Ramos et al v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: Crista Ramos, Cristina Morales, Benjamin Zepeda, Orlando Zepeda, Juan Eduardo Ayala Flores, Maria Jose Ayala Flores, Elsy Yolanda Flores de Ayala, Hnaida Cenemat, Wilna Destin, Rilya Salary, Sherika Blanc, Imara Ampie, Mazin Ahmed and Hiwaida Elarabi
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen, Elaine C. Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv01554
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 120 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2018 10:30 AM. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
August 15, 2018 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Defendants' Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 08/15/2018. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 13, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule filed by Mazin Ahmed, etc. Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 9/25/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 6, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 20 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/6/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
June 25, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ABBREVIATED ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 20 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos et al v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crista Ramos
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Morales
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Zepeda
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Zepeda
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Eduardo Ayala Flores
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Jose Ayala Flores
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsy Yolanda Flores de Ayala
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hnaida Cenemat
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilna Destin
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rilya Salary
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherika Blanc
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imara Ampie
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazin Ahmed
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiwaida Elarabi
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Jessica Karp Bansal
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Amanda Robin Farfel
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Marisol Ramirez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Ryan
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Andrew Brian Talai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine C. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?