Los Angeles Times Communications LLC v. Kernan, et al. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, KQED, Inc and San Francisco Progressive Media Center
Defendant: Scott Kernan and Ronald Davis
Case Number: 3:2018cv02146
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: DPLC KC
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION Re Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice filed by San Francisco Progressive Media Center. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 45 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Ronald Davis, Ralph Diaz. (Mohmoud, Aseil) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/5/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 3/5/2019. Further Telephone Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Settlement conference is set for 5/31/2019. The Court to issue settlement conference order. (Not Reported)(Time 00:30)Attorney for Plaintiffs LA Times & KQED: Thomas Burke.Attorneys for Plaintiff San Francisco Progressive Media Center: Ben Berkowitz and Shilpi Agarwal.Attorneys for Defendants: Lawrence Bragg, Jay Goldman, Joanna Hood, and Michael Quinn. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Corley for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/15/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. Bench Trial set for 12/16/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/15/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2019. Court to issue Case Management Scheduling Order.Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Ajay Krishnan, Benjamin Berkowitz, Shilpi Agarwal, Thomas Burke. Defendant Attorney: Jay Goldman, Michael Quinn. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 39 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ronald Davis, Ralph Diaz, Scott Kernan. (Hood, Joanna) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by KQED, Inc, Los Angeles Times Communications LLC identifying Corporate Parent NantMedia Holdings, LLC for Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by San Francisco Progressive Media Center identifying Corporate Parent San Francisco Progressive Media Center for San Francisco Progressive Media Center. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
December 18, 2018 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. A Case Management Conference is set for February 14, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by February 7, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER Scheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/18/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Case Management Conference filed by San Francisco Progressive Media Center. (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Shilpi Agarwal (Agarwal, Shilpi) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER substituting party. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/4/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE by Ronald Davis, Scott Kernan Request for Substitution of Party (Hood, Joanna) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief byRonald Davis, Scott Kernan. (Quinn, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint in Part. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 8/16/2018. re 12 MOTION to Dismiss. Matter taken under submission; Court to issue an order.Total Time in Court: 35 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan.Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Sun, Thomas Burke, Linda Lye, Ajay Krishnan, Benjamin Berkowitz. Defendant Attorney: Jay Goldman, R. Lawrence Bragg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lawrence Bragg (Bragg, Robert) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Michael Goldman (Goldman, Jay) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
July 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Declaratory and Inunctive Relief Under FRCP 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion Hearing previously set for 7/19/2018 has been continued to 8/16/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 24 Administrative Motion. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 24 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO RESCHEDULE HEARING ON PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by San Francisco Progressive Media Center. Responses due by 7/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER S. SUN IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING)(Sun, Christopher) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY (re 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Declaratory and Inunctive Relief Under FRCP 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byRonald Davis, Scott Kernan. (Quinn, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Quinn as Defense Counsel (Quinn, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Ronald Davis, Scott Kernan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of R. Lawrence Bragg)(Bragg, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 19 ASSOCIATION of Counsel for Defendants by Ronald Davis, Scott Kernan. (Hood, Joanna) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Declaratory and Inunctive Relief Under FRCP 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byKQED, Inc, Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, San Francisco Progressive Media Center. (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Declaratory and Inunctive Relief Under FRCP 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion Hearing previously set for 6/21/2018 has been continued to 7/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 14 Stipulation. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 15 Declaration of Ajay S. Krishnan in Support of 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Opposition to and Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed bySan Francisco Progressive Media Center. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Opposition to and Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by San Francisco Progressive Media Center. (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying (648) without prejudice motion to coordinate case scheduling in case 3:06-cv-00219-RS; denying (11) without prejudice motion to coordinate case scheduling in case 3:18-cv-02146-RS. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Declaratory and Inunctive Relief Under FRCP 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Ronald Davis, Scott Kernan. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 5/17/2018. Replies due by 5/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Hood, Joanna) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Coordinate Case Scheduling filed by San Francisco Progressive Media Center. Responses due by 4/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ajay S. Krishnan, # 2 Proposed Order)(Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND DENYING MOTION TO RECONSIDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/20/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Francisco Progressive Media Center to Ronald Davis, Warden of the California State Prison at San Quentin (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Francisco Progressive Media Center to Scott Kernan, Secretary of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 7 Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RELATING CASES 06-00219 RS and 18-02146 LB. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/18/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ronald Davis, Scott Kernan. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief [42 U.S.C. § 1983] against Scott Kernan, Ronald Davis ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12263369.). Filed byLos Angeles Times Communications LLC, San Francisco Progressive Media Center, KQED, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krishnan, Ajay) (Filed on 4/11/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC v. Kernan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Jeff Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KQED, Inc
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Progressive Media Center
Represented By: Benjamin Berkowitz
Represented By: Ajay Krishnan
Represented By: Linda Lye
Represented By: Alan Lawrence Schlosser
Represented By: Christopher Steven Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Represented By: Joanna Breiden Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Joanna Breiden Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?