Dmuchowsky v. Sky Chefs, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eric Dmuchowsky
Defendant: Sky Chefs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01559
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 50 Stipulation Re 47 Reply to Opposition/Response. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/6/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
June 13, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 12, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 7, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the June 19, 2018 Initial Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
May 14, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Downs, Tiffany. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dmuchowsky v. Sky Chefs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Dmuchowsky
Represented By: Brent Dorian Brehm
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Chefs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?