Intel Corporation v. Tela Innovations, Inc.

Plaintiff: Intel Corporation
Defendant: Tela Innovations, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02848
Filed: May 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ON 106 , 129 , 133 MOTIONS TO DISMISS, 105 TO STRIKE, 136 TO QUASH, AND 127 FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick. 126 , 143 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal granted in part and denied in part. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 STIPULATION for Extension of Time. Reply due by 2/13/2019 re 90 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/08/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S 43 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick also denying 42 , 53 , 57 , 67 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S 28 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO SEAL Judge William H. Orrick. 44 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is granted. 28 , 33 , 39 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal denied with leave to amend. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intel Corporation v. Tela Innovations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Adam R. Alper
Represented By: Gregory S. Arovas
Represented By: Michael Woodrow De Vries
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Represented By: Alex Henriques
Represented By: Nyika Onyesi Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tela Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?