Sever, et al v. Icon Aircraft, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ESRA SEVER, individually, and as parent and natural guardian of her minor children, A.S. and B.S., ESRA SEVER, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ahmet Cagri Sever (deceased), A. S.(a minor) individually, and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Esra Sever and B. S. (a minor) individually, and through her Guardian ad Litem, Esra Sever
Defendant: ICON AIRCRAFT, INC., MATTHEW WOODRUFF, KURT PARKER and EDWARD ELLIS KARKOW, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jon Karkow (deceased)
Case Number: 3:2018cv00584
Filed: January 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 56 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF ACTION; DENYING 53 MOTION TO SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Administrative Motion Requesting an Earlier Hearing Date.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation Re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation for Enlargement of Time to File Response Brief Re Docket No. 26 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 5 BORA SEVER'S PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 35 Stipulated Protective Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Second Revised Stipulation Re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Stipulation re Dismissal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David J. Harrington. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sever, et al v. Icon Aircraft, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICON AIRCRAFT, INC.
Represented By: Scott David Cunningham
Represented By: David J Harrington
Represented By: Ivy Larsen Nowinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW WOODRUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KURT PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD ELLIS KARKOW, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jon Karkow (deceased)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESRA SEVER, individually, and as parent and natural guardian of her minor children, A.S. and B.S.
Represented By: Claire Choo
Represented By: Stuart R. Fraenkel
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESRA SEVER, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ahmet Cagri Sever (deceased)
Represented By: Nicole C. Andersen
Represented By: Claire Choo
Represented By: Stuart R. Fraenkel
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.(a minor) individually, and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Esra Sever
Represented By: Claire Choo
Represented By: Stuart R. Fraenkel
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. S. (a minor) individually, and through her Guardian ad Litem, Esra Sever
Represented By: Claire Choo
Represented By: Stuart R. Fraenkel
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?