Williams v. Eaze Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Farrah Williams
Defendant: Eaze Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02598
Filed: May 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 47 MANDATE of USCA as to #45 Notice of Appeal filed by Farrah Williams (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
October 30, 2019 Filing 46 USCA Case Number 19-17144 9th Circuit for #45 Notice of Appeal filed by Farrah Williams. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Farrah Williams. Appeal of Order on Motion to Compel #44 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-13818198 paid.) (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/21/2019. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Albert Quoc Giang Fiona Tang withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Eaze Solutions Inc. Proposed Order included (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 42 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byFarrah Williams. (Related document(s) #25 , #21 , #40 , #17 ) (Hall, David) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 41 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byEaze Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
November 22, 2018 Filing 40 Supplemental Brief re #35 Motion Hearing, #21 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byFarrah Williams. (Related document(s) #35 , #21 ) (Hall, David) (Filed on 11/22/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 39 Supplemental Brief re #17 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action filed byEaze Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 38 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-11-2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #37 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2019. (Related documents(s) #37 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Eaze Solutions, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/11/18 before Judge James Donato by Farrah Williams, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Hall, David) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2018. re #17 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action filed by Eaze Solutions, Inc. Total Time in Court: 29 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debbie Pas. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. The Court re-sets the case management conference and the hearing on defendant's #17 motion to compel arbitration for October 11, 2018, at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/11/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #30 Administrative Motion to relate cases18-cv-05176-DMR Lloyd v. Eaze Solutions, Inc.; terminating #31 Stipulation. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 32 EXHIBITS re #30 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related EXHIBIT A (Lloyd Complaint) filed byFarrah Williams. (Related document(s) #30 ) (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #30 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Farrah Williams. (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 30 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Farrah Williams. Responses due by 9/11/2018. (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Farrah Williams. (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action (ECF No. 17) ) filed byEaze Solutions, Inc.. (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #27 Notice (Other) filed by Farr ah Williams Counsel are instructed to e-file an Administrative Motion on Whether Cases are Related using the correct e-filing Event. Also, Counsel are instructed to e-file a Notice of Related Case into case 18-5176 DMR. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 27 ERRONEOULSY E-FILED: SEE ERROR MESSAGE DATED 08/27/18 NOTICE by Farrah Williams of Pendency of Related Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lloyd Complaint)(Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 8/24/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2018 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action (ECF No. 17) filed by Farrah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply Brief)(Hall, David) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Tang, Fiona) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action ) filed byEaze Solutions, Inc.. (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
July 21, 2018 Filing 22 Declaration of Frank S. Hedin in Support of #21 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byFarrah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 7/21/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action ) filed byFarrah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 20 . Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/9/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The parties' stipulated request for an extension of time at #18 is granted. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 9/13/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/9/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #17 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action, #15 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Eaze Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Giang ISO of Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule re MTC Arbitration and Con't August 9th, 2018 CMC)(Giang, Albert) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 22, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action filed by Eaze Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/6/2018. Replies due by 7/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erickson ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Proposed Order re Defendant's Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Action)(Giang, Albert)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #11 . The jointly requested extension of time to respond to the complaint is granted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/12/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2018.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/24/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eaze Solutions, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Tang, Fiona) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, filed by Eaze Solutions, Inc.. (Tang, Fiona) (Filed on 5/21/2018) Modified on 5/22/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Fiona Tang (Tang, Fiona) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Quoc Giang (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Dietz Roth (Roth, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farrah Williams. Eaze Solutions, Inc. served on 5/4/2018, answer due 5/25/2018. (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 6 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Farrah Williams. (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 5/14/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eaze Solutions, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/17/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 2, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Eaze Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12321630.). Filed by Farrah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 5/2/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Eaze Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farrah Williams
Represented By: Frank S Hedin
Represented By: David William Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaze Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Fiona Tang
Represented By: Michael Dietz Roth
Represented By: Albert Quoc Giang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?