Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc. and UNILOC Luxembourg S.A.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00360
Filed: January 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (denying (164) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:18-cv-00363-WHA; denying (173) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:18-cv-00360-WHA; denying (194) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:18-cv-00365-WHA; denying (184) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:18-cv-00572-WHA). Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER DENYING 185 MOTION TO RELATE. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, TO FILE UNDER SEAL, AND TO INTERVENE AND ORDER VACATING HEARING (denying (158) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (159) Motion for Reconsideration ; granting (168) Motion to Intervene in case 3:18-cv-00363-WHA; denying (167) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (168) Motion for Reconsideration ; granting (177) Motion to Intervene in case 3:18-cv-00360-WHA; denying (188) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (189) Motion for Reconsideration ; granting (198) Motion to Intervene in case 3:18-cv-00365-WHA; denying (178) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (179) Motion for Reconsideration ; granting (188) Motion to Intervene in case 3:18-cv-00572-WHA). Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND MOTION TO INTERVENE (denying (128) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (135) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (140) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (146) Motion to Intervene in case 3:18-cv-00363-WHA; denying (134) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (141) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (146) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (152) Motion to Intervene in case 3:18-cv-00360-WHA; denying (158) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (165) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (170) Administrative Mot ion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (176) Motion to Intervene in case 3:18-cv-00365-WHA; denying (148) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (155) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (160) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (166) Motion to Intervene in case 3:18-cv-00572-WHA). Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE (granting in part and denying in part (79) Motion for Protective Order in case 3:18-cv-00363-WHA; granting in part and denying in part (84) Motion for Protective Order in case 3:18-cv-00360-WHA; granting in part and denying in part (79) Motion for Protective Order in case 3:18-cv-00365-WHA; granting in part and denying in part (81) Motion for Protective Order in case 3:18-cv-00572-WHA). Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dean G. Bostock
Represented By: Michael James Ercolini
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: James John Foster
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Represented By: Paul J. Hayes
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: Daniel McGonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNILOC Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: Dean G. Bostock
Represented By: Michael James Ercolini
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: James John Foster
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Represented By: Paul J. Hayes
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: Daniel McGonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Greenblatt
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Emma Christine Neff
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pieja
Represented By: Douglas Jordan Winnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?