American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California v. Transportation Security Administration (TSA) Featured Case

The American Civil Liberties Union has filed a lawsuit against the federal Transportation Security Administration under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), seeking records explaining why the TSA has imposed stricter search policies of electronics on domestic flights. The lawsuit points out that federal agencies have released information about changed policies with respect to searches of electronic devices at international borders, but have released no such information about searches of domestic air passengers.

Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Defendant: Transportation Security Administration (TSA)
Case Number: 3:2018cv01539
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2018 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Total Time in Court: 4 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff's Attorney: Linda Lye. Defendant's Attorney: Julie Davis. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2018)
August 1, 2018 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 22 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 7/30/2018 by Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 24, 2018 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 10, 2018 20 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, July 30, 2018, at 11:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 19 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
June 13, 2018 18 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byTransportation Security Administration (TSA). (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
May 29, 2018 17 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 16 Stipulation to Continue Date to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Continue Case Management Conference. Defendant will have until 6/13/2018 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Transportation Security Administration (TSA). (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 21, 2018 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Based on the court's scheduling conflict, the court continues the initial CMC from 6/28/2018 to 8/9/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor and directs the filing of the initial CMC statement by 8/2/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
April 4, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Stipulation to Continue Date to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Continue Case Management Conference. Defendant will have until 5/30/2018 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Initial Case Management Conference is reset from 6/14/2018 to 6/28/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2018. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 04/04/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Transportation Security Administration (TSA).. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/18/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Transportation Security Administration (TSA). (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 2, 2018 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California.. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 27, 2018 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 21, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Lye (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 15, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Transportation Security Administration (TSA) served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 13, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Transportation Security Administration (TSA). (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2018 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/13/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 12, 2018 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/26/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12178000.). Filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 3/12/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California v. Transportation Security Administration (TSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Represented By: Linda Lye
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Security Administration (TSA)
Represented By: Julie Bibb Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?