Purnell v. Rudolph and Sletten Inc.
Plaintiff: Georgette G. Purnell
Defendant: Rudolph and Sletten Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01402
Filed: March 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 JUDGMENT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) ***The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 12/20/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing specifically sent to Georgette G. Purnell.*** Modified on 12/20/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER VACATING ALL DATES EXCEPT DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019) ***The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 11/20/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing specifically sent to Georgette G. Purnell.*** Modified on 11/20/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DENYING 144 SECOND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019) ***The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/18/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing specifically sent to Georgette G. Purnell.*** Modified on 10/18/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 145 Motion to Stay. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DENYING 136 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019) ***The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 9/23/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing specifically sent to Georgette G. Purnell.*** Modified on 9/23/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Discharging 85 Order to Show cause; denying 87 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Briefing; terminating 89 Motion for Sanctions. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/27/2019. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2019: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Regarding 67 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/6/2019. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 69 Motion to Compel Production. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2019: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ivaS, COURTSTAFF).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Regarding 59 Discovery Letter. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/19/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 56 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purnell v. Rudolph and Sletten Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgette G. Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph and Sletten Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?