exhibit 45, #12 Exhibit 46 (Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 47, #14 Exhibit 48)(Loomis, C.) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 861 REPLY (re #665 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byUnited Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 860 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Singer filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Sega, #2 [REDACTED Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Singer], #3 [UNREDACTED Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Singer], #4 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 859 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal REPLY IN SUPPORT OF FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; REPLY DECLARATION OF SALLY QIN filed by Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sally Qin, #2 Exhibit 36 to Qin Declaration (Sealed), #3 Exhibit 37 to Qin Declaration (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 38 to Qin Declaration, #5 Exhibit 39 to Qin Declaration (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 40 to Qin Declaration, #7 Exhibit 41 to Qin Declaration (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 42 to Qin Declaration (Sealed), #9 Exhibit 43 to Qin Declaration, #10 Exhibit 44 to Qin Declaration, #11 Exhibit 45 to Qin Declaration, #12 Exhibit 46 to Qin Declaration (Sealed), #13 Exhibit 47 to Qin Declaration, #14 Exhibit 48 to Qin Declaration, #15 Redacted Version of Reply, #16 Unredacted Sealed Version of Reply)(Loomis, C.) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 858 REPLY (re #647 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hal J. Singer ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 857 REPLY (re #630 MOTION to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony ) filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibits A-B to Turken Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 856 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 855 REPLY (re #642 MOTION TO EXCLUDE Portions of the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Spencer L. Simons ) filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Spencer L. Simons, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Spencer L. Simons)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 853 REPLY (re #651 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 852 REPLY (re #625 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony ) filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibits A-B to Turken Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 851 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert G. Kidwell in Support of AVX's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Defendant AVX Corporation's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment [Redacted], #5 Defendant AVX Corporation's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment [Sealed], #6 Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky in Support of Defendant AVX Corporation's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky [Redacted], #8 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky [Sealed], #9 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky [Redacted], #10 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky [Sealed])(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 850 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 849 REPLY (re #643 MOTION for a Determination that the Panasonic Defendants have Satisfied ACPERA to Date ) filed byPanasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly M. Donovan in Support of Reply)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 848 REPLY (re #627 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byNichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 847 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Nichicon (America) Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, and Nichicon Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Donahue, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2)(Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 846 REPLY (re #664 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. L. Marx (Redacted) ) The Holy Stone Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie Marx as to the Holy Stone Defendants filed byHoly Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 845 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony as to the Holy Stone Defendants filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich in Support of the Holy Stone Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of the Holy Stone Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie Marx as to the Holy Stone Defendants, #4 Unredacted Version of the Holy Stone Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony of Dr. Leslie Marx as to the Holy Stone Defendants)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 844 REPLY (re #669 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Partially Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Janusz A. Ordover ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 843 REPLY (re #623 MOTION to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton ) filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibits B-E to Turken Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 842 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 841 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Notice of Submission of Declaration of Monica IP (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 840 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bonnie Lau (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER granting (829 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION REGARDING DR. MARX DAUBERT BRIEFING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER granting (617 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Joint Administrative Motion for Permission for HP to Enlarge Time to Opt Out of the Litigation Class. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 837 ORDER granting Arrow Electronics Inc's Motion to Confirm Opt Out Status, or Alternatively, to Enlarge Its Time to Opt Out, MDL Dkt. No. 582. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS NOTICE PROGRAM. Fairness Hearing set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF IPPS' SETTLEMENTS WITH PANASONIC, NICHICON, ELNA, AND MATSUO DEFENDANTS, AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 834 ANSWER to Complaint of Arrow Electronics, Inc. bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Fornaciari, John) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 833 ANSWER to Complaint of Benchmark Electronics, Inc. bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Fornaciari, John) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 832 ANSWER to Complaint of Avnet, Inc. bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Fornaciari, John) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 831 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER granting Stipulation re Schedule for Supplemental Class Certification Briefing for IPP Actions, MDL Dkt. No. 824. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/6/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 829 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DR. MARX DAUBERT BRIEFING filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER RE CONCURRENT EXPERT WITNESS PROCEEDING. Set for 9/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/5/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 827 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 25, 2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (775 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (767 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (766 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (762 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (776 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (823 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (764 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (774 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (771 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (817 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (770 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (820 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (777 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2019. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 826 Letter from Certain Defendants and DPPs regarding September 17, 2019 expert proceeding . (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 825 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of Recent Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 824 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #819 Motion Hearing,, Status Conference,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Motions, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUPPLEMENTAL CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 823 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Nissei Electric Company Limited, Nissei Electronic Co. LTD., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 822 EXHIBITS re #816 Declaration in Support,,, filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 233-252)(Related document(s) #816 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 821 Special Master's Report and Recommendation (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 820 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 819 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on 7/25/2019. Motion hearing on MDL Dkt. Nos. 407 & 643 set for 8/29/2019 at 10 a.m. Status conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10 a.m. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 818 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #804 Opposition/Response to Motion, #810 Opposition/Response to Motion, #809 Opposition/Response to Motion, #808 Opposition/Response to Motion, #806 Opposition/Response to Motion, #807 Opposition/Response to Motion, #803 Opposition/Response to Motion, #813 Request for Judicial Notice, #805 Opposition/Response to Motion, #811 Declaration in Support,, #812 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Holy Stone Motion for Summary Judgment, #816 Declaration in Support,,, #815 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 817 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 25, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 816 Declaration in Support of #810 Opposition/Response to Motion, #809 Opposition/Response to Motion, #806 Opposition/Response to Motion, #807 Opposition/Response to Motion, #805 Opposition/Response to Motion, #804 Opposition/Response to Motion, #808 Opposition/Response to Motion, #803 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-30, #2 Exhibit 31-60, #3 Exhibit 61-80, #4 Exhibit 81-115, #5 Exhibit 116-145, #6 Exhibit 146-173, #7 Exhibit 174-178, #8 Exhibit 179, #9 Exhibit 180-209, #10 Exhibit 210-232, #11 Exhibit 253-295, #12 Exhibit 296-300, #13 Exhibit 301, #14 Exhibit 302-310)(Related document(s) #810 , #809 , #806 , #807 , #805 , #804 , #808 , #803 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 815 EXHIBITS re #799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted TX1-TX76, #2 Exhibit Unredacted TX1-TX17, #3 Exhibit Unredacted TX18-TX35, #4 Exhibit Unredacted TX36-TX60, #5 Exhibit Unredacted TX61-TX76, #6 Exhibit Redacted RJN 62, #7 Exhibit Unredacted RJN 62)(Related document(s) #799 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 814 Proposed Order re #804 Opposition/Response to Motion, #810 Opposition/Response to Motion, #809 Opposition/Response to Motion, #808 Opposition/Response to Motion, #806 Opposition/Response to Motion, #807 Opposition/Response to Motion, #803 Opposition/Response to Motion, #805 Opposition/Response to Motion by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 813 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Direct Purchaser Class's Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, #2 Exhibit 15-29, #3 Exhibit 30-45, #4 Exhibit 46-59, #5 Exhibit 60-71, #6 Exhibit 72-74, 76-82, #7 Exhibit 75)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 812 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Holy Stone Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted version Opposition to Holy Stone MSJ)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 811 Declaration in Support of #804 Opposition/Response to Motion, #810 Opposition/Response to Motion, #809 Opposition/Response to Motion, #808 Opposition/Response to Motion, #806 Opposition/Response to Motion, #807 Opposition/Response to Motion, #803 Opposition/Response to Motion, #805 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TX1-TX89)(Related document(s) #804 , #810 , #809 , #808 , #806 , #807 , #803 , #805 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 810 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #661 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave by Defendants (redacted),, #647 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hal J. Singer ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 809 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #681 Joint MOTION for Joinder in Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Proposed Testimony of Joseph P. Russoniello ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 808 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #665 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 807 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #651 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 806 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #656 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 805 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #687 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Film-Only Defendants as to DPP Claims ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 804 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #679 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 803 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #673 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Certain Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment Against Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Claims, ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 802 EXHIBITS re #799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted 233-252, #2 Exhibit Unredacted 233-252, #3 Exhibit Redacted 253-295, #4 Exhibit Unredacted 253-295, #5 Exhibit Redacted 296-300, #6 Exhibit Unredacted 296-300, #7 Exhibit Redacted 302-310, #8 Exhibit Unredacted 302-310)(Related document(s) #799 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 801 EXHIBITS re #799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted 146-173, #2 Exhibit Unredacted 146-173, #3 Exhibit Redacted 174-178, #4 Exhibit Unredacted 174-178, #5 Exhibit Redacted 179, #6 Exhibit Unredacted 179, #7 Exhibit Redacted 180-209, #8 Exhibit Unredacted 180-209, #9 Exhibit Redacted 210-232, #10 Exhibit Unredacted 210-232)(Related document(s) #799 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 800 EXHIBITS re #799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted 1-30, #2 Exhibit Redacted 1-30, #3 Exhibit Unredacted 31-60, #4 Exhibit Redacted 31-60, #5 Exhibit Unredacted 61-80, #6 Exhibit Redacted 61-80, #7 Exhibit Unredacted 81-115, #8 Exhibit Redacted 81-115, #9 Exhibit Unredacted 116-145, #10 Exhibit Redacted 116-145)(Related document(s) #799 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. Dallal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Certain Ds MSJ Opp, #5 Unredacted Certain Ds MSJ Opp, #6 Redacted KEMET MSJ Opp, #7 Unredacted KEMET MSJ Opp, #8 Redacted Film Ds MSJ Opp, #9 Unredacted Film Ds MSJ Opp, #10 Redacted NCC MSJ Opp, #11 Unredacted NCC MSJ Opp, #12 Redacted AVX MSJ Opp, #13 Unredacted AVX MSJ Opp, #14 Redacted UCC MSJ Opp, #15 Unredacted UCC MSJ Opp)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 798 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #643 MOTION for a Determination that the Panasonic Defendants have Satisfied ACPERA to Date ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 797 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #640 MOTION to Strike (IPPs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) ) filed byTaitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claire M. Maddox, #2 Exhibit 1 under seal, #3 Exhibit 2 under seal, #4 Exhibit 3 under seal, #5 Exhibit 4 under seal, #6 Exhibit 5 under seal, #7 Exhibit 6 under seal, #8 Exhibit 7 under seal, #9 Exhibit 8 under seal, #10 Exhibit 9 under seal, #11 Exhibit 10 under seal, #12 Exhibit 11 under seal, #13 Exhibit 12 under seal, #14 Exhibit 13 under seal, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16 under seal)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 796 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Film-Only Defendants' Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick Warren-Boulton filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Film-Only Defendants' Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton, #4 Unredacted Version of Film-Only Defendants' Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton, #5 Exhibit 1 under seal, #6 Exhibit 2 under seal, #7 Exhibit 3 under seal, #8 Exhibit 4 under seal, #9 Exhibit 5 under seal, #10 Exhibit 6 under seal, #11 Exhibit 7 under seal, #12 Exhibit 8 under seal, #13 Exhibit 9 under seal, #14 Exhibit 10 under seal, #15 Exhibit 11 under seal, #16 Exhibit 12 under seal, #17 Exhibit 13 under seal, #18 Exhibit 16 under seal)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 795 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #792 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #685 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment against Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs ) Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 794 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #642 MOTION TO EXCLUDE Portions of the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Spencer L. Simons, #672 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class and IPPs' Motion to Exclude, in part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons ) filed byKEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee Brand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit D (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit E (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit F)(Brand, Lee) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 793 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #685 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment against Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 - 75, #8 Exhibit 76 - 163, #9 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 792 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO Mtn to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment REDACTED, #4 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 4 - Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 5 - Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 6 - 75, #16 Exhibit 6 - 75 - Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 76 - 163, #18 Exhibit 76 - 163 - Under Seal, #19 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 791 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by KEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Certain Defendants' Opposition to Motions to Exclude Testimony of Spencer L. Simons, #4 Unredacted Version of Certain Defendants' Opposition to Motions to Exclude Testimony of Spencer L. Simons, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Brand, Lee) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 790 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #689 Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell Lamb ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 789 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO Mtn to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb Redacted, #4 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 4 - Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 5 - Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit 6 - Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 7, #18 Exhibit 7 - Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 8, #20 Exhibit 8 - Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 9, #22 Exhibit 9 - Under Seal, #23 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 788 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Their Response in Opposition to Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to strike Sur-Reply of Frederick Warren-Boulton filed by Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Redacted Version of Defendants Joint Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike, #3 Unredacted Version of Defendants Joint Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike, #4 Exhibit A Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit B Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit C Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F Filed Under Seal)(Loomis, C.) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 787 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #623 MOTION to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton ) FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE 'SUR-REPLY" OF FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON filed bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A filed under seal, #3 Exhibit B filed under seal, #4 Exhibit C filed under seal, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F filed under seal)(Loomis, C.) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 786 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Mot to Exclude Ordover and Exhibit 1 [ECF No. 783] filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara Hershman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [UNREDACTED Opposition to Motion to Exclude Ordover], #4 [REDACTED Opposition to Motion to Exclude Ordover], #5 Exhibit 1 to Tatoy Declaration [UNREDACTED])(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 785 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #630 MOTION to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony ) filed byHitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Justin A. Cohen, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Pak, Chul) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Justin A. Cohen, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 3 (sealed), #4 Exhibit 4 (sealed), #5 Exhibit 6 (sealed), #6 Exhibit 7 (sealed))(Pak, Chul) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 783 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #648 MOTION TO EXCLUDE the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover, #669 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Partially Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Janusz A. Ordover ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 782 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #625 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony ) filed byNichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 781 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #676 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI AIC INC., AND HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibits A-N to Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit O to Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibits P-V to Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit W to Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibits X- HH to Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit II to Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibits JJ-QQ to Turken Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 780 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Hitachi Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Hitachi Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Hitachi Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit I, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit J, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit U, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit V, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit X, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Y, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Z, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AA, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BB, #31 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CC, #32 Unsealed Version of Exhibit DD, #33 Unsealed Version of Exhibit EE, #34 Unsealed Version of Exhibit FF, #35 Unsealed Version of Exhibit GG, #36 Unsealed Version of Exhibit HH, #37 Unsealed Version of Exhibit JJ, #38 Unsealed Version of Exhibit KK, #39 Unsealed Version of Exhibit LL, #40 Unsealed Version of Exhibit MM, #41 Unsealed Version of Exhibit NN, #42 Unsealed Version of Exhibit OO, #43 Unsealed Version of Exhibit PP, #44 Unsealed Version of Exhibit QQ)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 779 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #623 MOTION to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton ) filed byNichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Van Der Weele, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration M. Martinez, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Strike, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Strike, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2)(Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 777 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 776 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Arrow Electronics, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 775 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 25, 2019 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 774 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/25/19 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 773 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #652 Joint MOTION to Strike CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX ) filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken, #2 Exhibits A - D to Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit E to Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibit F to Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit G to Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibit H to Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit I to Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibits J - K to Turken Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 772 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Marx filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Marx, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Marx, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit J, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 771 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 770 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07-25-2019 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 769 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #627 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by Nichicon filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori Lustrin, #2 Exhibit A to Lori Lustrin Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Lori Lustrin Declaration, #4 Exhibits C - T to Lori Lustrin Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 768 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Nichicon's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori Lustrin in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Nichicon's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Nichicon's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit I, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit J, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit O, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 767 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Weiss, Mark) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 766 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 765 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #674 MOTION for Summary Judgment on DAPs' Claims Redacted ) filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibit C-D to Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to Turken Declaration, #9 Exhibit I-CCC to Turken Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 764 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 763 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Certain Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claims, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claims, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit I, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit J, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit O, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit U, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit V, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit W, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit X, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Y, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Z, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AA, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BB, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CC, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit DD, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit EE, #31 Unsealed Version of Exhibit FF, #32 Unsealed Version of Exhibit GG, #33 Unsealed Version of Exhibit HH, #34 Unsealed Version of Exhibit II, #35 Unsealed Version of Exhibit JJ, #36 Unsealed Version of Exhibit KK, #37 Unsealed Version of Exhibit LL, #38 Unsealed Version of Exhibit MM, #39 Unsealed Version of Exhibit NN, #40 Unsealed Version of Exhibit OO, #41 Unsealed Version of Exhibit PP, #42 Unsealed Version of Exhibit QQ, #43 Unsealed Version of Exhibit RR, #44 Unsealed Version of Exhibit SS, #45 Unsealed Version of Exhibit TT, #46 Unsealed Version of Exhibit UU, #47 Unsealed Version of Exhibit VV, #48 Unsealed Version of Exhibit WW, #49 Unsealed Version of Exhibit XX, #50 Unsealed Version of Exhibit YY, #51 Unsealed Version of Exhibit ZZ, #52 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AAA, #53 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BBB, #54 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CCC)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 762 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/25/2019 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 761 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #664 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. L. Marx (Redacted) ) by the Holy Stone Defendants filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert Turken, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Robert Turken, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Robert Turken, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Robert Turken, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Robert Turken, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Robert Turken)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 760 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Holy Stone Defendants' Motion to Exclude filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to the Holy Stone Defendants' Motiion to Exclude, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to the Holy Stone Defendants' Motiion to Exclude, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 759 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #651 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by AVX Corporation filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Exhibits 1-22 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 23 to Tompkins Declaration, #4 Exhibits 24-68 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 69 to Tompkins Declaration, #6 Exhibit 70 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 71 to Tompkins Declaration, #8 Exhibit 72 to Tompkins Declaration, #9 Exhibits 73-74 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #10 Proposed Order, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 758 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Direct Action Plaintiffs' Opposition to AVX's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to AVX Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to AVX Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 2, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 4, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 5, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 6, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 7, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 8, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 9, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 10, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 11, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 12, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 13, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 14, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 15, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 16, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 17, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 18, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 19, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 20, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 21, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 22, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 24, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 25, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 26, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 27, #31 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 28, #32 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 29, #33 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 30, #34 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 31, #35 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 32, #36 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 33, #37 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 34, #38 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 35, #39 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 36, #40 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 37, #41 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 38, #42 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 39, #43 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 40, #44 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 41, #45 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 42, #46 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 43, #47 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 44, #48 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 45, #49 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 46, #50 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 47, #51 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 48, #52 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 49, #53 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 50, #54 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 51, #55 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 52, #56 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 53, #57 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 54, #58 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 55, #59 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 56, #60 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 57, #61 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 58, #62 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 59, #63 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 60, #64 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 61, #65 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 62, #66 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 63, #67 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 64, #68 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 65, #69 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 66, #70 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 67, #71 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 68, #72 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 70, #73 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 73, #74 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 74)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 757 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #665 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by United Chemi-Con Corporation filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to UCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A to Robert Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Robert Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Robert Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Robert Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Robert Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Robert Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Robert Turken Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Robert Turken Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Robert Turken Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Robert Turken Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Robert Turken Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Robert Turken Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Robert Turken Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Robert Turken Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Robert Turken Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Robert Turken Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Robert Turken Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Robert Turken Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Robert Turken Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Robert Turken Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Robert Turken Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to Robert Turken Declaration, #24 Exhibit W to Robert Turken Declaration, #25 Exhibit X to Robert Turken Declaration, #26 Exhibit Y to Robert Turken Declaration, #27 Exhibit Z to Robert Turken Declaration, #28 Exhibit AA to Robert Turken Declaration, #29 Exhibit BB to Robert Turken Declaration, #30 Exhibit CC to Robert Turken Declaration, #31 Exhibit DD to Robert Turken Declaration, #32 Exhibit EE to Robert Turken Declaration, #33 Exhibit FF to Robert Turken Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 756 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to United Chemi-Con's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to UCC Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to UCC Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit I, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit J, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit O, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit W, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit X, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Y, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Z, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AA, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BB, #31 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CC, #32 Unsealed Version of Exhibit DD, #33 Unsealed Version of Exhibit EE, #34 Unsealed Version of Exhibit FF)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 755 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #655 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SALLY QIN; PROPOSED ORDER ) filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori P. Lustrin in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit PP, #44 Exhibit QQ, #45 Exhibit RR, #46 Exhibit SS, #47 Exhibit TT, #48 Exhibit UU, #49 Exhibit VV, #50 Exhibit WW, #51 Exhibit XX, #52 Exhibit YY, #53 Exhibit ZZ, #54 Exhibit AAA, #55 Exhibit BBB, #56 Exhibit CCC)(Lustrin, Lori) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 754 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Film-Only Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit I, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit J, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit O, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit U, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit V, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit W, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit X, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Y, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Z, #31 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AA, #32 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BB, #33 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CC, #34 Unsealed Version of Exhibit DD, #35 Unsealed Version of Exhibit EE, #36 Unsealed Version of Exhibit FF, #37 Unsealed Version of Exhibit GG, #38 Unsealed Version of Exhibit HH, #39 Unsealed Version of Exhibit II, #40 Unsealed Version of Exhibit JJ, #41 Unsealed Version of Exhibit KK, #42 Unsealed Version of Exhibit LL, #43 Unsealed Version of Exhibit MM, #44 Unsealed Version of Exhibit NN, #45 Unsealed Version of Exhibit OO, #46 Unsealed Version of Exhibit PP, #47 Unsealed Version of Exhibit QQ, #48 Unsealed Version of Exhibit RR, #49 Unsealed Version of Exhibit SS, #50 Unsealed Version of Exhibit TT, #51 Unsealed Version of Exhibit UU, #52 Unsealed Version of Exhibit VV, #53 Unsealed Version of Exhibit WW, #54 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BBB, #55 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CCC)(Lustrin, Lori) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 753 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #656 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by Nippon Chemi-Con filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken, #2 Exhibit A to Robert Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Robert Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Robert Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Robert Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Robert Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Robert Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Robert Turken Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Robert Turken Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Robert Turken Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Robert Turken Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Robert Turken Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Robert Turken Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Robert Turken Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Robert Turken Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Robert Turken Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Robert Turken Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Robert Turken Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Robert Turken Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Robert Turken Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Robert Turken Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Robert Turken Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to Robert Turken Declaration, #24 Exhibit W to Robert Turken Declaration, #25 Exhibit X to Robert Turken Declaration, #26 Exhibit Y to Robert Turken Declaration, #27 Exhibit Z to Robert Turken Declaration, #28 Exhibit AA to Robert Turken Declaration, #29 Exhibit BB to Robert Turken Declaration, #30 Exhibit CC to Robert Turken Declaration, #31 Exhibit DD to Robert Turken Declaration, #32 Exhibit EE to Robert Turken Declaration, #33 Exhibit FF to Robert Turken Declaration, #34 Exhibit GG to Robert Turken Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 752 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Nippon Chemi-Con's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to NCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to NCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit O, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit U, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit V, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit W, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit X, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Y, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Z, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AA, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BB, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CC, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit DD)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 751 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #680 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by the Holy Stone Defendants filed byAvnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Turken Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Turken Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Turken Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Turken Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Turken Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Turken Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Turken Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Turken Declaration)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 750 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Holy Stone Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Holy Stone Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Holy Stone Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER. The parties are advised that the Soshin defendants' outstanding motions, MDL Dkt. Nos. 154, 155, 156 & 282, will be resolved from the bench at the status conference on July 25, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/23/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 748 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Opt-Out Plaintiff Arrow Electronics, Inc. and Defendants for Administrative Relief filed by Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 747 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Status Conference Statement filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 746 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: (287 in 3:17-cv-03472-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, (724 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 745 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: (723 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics, Inc., (113 in 3:18-cv-02657-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 744 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: (286 in 3:17-cv-03472-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, (721 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 743 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: (720 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, (148 in 3:17-cv-07047-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Avnet and Panasonic Regarding Case Schedule filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 741 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Nichicon Corporation and Nichicon (America) Corporation filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 740 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: (719 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Avnet, Inc., (174 in 3:17-cv-07046-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Avnet Incorporated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 739 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (706 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, and (147 in 3:17-cv-07047-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Motions terminated: (706 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, (147 in 3:17-cv-07047-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 738 ORDER, Motions terminated: (2367 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd. Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., and Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc., (718 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd. Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., and Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc... Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 737 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (705 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, (285 in 3:17-cv-03472-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, Motions terminated: (285 in 3:17-cv-03472-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, (705 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 736 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (703 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, (146 in 3:17-cv-07047-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Motions terminated: (703 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, (146 in 3:17-cv-07047-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 735 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (284 in 3:17-cv-03472-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, (702 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER granting Stipulation re Revised Jaco-Specific Schedule. MDL Dkt. No. 728. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/15/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 733 Order by Judge James Donato granting #732 Stipulation Between the DPP and IPP Class Plaintiffs and Defendants re MDL Scheduling Order. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 732 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #565 Order on Stipulation Extending the Briefing Schedule for the Parties to Respond and Reply to the 28 Pending Motions Filed on the Summary Judgment Due Date By Extending the Response Deadline by One Week and the Reply Deadline by Two Weeks filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #730 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin B. Goldstein. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 730 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13508295.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/10/19 filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldstein, Kevin) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 729 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sean Phillips Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 728 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Revised Jaco-Specific Schedule filed by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ORDER re (704 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Direct Purchaser Class and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to Omnibus Order re Attorney's Fees and Costs. The Court intends to appoint M. Monica Ip, CPA/CFF, CVA, CMA. The DPPs and IPPs are directed to request Ms. Ip to appear at the 7/25/2019 status conference to discuss her assignment. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/8/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 726 Letter from Panasonic and Sanyo Defendants in response to Plaintiff Avnet Inc.'s request for a hearing on its Motion to Deny Panasonic the Benefits of Limited Liability under ACPERA . (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 725 Letter from Avnet, Inc. Requesting that the Hearing on its ACPERA Motion be Placed Back on Calendar. (Turken, Robert) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 724 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 723 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 722 NOTICE by Okaya Electric America Inc., Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd. re #655 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SALLY QIN; PROPOSED ORDER Notice of Okaya Defendants' Withdrawal from Film-Only Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (Prescott, Darrell) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 721 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 720 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 719 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 718 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd. Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., and Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 717 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Jaco Electronics, Inc. and Vermont Street Acquisition, LLC's Complaint byTaitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Gott, Aaron) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 716 ANSWER to Complaint (Complaint by Jaco Electronics, Inc. and Vermont Street Acquisition LLC) byElna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 715 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI AIC INC., AND HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD.'S ANSWER TO JACO ELECTRONICS, INC. AND VERMONT STREET ACQUISITION, LLC'S COMPLAINT byHitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 714 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [Complaint by Jaco Electronics, Inc. and Vermont Street Acquisition LLC] byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 713 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [Complaint by Jaco Electronics, Inc. and Vermont Street Acquisition LLC] byUnited Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 712 STIPULATION of Waiver of Service and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 711 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to the Complaint of Jaco Electronics, Inc. and Vermont Street Acquisition, LLC byMatsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 710 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to the Complaint of Jaco Electronics, Inc. and Vermont Street Acquisition bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Fornaciari, John) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 709 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byRubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation. (Petkoski, Djordje) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 708 ANSWER to Complaint byNichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Fox, Daniel) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 707 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Answer to the Complaint of Jaco Electronics, Inc. and Vermont Street Acquisition, LLC byShinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc., Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd.. (Maddox, Claire) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 706 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 705 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 704 RESPONSE re #701 Order DPP and IPP Response to Omnibus Order re Attorney's Fees and Costs by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 703 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 702 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 701 OMNIBUS ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/25/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER re (307 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/25/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 699 MOTION for Settlement (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Class Notice Program of Settlements with Panasonic, Nichicon, Elna, and Matsuo Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of Motion for Approval of Class Notice Program, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 698 MOTION for Settlement (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Panasonic, Nichicon, Elna, and Matsuo Defendants and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of IPPs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Panasonic, Nichicon, Elna, and Matsuo Defendants and Approval of the Plan of Allocation, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 697 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT OKAYA. Motions terminated: (616 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics, Inc., (104 in 3:18-cv-02657-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/19/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 696 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Regarding Waiver of Service and Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, Motions terminated: (608 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Vermont Street Acquisition LLC, Jaco Electronics Incorporated, (11 in 3:19-cv-01902-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Waiver of Service and Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Vermont Street Acquisition LLC, Jaco Electronics Incorporated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/19/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 695 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Enlarge Time to Opt Out of the Litigation Class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Erkel, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 694 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc. re #636 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 693 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd. re #664 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. L. Marx (Redacted) , #674 MOTION for Summary Judgment on DAPs' Claims Redacted, #680 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Unredacted Copies (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 692 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation re #673 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Certain Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment Against Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Claims,, #661 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave by Defendants (redacted), (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 691 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Class and IPPs' Motion to Exclude, in part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. Dallal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Motion, #5 Unredacted Motion, #6 Exhibit B Redacted, #7 Exhibit B Unredacted, #8 Exhibit E Redacted, #9 Exhibit E Unredacted)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 690 NOTICE by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation of Errata: Declaration of Service (Gott, Aaron) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 689 Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell Lamb filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Exhibit 1 under seal, #3 Exhibit 2 under seal, #4 Exhibit 3 under seal, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 under seal, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9 under seal, #11 Exhibit 10 under seal, #12 Exhibit 11 under seal, #13 Exhibit 12 under seal, #14 Exhibit 13 under seal, #15 Exhibit 14 under seal, #16 Exhibit 15 under seal, #17 Exhibit 16 under seal)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 688 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Defendants' Notice Of Motion And Motion To Exclude Testimony Of Dr. Russell L. Lamb filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Certain Defendants Notice Of Motion And Motion To Exclude Testimony Of Dr. Russell L. Lamb, #4 Unredacted Version of Certain Defendants Notice Of Motion And Motion To Exclude Testimony Of Dr. Russell L. Lamb, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 687 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Film-Only Defendants as to DPP Claims filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 under seal, #8 Exhibit 7 under seal, #9 Exhibit 8 under seal, #10 Exhibit 9 under seal, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19 under seal, #21 Exhibit 20 under seal, #22 Exhibit 21 under seal, #23 Exhibit 22 under seal, #24 Exhibit 23 under seal)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 686 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents and Exhibits to Their Motion for Summary Judgment Against DPPs filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion And Notice Of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment as to DPP Claims, #4 Unredacted Version of Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion And Notice Of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment as to DPP Claims, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 19, #10 Exhibit 20, #11 Exhibit 21, #12 Exhibit 22, #13 Exhibit 23)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 685 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment against Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 under seal, #5 Exhibit 4 under seal, #6 Exhibit 5 under seal, #7 Exhibit 6 under seal, #8 Exhibit 7 under seal, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10 under seal, #12 Exhibit 11 under seal, #13 Exhibit 12 under seal, #14 Envelope 13 under seal, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17 under seal, #19 Exhibit 18 under seal, #20 Exhibit 19 under seal, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22 under seal, #24 Exhibit 23 under seal)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 684 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Film-Only Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment as to IPP Claims and certain exhibits filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion And Notice Of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment as to IPP Claims, #4 Unredacted Version of Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion And Notice Of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment as to IPP Claims, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 22, #18 Exhibit 23)(Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 683 Joint MOTION for Joinder in Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Proposed Testimony of Leslie M. Marx filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Gott, Aaron) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 682 Joint MOTION for Joinder in Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Proposed Testimony of Hal J. Singer filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Gott, Aaron) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 681 Joint MOTION for Joinder in Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Proposed Testimony of Joseph P. Russoniello filed by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation. (Gott, Aaron) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 680 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Enson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Errata 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 Underseal, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15 Underseal, #17 Exhibit 16 Underseal, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Proposed Order)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 679 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-39, #3 Exhibit 40-77)(Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 678 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by KEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 45, #10 Exhibit 46, #11 Exhibit 47)(Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 677 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal UCC Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits [Dkt. 665]] filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 [UNREDACTED UCC MSJ], #3 [REDACTED UCC MSJ], #4 Exhibit 1 to Tatoy Decl., #5 Exhibit 2 to Tatoy Decl., #6 Exhibit 3 to Tatoy Decl., #7 Exhibit 4 to Tatoy Decl., #8 Exhibit 5 to Tatoy Decl., #9 Exhibit 6 to Tatoy Decl., #10 Exhibit 7 to Tatoy Decl., #11 Exhibit 12 to Tatoy Decl., #12 Exhibit 14 to Tatoy Decl., #13 Exhibit 15 to Tatoy Decl., #14 Exhibit 20 to Tatoy Decl., #15 Exhibit 21 to Tatoy Decl., #16 Exhibit 24 to Tatoy Decl., #17 Exhibit 25 to Tatoy Decl., #18 Exhibit 26 to Tatoy Decl., #19 Exhibit 27 to Tatoy Decl., #20 Exhibit 28 to Tatoy Decl., #21 Exhibit 29 to Tatoy Decl., #22 Exhibit 30 to Tatoy Decl., #23 Exhibit 31 to Tatoy Decl., #24 Exhibit 32 to Tatoy Decl., #25 Exhibit 33 to Tatoy Decl., #26 Exhibit 34 to Tatoy Decl., #27 Exhibit 35 to Tatoy Decl., #28 Exhibit 41 to Tatoy Decl., #29 Exhibit 42 to Tatoy Decl., #30 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 676 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI AIC INC., AND HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Justin A. Cohen, #2 Exs 1-10 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #3 Exs 11-20 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #4 Exs 21-30 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #5 Exs 31-40 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #6 Exs 41-45 to the Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #7 Proposed Order)(Pak, Chul) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 675 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI AIC INC., AND HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Justin A. Cohen, #2 Proposed Order, #3 DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI AIC INC., AND HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (redacted), #4 DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI AIC INC., AND HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (unredacted), #5 Ex 5 (sealed), #6 Ex 6 (sealed), #7 Ex 11 (sealed), #8 Ex 15 (sealed), #9 Ex 16 (sealed), #10 Ex 17 (sealed), #11 Ex 18 (sealed), #12 Ex 19 (sealed), #13 Ex 20 (sealed), #14 Ex 22 (sealed), #15 Ex 24 (sealed), #16 Ex 29 (sealed), #17 Ex 30 (sealed), #18 Ex 33 (sealed), #19 Ex 35 (sealed), #20 Ex 37 (sealed), #21 Ex 38 (sealed), #22 Ex 39 (sealed), #23 Ex 45 (sealed))(Pak, Chul) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 674 MOTION for Summary Judgment on DAPs' Claims Redacted filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Enson, #2 Exhibit 1 Underseal, #3 Exhibit 2 Underseal, #4 Exhibit 3 Underseal, #5 Exhibit 4 Underseal, #6 Exhibit 5 Underseal, #7 Exhibit 6 Underseal, #8 Exhibit 7 Underseal, #9 Exhibit 8 Underseal, #10 Exhibit 9 Underseal, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11 Underseal, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13 Underseal, #15 Exhibit 14 Underseal, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16 Underseal, #18 Exhibit 17 Underseal, #19 Exhibit 18 Underseal, #20 Exhibit 19 Underseal, #21 Exhibit 20 Underseal, #22 21 Underseal, #23 Exhibit 22 Underseal, #24 23 Underseal, #25 Proposed Order)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 673 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Certain Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment Against Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Claims, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew R. DalSanto in Support, #2 Declaration of Ian L. Papendick in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 (under seal), #4 Exhibit 2 (under seal), #5 Exhibit 3 (under seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (under seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (under seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (under seal), #9 Exhibit 7 (under seal), #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9 (under seal), #12 Exhibit 10 (under seal), #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13 (under seal), #16 Exhibit 14 (under seal), #17 Exhibit 15 (under seal), #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17 (under seal), #20 Exhibit 18 (under seal), #21 Exhibit 19 (under seal), #22 Exhibit 20 (under seal), #23 Exhibit 21 (under seal), #24 Exhibit 22 (under seal), #25 Exhibit 23 (under seal), #26 Exhibit 24 (under seal), #27 Exhibit 25 (under seal), #28 Exhibit 26 (under seal), #29 Exhibit 27 (under seal), #30 Exhibit 28 (under seal), #31 Exhibit 29 (under seal), #32 Exhibit 30 (under seal), #33 Exhibit 31 (under seal), #34 Exhibit 32 (under seal), #35 Exhibit 33 (under seal), #36 Exhibit 34 (under seal), #37 Exhibit 35 (under seal), #38 Exhibit 36 (under seal), #39 Exhibit 37 (under seal), #40 Exhibit 38 (under seal), #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 672 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class and IPPs' Motion to Exclude, in part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. Dallal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 671 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Motion for Summary Judgment Redacted, #4 Motion for Summary Judgment Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 6 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 6 Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 15 Redacted, #8 Exhibit 15 Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 16 Redacted, #10 Exhibit 16 Unredacted)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 670 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Class and IPPs' Motion to Exclude, in part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. Dallal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Redacted Motion, #5 Unredacted Motion, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Exh B, #8 Exhibit Redacted Exh E, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Exh E)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 669 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Partially Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Janusz A. Ordover filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anupama K. Reddy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 668 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to Certain Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Certain Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Claims, #4 Unredacted Version of Certain Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Claims, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Papendick Declaration, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Papendick Declaration, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Papendick Declaration, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Papendick Declaration, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Papendick Declaration, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Papendick Declaration, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7 to Papendick Declaration, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 to Papendick Declaration, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Papendick Declaration, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13 to Papendick Declaration, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14 to Papendick Declaration, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15 to Papendick Declaration, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17 to Papendick Declaration, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18 to Papendick Declaration, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19 to Papendick Declaration, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20 to Papendick Declaration, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21 to Papendick Declaration, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22 to Papendick Declaration, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23 to Papendick Declaration, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24 to Papendick Declaration, #25 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25 to Papendick Declaration, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26 to Papendick Declaration, #27 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27 to Papendick Declaration, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28 to Papendick Declaration, #29 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29 to Papendick Declaration, #30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30 to Papendick Declaration, #31 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31 to Papendick Declaration, #32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32 to Papendick Declaration, #33 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33 to Papendick Declaration, #34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34 to Papendick Declaration, #35 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35 to Papendick Declaration, #36 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36 to Papendick Declaration, #37 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37 to Papendick Declaration, #38 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 38 to Papendick Declaration)(Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 667 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Partially Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Janusz A. Ordover filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anupama K. Reddy, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Daubert Motion, #4 Unredacted Daubert Motion, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exh A, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Exh A, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Exh B, #9 Exhibit Redacted Exh C, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Exh C, #11 Exhibit Redacted Exh D, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Exh D)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 666 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by HOLY STONE POLYTECH CO. LTD., Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Motion for Summary Judgment on DAPs' Claims Redacted, #4 Motion for Summary Judgment on DAPs' Claims Unredacted, #5 Declaration of E. Enson and Redacted Exhibits, #6 Declaration of E. Enson and Unredacted Exhibits)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 665 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Proposed Order, #46 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 664 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. L. Marx (Redacted) filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Enson, #2 Exhibit 1 Underseal, #3 Exhibit 2 Underseal, #4 Exhibit 3 Underseal, #5 Exhibit 4 Underseal, #6 Proposed Order)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 663 EXHIBITS re #657 Declaration in Support, EXHIBITS 26-35 TO QIN'S DECLARATION FOR JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26-35)(Related document(s) #657 ) (Loomis, C.) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 662 EXHIBITS re #657 Declaration in Support, EXHIBITS 21-25 TO QIN'S DECLARATION FOR JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21-25)(Related document(s) #657 ) (Loomis, C.) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 661 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave by Defendants (redacted), filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew R. DalSanto, #2 Declaration of Martin C. Geagan, #3 Exhibit 1 (under seal), #4 Exhibit 2 (under seal), #5 Exhibit 3 (under seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (under seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (under seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (under seal), #9 Exhibit 7 (under seal), #10 Exhibit 8 (under seal), #11 Exhibit 9 (under seal), #12 Exhibit 10 (under seal), #13 Exhibit 11 (under seal), #14 Exhibit 12 (under seal), #15 Exhibit 13 (under seal), #16 Exhibit 14 (under seal), #17 Exhibit 15 (under seal), #18 Exhibit 16 (under seal), #19 Exhibit 17 (under seal), #20 Exhibit 18 (under seal), #21 Exhibit 19 (under seal), #22 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NCC Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits [Dkt. 656] filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara Hershman, #2 [UNREDACTED NCC MSJ], #3 [REDACTED NCC MSJ], #4 Exhibit 1 to Johan Decl., #5 Exhibit 2 to Johan Decl., #6 Exhibit 3 to Johan Decl., #7 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 659 EXHIBITS re #657 Declaration in Support, EXHIBITS 11-20 TO QIN'S DECLARATION FOR JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11-20)(Related document(s) #657 ) (Loomis, C.) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 658 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to Certain Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave, #4 Unredacted Version of Defendants Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. James T. McClave, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19)(Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 657 Declaration of Sally Qin in Support of #655 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SALLY QIN; PROPOSED ORDER filed bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10)(Related document(s) #655 ) (Loomis, C.) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 656 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 655 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SALLY QIN; PROPOSED ORDER filed by Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loomis, C.) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 654 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude Singer and Exhibits [Dkt. 647] filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara Hershman, #2 Exhibit [UNREDACTED Motion to Exclude Singer], #3 Exhibit [REDACTED Motion to Exclude Singer], #4 Exhibit 1 to Johan Decl., #5 Exhibit 2 to Johan Decl., #6 Exhibit 3 to Johan Decl., #7 Exhibit 4 to Johan Decl., #8 Exhibit 5 to Johan Decl., #9 Exhibit 6 to Johan Decl., #10 Exhibit 7 to Johan Decl., #11 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 653 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., HolyStone International, Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 redacted Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. L. Marx, #4 Unredacted Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. L. Marx, #5 Declaration of E. Enson and Redacted Exhibits, #6 Declaration of E. Enson and Unredacted Exhibits)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 652 Joint MOTION to Strike CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Justin A. Cohen, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Justin A. Cohen, #9 Declaration Dr. Laila Haider, #10 Declaration Dr. Stephen Prowse, #11 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dr. Stephen Prowse, #12 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Dr. Stephen Prowse, #13 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Dr. Stephen Prowse, #14 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Dr. Stephen Prowse, #15 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Dr. Stephen Prowse, #16 Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 651 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AVX Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky in Support of Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9 (Part 1 of 4), #12 Exhibit 9 (Part 2 of 4), #13 Exhibit 9 (Part 3 of 4), #14 Exhibit 9 (Part 4 of 4), #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24)(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 650 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Justin A. Cohen, #2 Proposed Order, #3 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX (redacted), #4 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. LESLIE M. MARX (unredacted), #5 Exhibit A (sealed), #6 Exhibit B (sealed), #7 Exhibit D (sealed), #8 Exhibit E (sealed), #9 Exhibit F (sealed), #10 Exhibit G (sealed))(Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 649 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robert G. Kidwell in Support of AVX's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Redacted - Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #5 Sealed - Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #6 Declaration Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky in Support of Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #7 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 4, #15 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 5, #16 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 5, #17 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 6, #18 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 6, #19 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 7, #20 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 7, #21 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 8, #22 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 8, #23 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 10, #24 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 10, #25 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 11, #26 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 11, #27 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 12, #28 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 12, #29 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 13, #30 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 13, #31 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 14, #32 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 14, #33 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 15, #34 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 15, #35 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 16, #36 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 16, #37 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 17, #38 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 17, #39 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 18, #40 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 18, #41 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 19, #42 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 19, #43 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 20, #44 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 20, #45 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 21, #46 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 21, #47 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 22, #48 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 22, #49 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 23, #50 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 23, #51 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 24, #52 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 24)(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 648 MOTION TO EXCLUDE the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13 (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 14 (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 16 (Filed Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 18 (Filed Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 19 (Filed Under Seal), #21 Exhibit 20 (Filed Under Seal), #22 Proposed Order, #23 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 647 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hal J. Singer filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 646 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 645 EXHIBITS re #637 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR FILING UNDER PROVISIONAL SEAL CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THEIR JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 CORRECTION OF EXHIBITS OF DOCKETS 637 AND 638 filed bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34)(Related document(s) #637 ) (Loomis, C.) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 644 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yoshio Koyama, #2 Declaration of Kaley L. Fendall, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36 (Under Seal), #39 Exhibit 37 (Under Seal), #40 Exhibit 38 (Under Seal), #41 Exhibit 39 (Under Seal), #42 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 643 MOTION for a Determination that the Panasonic Defendants have Satisfied ACPERA to Date filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly M. Donovan in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 642 MOTION TO EXCLUDE Portions of the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude Portions of the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Motion to Exclude)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 640 MOTION to Strike (IPPs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO IPPs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO Mtn to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 IPPs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Redacted, #4 IPPs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 638 EXHIBITS re #637 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR FILING UNDER PROVISIONAL SEAL CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THEIR JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 filed bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34)(Related document(s) #637 ) (Loomis, C.) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 637 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal FILM-ONLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR FILING UNDER PROVISIONAL SEAL CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THEIR JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 filed by Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30)(Loomis, C.) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 636 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monder Khoury, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 38, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 39)(Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 635 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO SOSHIN DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 634 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO RUBYCON DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 633 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO NCC/UCC DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 632 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO HOLY STONE DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 631 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO HITACHI CHEMICAL DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 630 MOTION to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit H (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit I (Filed Under Seal))(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 629 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A to Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B to Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C to Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E to Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F to Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G to Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H to Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit I to Motion to Exclude Portions of M. Williams Testimony)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL of IPPs' Class Action Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical, Soshin, Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon, and Approving the Plan of Allocation (MDL Dkt. No. 320). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 627 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Donahue Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17)(Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 626 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Martinez Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit)(Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 625 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal))(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 624 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A to Motion to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B to Motion to Exclude Portions of Prowse Testimony)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 623 MOTION to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal))(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 622 NOTICE of Appearance by Monder Khoury (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 621 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Strike, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Strike, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C to Motion to Strike, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D to Motion to Strike, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E to Motion to Strike, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F to Motion to Strike)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 620 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Enlarge Time to Opt Out of the Litigation Class (Cohen, Bart) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 619 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/29/2019 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 618 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/16/2019 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 617 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR HP TO ENLARGE TIME TO OPT OUT OF THE LITIGATION CLASS (CIV. L. R. 7-11) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 616 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 615 TRANSFER ORDER Signed by Chairman Sarah S. Vance. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 614 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opt Out of the Litigation Class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dell Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Laura A. Komarek, #3 Exhibit A to Komarek Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Komarek Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Komarek Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Komarek Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Komarek Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Komarek Declaration)(Erkel, Steven) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 613 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/29/2019 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 612 ***erroneous docket entry***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opt Out of the Litigation Class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Laura A. Komarek, #3 Exhibit A to Komarek Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Komarek Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Komarek Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Komarek Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Komarek Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Komarek Declaration)(Erkel, Steven) (Filed on 6/5/2019) Modified on 6/6/2019 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2019 Filing 611 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/29/2019 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER. The Court sets a status conference for July 25, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/4/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 609 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/29/19, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (603 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 608 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Waiver of Service and Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 607 Supplemental Brief filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 606 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/29/2019 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 605 Letter from Joseph Saveri Law Firm re Status Conference. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 604 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/29/2019 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 603 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/29/2019 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 602 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2019. Total Time in Court: 28 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 601 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Submission Opting Out of the Litigation Class filed by HP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bart D. Cohen)(Cohen, Bart) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 600 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/16/2019 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER GRANTING (575 in 3:17-md-02801-JD), (2316 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) STIPULATION RE FLEX'S MOTION FOR LIMITED MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/24/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 598 CLERK'S NOTICE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (537 in 3:17-md-02801-JD), (2302 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Motion for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order. Motion Hearing re-set for 5/29/2019 at 11:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 596 STATUS REPORT Concerning Pendency of Claims Against Defendants by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 595 Proposed Order re #594 Supplemental Brief,,,, PROPOSED FINAL ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 594 Supplemental Brief re #498 MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 1 of 12, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 2 of 12, #4 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 3 of 12, #5 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 4 of 12, #6 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 5 of 12, #7 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 6 of 12, #8 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 7 of 12, #9 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 8 of 12, #10 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 9 of 12, #11 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 10 of 12, #12 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 11 of 12, #13 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 12 of 12, #14 Exhibit Ex. 2, #15 Exhibit Ex. 3, #16 Exhibit Ex. 4, #17 Exhibit Ex. 5, #18 Exhibit Ex. 6, #19 Exhibit Ex. 7, #20 Exhibit Ex. 8, #21 Exhibit Ex. 9, #22 Exhibit Ex. 10, #23 Exhibit Ex. 11, Part 1 of 3, #24 Exhibit Ex. 11, Part 2 of 3, #25 Exhibit Ex. 11, Part 3 of 3, #26 Exhibit Ex. 12, #27 Exhibit Ex. 13, #28 Exhibit Ex. 14, #29 Exhibit Ex. 15)(Related document(s) #498 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTERS, MDL Dkt. Nos. 580 & 584. The parties are requested to advise the Court whether this is still a live issue. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/23/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER. The Special Master assigned to address DPP class counsel's request for approval of settlement allocation and related objections will conduct a hearing on Friday, May 31, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. at 77 Beale Street, 32nd Floor, Lombard Conference Room. The Special Master will circulate in advance questions on which he would like counsel to be prepared to respond. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/23/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 591 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/16/2019 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 590 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/16/2019 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Weiss, Mark) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 589 NOTICE by Arrow Electronics, Inc. re #582 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO CONFIRM OPT OUT STATUS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, ENLARGE ITS TIME TO OPT OUT OF THE NON-SETTLEMENT CLASS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS NON-OPPOSITION TO ARROWS MOTION TO CONFIRM OPT-OUT STATUS [DE 582] (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 588 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/16/2019 before Judge James Donato by Certain Members of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Settlement Class, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 587 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-16-2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #586 Transcript Order, #585 Transcript Order, #579 Transcript Order, #581 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2019. (Related documents(s) #586 , #585 , #579 , #581 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 586 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/16/2019 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 585 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/16/2019 before Judge James Donato by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 584 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #580 Discovery Letter BriefRe Depositions of experts Singer and McClave ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 583 Declaration of Meredith Schultz in Support of #582 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO CONFIRM OPT OUT STATUS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, ENLARGE ITS TIME TO OPT OUT OF THE NON-SETTLEMENT CLASS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed byArrow Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #582 ) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 582