Guzman v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Mariano Guzman
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv02220
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2018 19 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/16/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Bench Trial set for 12/16/2019 to 12/19/2019 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/16/2018. Case referred to Private ADR. ADR shall be completed by 2/12/2019. Case deadlines and trial dates are set. The Court will issue a Pretrial Order. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Not Reported)(Time: 4 minutes.)Attorney for Plaintiff: Joel Fleck.Attorney for Defendant: Robin Wall. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2018)
August 9, 2018 17 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States of America. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
July 31, 2018 16 Defendant United States of America's ANSWER to Complaint for Damages Under the Federal Tort Claims Act byUnited States of America. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 27, 2018 15 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States of America. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
June 29, 2018 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Li, Michael) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 25, 2018 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mariano Guzman.. (Li, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 25, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #9 Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/16/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 21, 2018 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 21, 2018 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/5/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 21, 2018 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by United States of America. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
May 17, 2018 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mariano Guzman.. (Li, Michael) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
April 30, 2018 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/14/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 17, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 13, 2018 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/27/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Li, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Mariano Guzman . (Li, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Damages Under the Federal Tort Claims Act against United State of America (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12270707). Filed by Mariano Guzman. (Li, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2018) Modified on 4/17/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Robin Michael Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Guzman
Represented By: Michael C. Li
Represented By: Joel E. Fleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?