Yuan v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case

Facebook shareholders filed a class action lawsuit against the social networking giant claiming that they suffered losses after the disclosure that Cambridge Analytica, a UK-based firm that aided the Trump campaign, improperly obtained profile information of 50 million users. The complaint alleges that Facebook and its executives "made false or misleading statements and failed to disclose that Facebook violated its own data privacy policies by allowing third parties access to personal data of millions of Facebook users without their consent."

Plaintiff: Fan Yuan
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Mark E. Zuckerberg and David M. Wehner
Movant: Ernestine Bennett
Case Number: 3:2018cv01725
Filed: March 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 123 Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi, Amalgamated Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Browne, John) (Filed on 11/15/2019) Modified on 11/18/2019 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF 122 Order: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 122 Order granting 121 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on October 28, 2019. The case management hearing set for November 14, 2019 is now continued to June 18, 2020. The parties shall file their joint case management statement on June 8, 2020. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 121 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CHANGE TIME TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2 filed by Amalgamated Bank. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 3, 2019 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF 120 Order: Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2019. Defendants responsive pleading or motion due by 1/15/2020. Responses due by 3/16/2020. Replies due by 4/24/2020. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2 AND ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RULE 12 MOTIONS OR TO ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT. Hearing on anticipated motion(s) to dismiss tentatively set for 5/21/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/3/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 119 STIPULATION Extending Time to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2 and Establishing Briefing Schedule for Rule 12 Motion or to Answer Amended Complaint filed by Amalgamated Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Browne, John) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 118 Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint 93 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on September 25, 2019.Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before 10/26/2019.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAmalgamated Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Browne, John) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 116 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 9/5/2019 is HEREBY RESET for 11/14/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/4/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 115 Order denying 113 Administrative Motion. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/31/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 114 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 113 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ) SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION filed bySecurities And Exchange Commission. (Tashjian, Robert) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 113 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Facebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. Responses due by 7/30/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAmalgamated Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Browne, John) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 111 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 6/27/2019 is HEREBY CONTINUED to 9/5/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 110 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Facebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAmalgamated Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Browne, John) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas David Warren (Warren, Thomas) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 107 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Action (Docket Item No. 93 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 5/9/2019 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 5/9/2019 hearing is VACATED NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 106 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARINGS. Please take NOTICE that Motion 93 to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint Hearing previously set for 4/25/2019 is HEREBY RESET TO 5/9/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 4/25/2019 is HEREBY RESET TO 6/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 105 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Amalgamated Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Browne, John) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 104 REPLY (re 93 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byFacebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 103 Declaration in Support of 101 Reply to Opposition/Response, 102 Request for Judicial Notice filed byFacebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35, # 2 Exhibit 36, # 3 Exhibit 37)(Related document(s) 101 , 102 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 102 Request for Judicial Notice re 101 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byFacebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 101 REPLY (re 93 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byFacebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi of Withdrawal of Counsel (Stickney, David) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 99 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 93 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byAmalgamated Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Browne, John) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 98 Response re 94 Request for Judicial Notice, Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Defendants' Request For Judicial Notice byAmalgamated Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Robinson, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 96 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/06/2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 5, 2019 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 96 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi, Amalgamated Bank (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Amalgamated Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. Responses due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Page Limitation)(Robinson, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/5/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2018 Filing 95 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz in Support of 94 Request for Judicial Notice, 93 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFacebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Related document(s) 94 , 93 ) (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 94 Request for Judicial Notice re 93 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFacebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Facebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/12/2019. Replies due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting 91 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/10/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 91 Defendants' Administrative Motion Regarding Page Limitation for Motion to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Page Limitation for Motion to Dismiss)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 12/7/2018) Modified on 12/10/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation Continuing Hearing Date. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/30/2018.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 89 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz in Support of 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing Hearing Date filed byFacebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 88 ) (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing Hearing Date filed by Facebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
October 18, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Kirschberg (Kirschberg, Jason) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 86 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION AMENDED COMPLAINT for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws against Facebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. Filed byPublic Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi, Amalgamated Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Amalgamated Bank Cert), # 2 Exhibit B (Mississippi Schedule))(Herman, Dennis) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/16/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 84 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Claiborne Hane, Counsel for Fern Helms. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/15/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26CRB7F2.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/1282018 filed by Fern Helms. (Hane, Claiborne) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ADD PARTY AND COUNSEL TO DOCKET. The court orders the Clerk to: 1. Add Fern Helms as a plaintiff on the docket for In re Facebook Inc. Securities Litigation, and 2. Add David Lawrence Hecht of Pierce Bainbridge Beck Price & Hecht LLP, 20 West 23rd St. 5th Floor, New York, NY 10010, as counsel for Helms on the same docket. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RELATING AND CONSOLIDATION ACTIONS. Granting 81 Motion to Relate Case 5:18-cv-05678-LHK and Consolidated for all purposes with 5:18-cv-01725-EJD. Case 5:18-cv-05678-LHK shall be reassigned to Judge Davila and then administratively closed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION to relate and consolidate cases filed by Amalgamated Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. Responses due by 9/25/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeremy P. Robinson, # 2 Proposed Order Relating and Consolidating Cases)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/21/2018) Modified on 9/25/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 78 Stipulated Request for Order to Change Time to File Consolidated Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-2, and Establishing Briefing Schedule for Rule 12 Motions. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/21/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2019. Case Management Conference scheduled for 9/20/2018 is RESET for 3/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2, AND ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RULE 12 MOTIONS filed by Amalgamated Bank. (Herman, Dennis) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 77 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 26(F) Report filed by Facebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 76 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 9/13/2018 by Tamara Lange. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Herman (Herman, Dennis) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 74 Certificate of Interested Entities by David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg Individual Defendants' Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 72 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 71 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, September 13, 2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 70 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 57 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for John C. Browne, Counsel for Public Employee's Retirement System of Mississippi. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 58 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Avi Josefson, Counsel for Public Employee's Retirement System of Mississippi. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting 59 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Michael D. Blatchley, Counsel for Public Employee's Retirement System of Mississippi. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 60 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Gerald H. Silk, Counsel for Public Employee's Retirement System of Mississippi. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 61 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy P. Robinson, Counsel for Public Employee's Retirement System of Mississippi. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Kate Aufses, Counsel for Public Employee's Retirement System of Mississippi. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Kate Aufses ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12610115.) filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Aufses, Kate) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy P. Robinson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12610098.) filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Robinson, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Gerald Silk ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12610071.) filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Silk, Gerald) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael D. Blatchley ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12610053.) filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blatchley, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Avi Josefson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12610040.) filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Josefson, Avi) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of John C. Browne ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12609994.) filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Browne, John) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 STIPULATION CONSOLIDATING CASES AND APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL; TERMINATING 25 29 39 AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/3/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Cases, Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 6/21/2018 is HEREBY RESET to 9/20/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 53 Declaration of George W. Neville in Support of 49 Reply to Opposition/Response, 39 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed byPublic Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Related document(s) 49 , 39 ) (Stickney, David) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 52 Declaration of David R. Stickney in Support of 39 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions, 49 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byPublic Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 39 , 49 ) (Stickney, David) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 51 Declaration of Danielle S. Myers in Support of 50 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byAmalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 50 ) (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY (re 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ) filed byAmalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund. (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 49 REPLY (re 39 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions ) filed byPublic Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 48 Declaration of Danielle S. Myers in Support of 47 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byAmalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 47 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 39 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions, 25 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byAmalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund. (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 46 Declaration of David R. Stickney in Support of 39 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions, 45 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byPublic Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 39 , 45 ) (Stickney, David) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 45 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 39 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions ) filed byPublic Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 44 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 43 Statement of Non-Opposition re 25 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byMichael P. Carfagna. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Avi Josefson Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by David Ronald Stickney on behalf of Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi (Stickney, David) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by David Ronald Stickney on behalf of Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi (Stickney, David) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 40 Declaration of David R. Stickney in Support of 39 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed byPublic Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certification, # 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Pendency, # 3 Exhibit C - BLBG Firm Resume)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Stickney, David) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/4/2018. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stickney, David) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bilkish Patel, Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd., Engin Taner re 35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of Bilkish Patel, Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd., Engin Taner (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 36 Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti in Support of 35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byBilkish Patel, Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd., Engin Taner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B - Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) 35 ) (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd., Bilkish Patel, Engin Taner. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/4/2018. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Kenneth Joseph Black on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund (Black, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Jason Cassidy Davis on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael Albert on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund (Albert, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 29 Declaration of Danielle S. Myers in Support of 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed byAmalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 28 ) (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the LV LargeCap 1000 Growth Index Fund, LongView Quantitative LargeCap Fund, and LongView Quant LargeCap Equity VEBA Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/4/2018. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Suzanne Myers (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 26 Declaration of Robert V. Prongay in Support of 25 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byMichael P. Carfagna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B - Certification, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Michael P. Carfagna. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/4/2018. Replies due by 6/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (L.R. 6-1(A)) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 20 Administrative Motion Relating Cases; and Granting 21 Stipulation. It is hereby ordered that cases 5:18-cv-01725-EJD Yuan v Facebook, Inc. et al. AND 3:18-cv-01868-WHA Ernestine v Facebook, Inc. ARE RELATED and such case shall be reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. The motion also requests to relate the case Casey v. Facebook, Inc., et al., No. 5:18-cv-01780-EJD (N.D. Cal.) (Casey) but it has since been DISMISSED ECF 13 Filed 4/13/2018, therefore the motion is MOOT as it relates to Casey. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/16/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ernestine Bennett re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Relate Securities Actions, 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related and [Proposed] filed by Ernestine Bennett. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 4/9/2018) Modified on 4/10/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2018 Filing 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Ernestine Bennett. Responses due by 4/13/2018. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Orin Snyder, Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila 4/5/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12248012.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Collins (Collins, Paul) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. Linsley, Esq (Linsley, Kristin) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Lutz (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 7 Administrative Motion TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 10 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Alexander Hood II, Counsel for Plaintiff Fan Yuan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/2/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, Counsel for Plaintiff, Fan Yuan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/2/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12238937.) filed by Fan Yuan. (Hood, J) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12238856.) filed by Fan Yuan. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying 6 Administrative Motion Consider whether cases related. It is hereby ordered that case 5:18-cv-01725-EJD and 3:18-cv-01792-SK are NOT related. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Natalie Ocegueda. Responses due by 4/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-12 AND 7-11 filed by Jeremiah F. Hallisey. Responses due by 3/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, # 2 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12203094.). Filed byFan Yuan. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Schedule A, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuan v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fan Yuan
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Collins
Represented By: Kristin A. Linsley, Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Orin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Zuckerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Wehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Ernestine Bennett
Represented By: Jason Cassidy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?