Mohamed v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Jamila Mohamed
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America and California Pacific Medical Center Plan
Case Number: 3:2018cv00284
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Standard of Review and Dismissal of California Pacific Medical Center Plan filed by California Pacific Medical Center Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 2, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
April 10, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by California Pacific Medical Center Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company of America filed by California Pacific Medical Center Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
March 27, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by California Pacific Medical Center Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 27, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamila Mohamed
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Represented By: Mitchell Owen Hefter
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Represented By: Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Pacific Medical Center Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?