Wahidullah Medical Corp. v. St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka
Plaintiff: Wahidullah Medical Corp
Defendant: Alexey Shereshevsky, Stuart Cataldo, Humboldt Medical Specialists, Inc, Bruce Kessler, Caroline Connor, Allan Wilke, John Aryunpur, Leo Leer, Providence St. Joseph Health Network, Miriam Steinberg, Amanda James, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka, Rachel Hatchimonji, St. Joseph Health System, Steven Korenstein, Amber Flowers, Providence St. Joseph Health, Robin Fraser, St. Joseph Health, Petra Kuhfahl, M.D., Gregory Holst, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare and Petra Kuhfahl
Case Number: 3:2018cv02074
Filed: April 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND #22 JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2018. Initial Case Management Conference and Motion reset from 11/1/2018 to 11/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re #24 Stipulation on Motion to Dismiss Briefing, Hearing, and Case Management Conference. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/5/2018. Replies due by 10/5/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/2018. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Motion To Dismiss Briefing, Hearing, and Case Management Conference filed by Wahidullah Medical Corp. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE re deadlines as to motion to dismiss. Responses due by 8/3/2018. Replies due by 8/17/2018. (per prior stipulation and order). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
June 29, 2018 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amber Flowers, Robin Fraser, Rachel Hatchimonji, Amanda James, Providence St. Joseph Health, Providence St. Joseph Health Network, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/13/2018. Replies due by 7/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ross, Douglas) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #20 re Case Management Conference Hearing Date and Motion to Dismiss Hearing Date filed by St. Joseph Health System, etc. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset from 9/6/2018 to 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Case Management Conference Hearing Date and Motion to Dismiss Hearing Date filed by Amber Flowers, Robin Fraser, Rachel Hatchimonji, Amanda James, Providence St. Joseph Health, Providence St. Joseph Health Network, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka. (Nangia, Sanjay) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #15 Re Service of Complaint, Case Management Conference Order, and Standing Orders; and Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by St. Joseph Health System, etc. Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/6/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 9/6/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/18/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadezhda Nikonova (Nikonova, Nadezhda) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David Raymond Garcia (Garcia, David) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Service of Complaint, Case Management Conference Order, and Standing Orders; and Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Amber Flowers, Robin Fraser, Rachel Hatchimonji, Amanda James, Providence St. Joseph Health Network, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka. (Nangia, Sanjay) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 14 EXHIBITS re #13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Douglas C. Ross ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12358031.) Certificate of Good Standing for Douglas C. Ross filed byAmber Flowers, Robin Fraser, Rachel Hatchimonji, Amanda James, Providence St. Joseph Health, Providence St. Joseph Health Network, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Ross, Douglas) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Douglas C. Ross ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12358031.) filed by Amber Flowers, Robin Fraser, Rachel Hatchimonji, Amanda James, Providence St. Joseph Health, Providence St. Joseph Health Network, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka. (Ross, Douglas) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjay Mohan Nangia Sanjay Nangia (Nangia, Sanjay) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjay Mohan Nangia of Allison A. Davis (Nangia, Sanjay) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/14/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John Aryunpur, Stuart Cataldo, Caroline Connor, Robin Fraser, Rachel Hatchimonji, Gregory Holst, Humboldt Medical Specialists, Inc, Amanda James, Bruce Kessler, Steven Korenstein, Petra Kuhfahl, Leo Leer, Providence St. Joseph Health, Providence St. Joseph Health Network, Alexey Shereshevsky, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka, Miriam Steinberg, Allan Wilke. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wahidullah Medical Corp.. (Clayton, Patrick) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2018 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wahidullah Medical Corp. d/b/a Redwood Urgent Care and Laboratory re #1 Complaint, (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against John Aryunpur, Stuart Cataldo, Caroline Connor, Amber Flowers, Robin Fraser, Rachel Hatchimonji, Gregory Holst, Humboldt Medical Specialists, Inc, Amanda James, Bruce Kessler, Steven Korenstein, Petra Kuhfahl, Leo Leer, Providence St. Joseph Health, Providence St. Joseph Health Network, Alexey Shereshevsky, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka, Miriam Steinberg, Allan Wilke (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12249623). Filed by Wahidullah Medical Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/5/2018) Modified on 4/23/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahidullah Medical Corp. v. St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexey Shereshevsky
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Cataldo
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt Medical Specialists, Inc
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Kessler
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Connor
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Wilke
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Aryunpur
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Leer
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence St. Joseph Health Network
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Steinberg
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda James
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Hatchimonji
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health System
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Korenstein
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Flowers
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence St. Joseph Health
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Fraser
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petra Kuhfahl, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Holst
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petra Kuhfahl
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: David Raymond Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wahidullah Medical Corp
Represented By: Francis Onofrei Scarpulla
Represented By: Patrick Bradford Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?