Arrow Electronics, Inc. v. ELNA Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Arrow Electronics Inc
Defendant: United Chemi-Con, Inc., Nissei Electric Co. Ltd., Toshin Kogyo Co., Ltd., Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd., Taitsu America, Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Shizuki Electric Co., Inc., Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd., Nitsuko Electronics Corporation, Soshin Electronics of America Inc., Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd., Elna America Inc., Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc., Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., Okaya Electric America Inc., Shinyei Kaisha, Soshin Electric Co., Ltd. and Taitsu Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv02657
Filed: May 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 155 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Meredith Lys Schultz (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 154 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 8-11-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2132 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Concurrent Expert Witness Proceeding held on 8/11/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER. The concurrent expert proceeding in the DAP cases will be held on August 11, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., by Zoom Webinar. The parties are directed to email Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark (jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov) by 5 p.m. on August 10, 2020, the names of their lead counsel and experts who will be speaking during the proceeding. The experts and lead counsel are requested to call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER RE CONCURRENT EXPERT WITNESS PROCEEDING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Meredith Lys Schultz Arrow Electronics, Inc.s Notice Of Withdrawal Of William A. Isaacson (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 149 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 4-16-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1278 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1280 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 148 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 4/16/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2020)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER. The status conference set for April 16, 2020, at 11 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by April 15, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Z oom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://zoom.us/j/98659502400?pwd=L1gvYlg5c0p5UmxkWkJLNVF2VGJzZ z09 Webinar ID: 986 5950 2400 Password: 858633 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +12532158782,,98659502400# or +13017158592,,98659502400# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099International numbers available: #https://zoom.us/u/auEUH85xn < br
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER. The Court sets a telephonic status conference for April 16, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. for the following DAP cases: Case Nos. 17-7046, 17-7047, 18-2657, 19-1902, and 19-3296. The status conference will be held on the Court's conference call line. The dial-in number is 1-877-402-9753, and the access code is 5266369. The parties are requested to dial in from a landline if at all possible, and to mute themselves whenever they are not speaking. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 145 Letter from Arrow Electronics, Inc. re: Certain DAPs' Letter Requesting Telephonic Status Conference. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 144 SECOND Updated Certificate of Interested Entities or Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Arrow Electronics Inc identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate NIC Components Corporation, Other Affiliate Richardson RFPD for Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2020 Filing 143 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Arrow Electronics Inc identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate NIC Components Corporation, Other Affiliate Richardson RFPD for Arrow Electronics Inc. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15 and Federal Rule 7.1(a) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER RE FIFTH AMENDMENT ASSERTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/15/2020. (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 141 REPLY (re #139 MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NIPPON CHEMI-CON CORP.S AND UNITED CHEMI-CON, INC.S MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) ALLOWING NORIAKI KAKIZAKI TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AT TRIAL AND (II) PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OF MR. KAKIZAKIS PRIOR IN ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-Con, Inc.. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 140 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #139 MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NIPPON CHEMI-CON CORP.S AND UNITED CHEMI-CON, INC.S MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) ALLOWING NORIAKI KAKIZAKI TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AT TRIAL AND (II) PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OF MR. KAKIZAKIS PRIOR IN ) filed byArrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A)(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 23, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NIPPON CHEMI-CON CORP.S AND UNITED CHEMI-CON, INC.S MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) ALLOWING NORIAKI KAKIZAKI TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AT TRIAL AND (II) PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OF MR. KAKIZAKIS PRIOR INVOCATION OF HIS FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS AT AN EARLIER DEPOSITION filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-Con, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/6/2020. Replies due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Berse, #3 Exhibit 1 to Berse Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Berse Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Berse Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Berse Decl., #7 Exhibit 5 to Berse Decl., #8 Exhibit 6 to Berse Decl., #9 Exhibit 7 to Berse Decl., #10 Exhibit 8 to Berse Decl., #11 Exhibit 9 to Berse Decl., #12 Exhibit 10 to Berse Decl., #13 Exhibit 11 to Berse Decl., #14 Exhibit 12 to Berse Decl.)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE by Arrow Electronics Inc of Filing Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants ELNA and Matsuo's Motion to (1) Admit Trial Testimony and (2) Preclude Evidence of Prior Invocations of the Fifth Amendment of Messrs. Inoue, Kinoshita, Imai, and Okubo (Master Docket ECF 1041) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE by Arrow Electronics Inc of Filing Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion Requesting Consideration of and Decision on KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment (Master Docket ECF 1026) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE by Arrow Electronics Inc of Defendants' Filing of Factual Statement Chart for Film-Only Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment on Direct Action Plaintiffs' Claims (ECF 968) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation re #110 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Filing Joint Fact Statement Chart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 134 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fact Statement Chart re Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Fact Statement Chart, #4 Unredacted Fact Statement Chart)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 133 Appendix re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-Con, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [NCC SJ Facts Chart], #2 Exhibit 2 [UCC SJ Facts Chart])(Related document(s) #109 , #107 ) (Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting (923 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Stipulation Between DAPs and Certain Defendants Regarding Case Schedule. The jointly requested one-week extension is granted, and the DAP-specific charts are due by September 23, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/12/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 131 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Schedule filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 130 REPLY (re #110 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Defendants' Reply Brief filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply Brief ISO Certain Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Reply Brief ISO Certain Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 128 REPLY (re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 127 REPLY (re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byUnited Chemi-Con, Inc.. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 126 REPLY (re #106 MOTION to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton ) filed byArrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibits B-E (Filed Under Seal))(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply to Motion to Strike, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply to Motion to Strike, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E)(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting (829 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION REGARDING DR. MARX DAUBERT BRIEFING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting Arrow Electronics Inc's Motion to Confirm Opt Out Status, or Alternatively, to Enlarge Its Time to Opt Out, MDL Dkt. No. 582. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 122 ANSWER to Complaint bySoshin Electric Co., Ltd., Soshin Electronics of America Inc.. (Fornaciari, John) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE by Arrow Electronics Inc of Filing Responses to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion on the MDL Docket (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 120 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by United Chemi-Con Corporation filed byArrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken, #2 Exhibit A to Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Turken Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Turken Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Turken Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Turken Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Turken Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Turken Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Turken Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Turken Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Turken Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Turken Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Turken Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Turken Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Turken Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Turken Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Turken Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to Turken Declaration, #24 Exhibit W to Turken Declaration, #25 Exhibit X to Turken Declaration, #26 Exhibit Y to Turken Declaration, #27 Exhibit Z to Turken Declaration, #28 Exhibit AA to Turken Declaration, #29 Exhibit BB to Turken Declaration, #30 Exhibit CC to Turken Declaration, #31 Exhibit DD to Turken Declaration, #32 Exhibit EE to Turken Declaration, #33 Exhibit FF to Turken Declaration)(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to United Chemi-Con's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to UCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to UCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit I, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit J, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit O, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit W, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit X, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Y, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Z, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AA, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BB, #31 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CC, #32 Unsealed Version of Exhibit DD, #33 Unsealed Version of Exhibit EE, #34 Unsealed Version of Exhibit FF)(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 118 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #110 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) By Nippon Chemi-Con filed byArrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken, #2 Exhibit A to Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Turken Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Turken Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Turken Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Turken Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Turken Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Turken Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Turken Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Turken Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Turken Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Turken Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Turken Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Turken Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Turken Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Turken Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Turken Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to Turken Declaration, #24 Exhibit W to Turken Declaration, #25 Exhibit X to Turken Declaration, #26 Exhibit Y to Turken Declaration, #27 Exhibit Z to Turken Declaration, #28 Exhibit AA to Turken Declaration, #29 Exhibit BB to Turken Declaration, #30 Exhibit CC to Turken Declaration, #31 Exhibit DD to Turken Declaration, #32 Exhibit EE to Turken Declaration, #33 Exhibit FF to Turken Declaration, #34 Exhibit GG to Turken Declaration)(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 117 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Nippon Chemi-Con's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to NCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to NCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit O, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit U, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit V, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit W, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit X, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Y, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Z, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AA, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BB, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CC, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit DD)(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Opt-Out Plaintiff Arrow Electronics, Inc. and Defendants for Administrative Relief filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: (723 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics, Inc., (113 in 3:18-cv-02657-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sean Phillips Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT OKAYA. Motions terminated: (616 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics, Inc., (104 in 3:18-cv-02657-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/19/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation re #110 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Declaration of E. Enson - Unredacted Copy (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Enson, #2 Exhibit 1 Underseal, #3 Exhibit 2 Underseal, #4 Exhibit 3 Underseal, #5 Exhibit 4 Underseal, #6 Exhibit 5 Underseal, #7 Exhibit 6 Underseal, #8 Exhibit 7 Underseal, #9 Exhibit 8 Underseal, #10 Exhibit 9 Underseal, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11 Underseal, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13 Underseal, #15 Exhibit 14 Underseal, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16 Underseal, #18 Exhibit 17 Underseal, #19 Exhibit 18 Underseal, #20 Exhibit 19 Underseal, #21 Exhibit 20 Underseal, #22 Exhibit 21 Underseal, #23 Exhibit 22 Underseal, #24 Exhibit 23 Underseal, #25 Proposed Order)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Chemi-Con, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Proposed Order, #46 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Ozurovich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Motion for Summary Judgment on DAPs' Claims Redacted, #4 Motion for Summary Judgment on DAPs' Claims Unredacted, #5 Declaration of E. Enson and Redacted Exhibits, #6 Declaration of E. Enson and Unredacted Exhibits)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION to Strike Sur-Replies of Stephen Prowse and Frederick Warren-Boulton filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal))(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 105 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Strike, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Strike, #5 Exhibit Unsealed Version of Exhibit C to Motion to Strike, #6 Exhibit Unsealed Version of Exhibit D to Motion to Strike, #7 Exhibit Unsealed Version of Exhibit E to Motion to Strike, #8 Exhibit Unsealed Version of Exhibit F to Motion to Strike)(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE by Arrow Electronics Inc re #101 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO CONFIRM OPT OUT STATUS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, ENLARGE ITS TIME TO OPT OUT OF THE NON-SETTLEMENT CLASS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS NON-OPPOSITION TO ARROWS MOTION TO CONFIRM OPT-OUT STATUS [DE 101] (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 102 Declaration of Meredith Schultz in Support of #101 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO CONFIRM OPT OUT STATUS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, ENLARGE ITS TIME TO OPT OUT OF THE NON-SETTLEMENT CLASS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed byArrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #101 ) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO CONFIRM OPT OUT STATUS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, ENLARGE ITS TIME TO OPT OUT OF THE NON-SETTLEMENT CLASS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Responses due by 5/31/2019. Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge James Donato in case 3:14-cv-03264-JD; granting (538) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MDL SCHEDULING ORDER in case 3:17-md-02801-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 99 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant Toshin Kogyo, Ltd. (Related documents(s) #96 )(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 98 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant Nissei Electric Co., Ltd. (Related documents(s) #94 )(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 97 Declaration of Meredith Schultz in Support of #96 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Toshin Kogyo, Ltd. filed byArrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #96 ) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Toshin Kogyo, Ltd. filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 95 Declaration of Meredith Schultz in Support of #94 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Nissei Electric Co., Ltd. filed byArrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #94 ) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Nissei Electric Co., Ltd. filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT, Dkt. No. 415 in 3:17-md-02801-JD & Dkt. No. 91 in 3:18-cv-02657-JD. Plaintiff Arrow Electronics, Inc. is granted a second extension of time, through July 16, 2019, to serve the summons and complaint on defendants Nissei and Toshin Kogyo under the Hague Convention. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/26/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 92 Declaration of Meredith Schultz in Support of #91 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Complaint filed byArrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #91 ) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 91 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Complaint filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting DAPs' and Defendants' Stipulation re Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures. MDL Dkt. No. 384. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/16/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge jam granting #85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Paul C. Southwick. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge James Donato terminating #84 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kaley L. Fendall. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 86 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12825939.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/6/18 filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Fendall, Kaley) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12828444.) filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Southwick, Paul) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12825939.) filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Fendall, Kaley) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting Dkt. No. 333 in 3:17-md-02801-JD; Dkt. No. 81 in 3:18-cv-02657-JD. The Court grants plaintiff Arrow Electronics, Inc. and defendant Nitsuko Electronics Corporation's joint motion for dismissal with prejudice of all claims against Nitsuko Electronics Corporation. Arrow's claims against Nitsuko Electronics Corporation are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MDL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/5/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Nitsuko Electronics Corp with Prejudice filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Responses due by 10/9/2018. Replies due by 10/16/2018. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle N. Smith (Smith, Kyle) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Isaacson (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Philip J. Iovieno. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Anne Nardacci. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William A. Isaacson. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kyle Smith. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Soshin Electric Co., Ltd. and Soshin Electronics of America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Arrow Electronics, Inc.'s Complaint by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kyle Smith ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12570508.) filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Smith, Kyle) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice William A. Isaacson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12570390.) filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12569410.) filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nardacci, Anne) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12569327.) filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT, Dkt. No. 278 in 3:17-md-02801-JD & Dkt. No. 63 in 3:18-cv-02657-JD. Plaintiff Arrow Electronics, Inc. is granted an additional six months, until January 16, 2019, to serve the summons and complaint under the Hague Convention on defendants Nissei Electric Company, Ltd. and Toshin Kogyo, Ltd. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/26/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION re Further Extension of Time for Soshin Defendants to Respond to Complaint of Arrow Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/25/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Pascual Oliu (Oliu, Pascual) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge James Donato terminating #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Pascual A. Oliu. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 64 Declaration of Meredith Schultz in Support of #63 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint filed byArrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #63 ) (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Responses due by 7/27/2018. Replies due by 8/3/2018. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart H. Singer (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Lys Schultz (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Patrick Gray (Gray, Corey) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arrow Electronics Inc (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Pascual A. Oliu Correction of docket #51 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12509001.) filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Oliu, Pascual) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Corey P. Gray. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Meredith L. Schultz. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart H. Singer. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Further Extension of Time for Soshin Defendants to Respond to Complaint of Arrow Electronics, Inc. filed by Soshin Electric Co., Ltd., Soshin Electronics of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 53 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Arrow Electronics Inc identifying Other Affiliate NIC Components Corporation, Other Affiliate Richardson RFPD for Arrow Electronics Inc. Pursuant to C.L.R 3-15 and Federal Rule 7.1(a) (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Corey P. Gray ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12509021.) filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Gray, Corey) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Pascual A. Oliu ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12509001.) filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Oliu, Pascual) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Meredith L. Schultz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12508932.) filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Stuart H. Singer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12508910.) filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Phillips Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint byMatsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Lau on behalf of Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE SOSHIN DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO ARROW ELECTRONICS, INC.'S COMPLAINT, MDL Dkt. No. 250. Soshin's response deadline is extended to July 16, 2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/9/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schultz, Meredith) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Okaya Electric America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd. for Okaya Electric America Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Prescott, Darrell) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Mizuho Trust and Banking Co., Ltd., as trustee for Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd., Retirement Benefits Trust for Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Prescott, Darrell) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Yunie Stillman As Counsel for Defendants Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd. and Okaya Electric America, Inc. (Stillman, Catherine) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Elizabeth Hausler As Counsel for Defendants Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd. and Okaya Electric America, Inc. (Hausler, Meghan) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Wong As Counsel for Defendants Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd. and Okaya Electric America, Inc. (Wong, Christina) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer filed by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint byOkaya Electric America Inc., Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd.. (Prescott, Darrell) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byUnited Chemi-Con, Inc.. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Chemi-Con, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chemi-Con Americas Holding, Inc. for United Chemi-Con, Inc.. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Japan Trustees Services Bank, ltd for Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint byElna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (O'Grady, Margaret) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Shea Kaufhold (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret E. O'Grady (O'Grady, Margaret) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 28 Defendant Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint byShizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant Nitsuko Electronics Corporation (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byNitsuko Electronics Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nitsuko Electronics Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Kamaya Electric Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent NEC Platforms, Ltd. for Nitsuko Electronics Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nitsuko Electronics Corporation (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron James Clark on behalf of Nitsuko Electronics Corporation (Clark, Cameron) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Maureen Larkin-Wong on behalf of Nitsuko Electronics Corporation (Larkin-Wong, Katherine) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Marie Bauer on behalf of Nitsuko Electronics Corporation (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda S Lee on behalf of Nitsuko Electronics Corporation (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 29, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time for Soshin Defendants to Respond to Complaint of Arrow Electronics, Inc. filed by Soshin Electric Co., Ltd., Soshin Electronics of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (222) Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Parties' Coordination of Discovery in case 3:17-md-02801-JD. The Court grants the joint motion. The Stipulating Defendants' deadline to answer Arrow Electronics' complaint is extended to July 2, 2018, and the Court approves the parties' agreements regarding discovery. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-00889. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 2, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDTIONAL TRANSFER ORDEDR (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from 18-cv- 00889 CMA-MEH, to The Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2801 by Clerk on 5/2/2018. (evana, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Samuel Sage Bacon on behalf of Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.Attorney Samuel Sage Bacon added to party Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.(pty:dft) (Bacon, Samuel)
April 25, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Meredith Lys Schultz on behalf of Arrow Electronics, Inc.Attorney Meredith Lys Schultz added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:pla) (Schultz, Meredith)
April 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Pascual Oliu on behalf of Arrow Electronics, Inc.Attorney Pascual Oliu added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:pla) (Oliu, Pascual)
April 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle Smith on behalf of Arrow Electronics, Inc.Attorney Kyle Smith added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:pla) (Smith, Kyle)
April 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anne M. Nardacci on behalf of Arrow Electronics, Inc.Attorney Anne M. Nardacci added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:pla) (Nardacci, Anne)
April 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Anthony Isaacson on behalf of Arrow Electronics, Inc.Attorney William Anthony Isaacson added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:pla) (Isaacson, William)
April 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stuart Harold Singer on behalf of Arrow Electronics, Inc.Attorney Stuart Harold Singer added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:pla) (Singer, Stuart)
April 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
April 17, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Iovieno, Philip)
April 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to ELNA CO., LTD., ELNA AMERICA INC., MATSUO ELECTRIC CO., LTD., TOSHIN KOGYO., LTD., OKAYA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., OKAYA ELECTRIC AMERICA INC., TAITSU CORPORATION, TAITSU AMERICA, INC., SHINYEI KAISHA, SHINYEI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD., SHINYEI CAPACITOR CO., LTD., SHINYEI CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., NITSUKO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, NISSEI ELECTRIC CO., LTD., SHIZUKI ELECTRIC CO., INC., SOSHIN ELECTRIC CO., LTD., SOSHIN ELECTRONICS OF AMERICA, INC., NIPPON CHEMI-CON CORPORATION, and UNITED CHEMI-CON, INC. by Plaintiff Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(Iovieno, Philip)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/17/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2018 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. The Plaintiff shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (mdave, )
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 5/17/2018 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/17/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 16, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summonses submitted have incomplete caption and are not issued. Please file completed summonses listing all named plaintiffs and defendants for issuance using the event Summons Request. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct data entry error on 4/16/2018 (cmadr, ).
April 16, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELNA America Inc., ELNA Co., Ltd., Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd., Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation, Nissei Electric Co. Ltd., Nitsuko Electronics Corporation, Okaya Electric America Inc., Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd., Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc., Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd., Shizuki Electric Co., Inc., Soshin Electric Co., Ltd., Soshin Electronics of America Inc., TOSHIN KOGYO Co., Ltd., Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation, United Chemi-Con, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6053189)Attorney Philip J. Lovieno added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons)(Lovieno, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrow Electronics, Inc. v. ELNA Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Chemi-Con, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Represented By: Quynh K Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissei Electric Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshin Kogyo Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Hausler
Represented By: Darrell Prescott
Represented By: Christina M. Wong
Represented By: Catherine Yunie Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taitsu America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elna Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Margaret E. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Sage Bacon
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Represented By: Kaley Louise Fendall
Represented By: Paul C Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nitsuko Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Cameron James Clark
Represented By: Ashley Marie Bauer
Represented By: Katherine Maureen Larkin-Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soshin Electronics of America Inc.
Represented By: John R Fornaciari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nippon Chemi-con Corporation
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Represented By: Quynh K Vu
Represented By: Eric Patrick Enson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elna America Inc.
Represented By: Margaret E. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okaya Electric America Inc.
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Hausler
Represented By: Darrell Prescott
Represented By: Christina M. Wong
Represented By: Catherine Yunie Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinyei Kaisha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soshin Electric Co., Ltd.
Represented By: John R Fornaciari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taitsu Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrow Electronics Inc
Represented By: Anne M. Nardacci
Represented By: William Anthony Isaacson
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: Kyle Smith
Represented By: Pascual Oliu
Represented By: Meredith Lys Schultz
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Corey Patrick Gray
Represented By: Kyle N. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?