Renken et al v. Facebook, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lisa Renken and Sean Mannion
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01896
Filed: March 27, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Howard R Lloyd
1 Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2018 Cases associated: Create association to 3:18-cv-01881-RS. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
June 22, 2018 22 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 13, 2018, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (48 in 3:18-cv-01881-RS) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2018. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
June 13, 2018 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2018. Motions taken under submission; Court to issue an order. Total Time in Court: 45 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: L. Timothy Fisher, John Yanchunis, Kevin Hannon, Diana Zinser, Kristen Law Sagafi, Brian Murray.Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth Deeley, Nikki Sokol. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/13/2018)
June 7, 2018 20 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint and to Vacate Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/7/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 7, 2018 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint and to Vacate Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth L. Deeley)(Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
April 26, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING SELECTION OF INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL. Motion Hearing originally set for 5/17/2018 continued to 6/13/2018 10:00 AM.(rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 18, 2018 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Deeley on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 16, 2018 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Renken, Sean Mannion. Facebook, Inc. served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. (Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 5, 2018 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 AM or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 AM. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 AM to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Call at 866 582 6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 4, 2018 11 Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. Related to 18-cv-01881-RS Williams v. Facebook. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/4/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
March 30, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE CORRECTING CLERICAL ERROR. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 3/30/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 29, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 3/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 28, 2018 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sean Mannion, Lisa Renken.. (Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/11/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 27, 2018 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2018 01:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 27, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12225122.). Filed byLisa Renken, Sean Mannion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 3/27/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renken et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Renken
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Mannion
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?