Ashtiani v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Amir Ashtiani
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Michael Shane Biggs
Case Number: 3:2018cv00631
Filed: January 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
2 Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript by Zachary S. Tolson (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 86 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 13, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #85 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2019. (Related documents(s) #85 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 13, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 84 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: #82 Settlement Conference ), by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Court will send to Jeff Trayner at jtrayner@gnhllp.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 0971-13417801). (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/15/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order re Stipulation to Reschedule Dispositive Motion Hearing by Judge Vince Chhabria. Last day to hear Dispositive and Daubert Motions Hearing set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Settlement Conference held on 5/13/2019. Case settled. Terms stated on the record. FTR Time: 5:55 - 6:04 (Assigned Court Reporter: Diane Skillman). (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2019) Modified on 6/12/2019 (napS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2019 Filing 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Daubert Motions filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting in part and denying in part #71 Discovery Letter Brief. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #77 Stipulation. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Protective Order filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 76 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/27/2019 10:09:00 AM ]. File Size [ 20088 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:41:51 ]. (courtspeak).
March 27, 2019 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Discovery Hearing held on 3/27/2019. Plaintiff's Counsel to prepare, circulate to Defense Counsel and submit proposed order to the court no later than 3/28/2019. FTR Time: 10:09-10:50. Plaintiff Attorney: David Kleczek by phone. Defendant Attorney: Zachary Tolson by phone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #73 Stipulation. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Expert Disclosure and Discovery Deadlines filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 72 CLERK'S NOTICE Discovery Hearing (Dkt. #71) set for 3/27/2019 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. The parties may appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #71 Discovery Letter Brief. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 71 Letter from Joint Discovery Letter . (Kleczek, David) (Filed on 3/21/2019) Modified on 3/22/2019 (knm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Amir Ashtiani . (Kleczek, David) (Filed on 3/16/2019)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 03/12/2019. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Show Cause Hearing - Non Evidentiary held on 3/7/2019. Plaintiff moved verbally to reopen and extend the fact discovery cutoff; the Court will not rule on this request and defers to Judge Illman to determine if an extension is appropriate, so long as the discovery is appropriately narrowed. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding a revised expert discovery schedule that would not disrupt the current trial schedule - defendant objected, which was overruled by the Court. Plaintiff requested to extend the trial date as new counsel is slated to be in trial in state court during the same time; request is denied by the Court. The plaintiff's motions which were filed while in pro se status are terminated by order of the Court on the record. (Dkt. Nos. #57 , #58 , and #60 .)FTR Time: 11:16 - 11:30.Plaintiff Attorney: David Kleczek. Also present is Amir Ashtiani.Defendant Attorney: Zachary Tolson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 67 ASSOCIATION of Counsel Appearance by Amir Ashtiani. (Kleczek, David) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO FILE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/4/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 3/4/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re #62 Response to Order to Show Cause (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 64 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/27/2019 10:09:10 AM ]. File Size [ 12824 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:26:43 ]. (courtspeak).
February 27, 2019 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Discovery Hearing held on 2/27/2019. FTR Time: 10:09-10:33. Plaintiff Attorney: Amir Ashtiani, Pro Se by phone. Defendant Attorney: Zachary Tolson by phone. Attachment: Minutes. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 62 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. . (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting in part and denying in part #53 Discovery Letter Brief. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Extend Discovery Time to May 1, 2019 filed by Amir Ashtiani. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 59 Response to Order to Show Cause byAmir Ashtiani. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Amir Ashtiani. Responses due by 3/12/2019. Replies due by 3/19/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Amir Ashtiani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re #55 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/7/2019. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on February 15, 2019. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE: Discovery Hearing (Doc. 53) set for 2/27/2019 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. The Parties are to meet and confer prior to the hearing in a good faith effort to resolve the issues. Parties may appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 53 Second Discovery Letter Brief filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/12/2019. The Court will issue an order to show cause for the failure of parties to show up to court today.FTR Time: 1:44- 1:46.Plaintiff Attorney: no appearance.Defendant Attorney: no appearane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/12/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/4/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2019 11:00 AM. Confidential Statements due by 5/3/2019. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/1/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 48 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #42 Discovery Letter Brief. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Discovery Hearing held on 1/11/2019. Court to issue Order. FTR Time: 10:02-10:17. Attachment: Minutes. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 45 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/11/2019 10:02:26 AM ]. File Size [ 7056 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:42 ]. (courtspeak).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on January 9, 2019. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 43 CLERK'S NOTICE Discovery Hearing (Doc. 42) set for 1/11/2019 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties may appear by telephone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 42 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Michael Shane Biggs. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 1/16/2019. Replies due by 1/23/2019. (Biggs, Michael) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 20, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Telephonic Further Case Management Conference held on 12/20/2018. CASE REFERRED to randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Discovery. At the FCMC, the parties requested they be referred to a magistrate judge for a settlement conference. The parties were previously referred to Magistrate Judge Kandis Westmore. Judge Westmore has filed an order requiring a status report from the parties on 1/4/2019. The deadline to complete the settlement conference is 90 days. Plaintiff's counsel indicated that he wishes to withdraw from the case. He must file a motion requesting to do so. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2019. In-person Further Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor.Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded.Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Biggs. Defendant Attorney: Zachary Tolson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Requiring Status Report. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/19/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE TIME FOR THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONVERTING THE HEARING TO A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The matter is rescheduled to the following time due to one or more parties requesting to appear telephonically at the hearing. Plaintiff shall provide the Court and all other parties a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than one court day prior to the case management conference by way of email to the Court (vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov) with a cc to opposing counsel. Telephonic Further Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2018 02:30 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 12/18/2018 TO 12/20/2018. The Court has a scheduling conflict on 12/18/2018 and therefore must reset the FCMC in this case. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 36 Certification of ADR Session by Mediator John F. Barg: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on 12/7/2018. The case did not settle. Further facilitated discussions are not expected. Mediation is complete. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Amir Ashtiani. (Biggs, Michael) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
October 30, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing reset to 12/7/2018 at 10:30 AM at the Mediator's offices located at 600 Montgomery Street, Suite 525, San Francisco, CA 94111. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #33 Stipulation to Complete Mediation Deadline.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION/ADR COMPLIANCE DEADLINE filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order as Modified by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #31 Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/25/2019. Designation of Experts due by 2/1/2019. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 3/29/2019. Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Deadline to conduct settlement conference is 5/2019. Last day to hear Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Trial and Related Deadlines filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/16/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/13/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED JOINT STATUS REPORT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REFERRAL in light of #26 Order granting Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline to 10/26/2018. Status Report due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/19/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing reset for 10/23/2018 at 09:30 AM at the Mediator's offices located at 600 Montgomery Street, Suite 525, San Francisco, CA 94111. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 27 ADR Remark: Mediation Hearing set for 7/18/2018 is off calendar. A Pre MED phone conference is scheduled for 7/20/2018 at 11:00 AM. Call-in information has been provided directly to counsel. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #25 Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline to 10/26/2018.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION/ADR COMPLIANCE DEADLINE filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
June 6, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 7/18/2018 at 09:30 AM at the Mediator's offices located at 600 Montgomery Street, Suite 525, San Francisco, CA 94111. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 24 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 6/1/2018 at 10:00 AM. Mediator provided call-in information directly to counsel. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 22, 2018 Filing 23 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing John F. Barg as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REFERRAL. Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2018. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/14/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #19 Stipulation Setting Deadlines to File Initial and Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Disclosures.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER LIFTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/10/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Deadlines to File Initial and Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Disclosures filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 2, 2018 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Michael S. Biggs Show Cause Response filed byAmir Ashtiani. (Biggs, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/1/2018. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear. The Court issued an Order to Show Cause as to why plaintiff should not be sanctioned for counsel's failure to appear at the initial case management conference. Written Show Cause Response to be filed by 5/3/2018 (date changed after court hearing). Case has previously been referred to court sponsored mediation, and that continues to remain in place. Additionally, CASE REFERRED to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for a Settlement Conference to occur in the month of February 2019, should the case not resolve before that time. Last day to amend pleadings is 7/13/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/26/2018. Close of Expert Discovery due by 2/1/2019. The parties are ordered to file a stipulation and proposed order outlining agreed upon deadlines to file initial and rebuttal expert reports. The stipulation is due by 5/8/2018. Last day to hear Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Jury Trial set for 5/20/2019 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: No appearance by counsel. Defendant Attorney: Zachary Tolson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 16 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #14 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 13 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
February 15, 2018 Filing 12 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/14/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 14, 2018 Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #9 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 9 PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) Modified on 2/14/2018 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amir Ashtiani.. (Biggs, Michael) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Document No. #1 ; page 19) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/12/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot U.S.A., Inc for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG17873675. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12065523). Filed byHome Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 1/29/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashtiani v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Zachary S. Tolson
Represented By: Joshua Seth Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Ashtiani
Represented By: Michael Shane Biggs
Represented By: David Alexander Kleczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Michael Shane Biggs
Represented By: Michael Shane Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?