Franklin v. OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Gregory Franklin
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv03333
Filed: June 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (FIRST) 55 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY granting 44 Motion ; finding as moot 45 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 20 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Franklin
Represented By: Emily C Beecham
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Mandy Chan
Represented By: Edward Dean Totino
Represented By: Perrie Michael Weiner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?