Zhang v. Ashton et al
Plaintiff: Albert Zhang
Defendant: Angelos M. Stergiou, Mark W. Schwartz, Stephen F. Ghiglieri, Irving M. Einhorn, Sanford J. Hillsberg, Stephen Galliker, Robert L. Van Nostrand, Richard Chin, Fabio Lopez, William L. Ashton, Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. f/k/a/ Galena Biopharma, Inc., Rudolph Nisi, Jane Wasman, John Varian and David A. Scheinberg
Case Number: 3:2018cv03804
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SETTING SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendants need not answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint until August 30, 2018. Plaintiff shall have until September 28, 2018 to file an opposition to any motion to dismiss, and defendants shall have until October 19, 2018 to file a reply to plaintiff's opposition. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Schedule for Briefing on Motion to Dismiss filed by William L. Ashton, Richard Chin, Irving M. Einhorn, Stephen Galliker, Stephen F. Ghiglieri, Sanford J. Hillsberg, Fabio Lopez, Rudolph Nisi, David A. Scheinberg, Mark W. Schwartz, Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. f/k/a/ Galena Biopharma, Inc., Angelos M. Stergiou, Robert L. Van Nostrand, John Varian, Jane Wasman. (Han, Edward) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN SINGLE-SIDED FORMAT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendants need not answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint until August 24, 2018. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an opposition to any motion to dismiss, and defendants shall have 21 days to file a reply to plaintiff's opposition. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albert Zhang re #16 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Shuman, Kip) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2018 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2018.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 25, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William L. Ashton, Richard Chin, Irving M. Einhorn, Stephen Galliker, Stephen F. Ghiglieri, Sanford J. Hillsberg, Fabio Lopez, Rudolph Nisi, David A. Scheinberg, Mark W. Schwartz, Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. f/k/a/ Galena Biopharma, Inc., Angelos M. Stergiou, Robert L. Van Nostrand, John Varian, Jane Wasman.. (Han, Edward) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 25, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Acceptance of Service and Setting Schedule for Briefing on Motion to Dismiss filed by William L. Ashton, Richard Chin, Irving M. Einhorn, Stephen Galliker, Stephen F. Ghiglieri, Sanford J. Hillsberg, Fabio Lopez, Rudolph Nisi, David A. Scheinberg, Mark W. Schwartz, Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. f/k/a/ Galena Biopharma, Inc., Angelos M. Stergiou, Robert L. Van Nostrand, John Varian, Jane Wasman and Albert Zhang. (Han, Edward) (Filed on 7/25/2018) Modified on 7/26/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Albert Zhang.. (Shuman, Kip) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 11, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/25/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 9 Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint re #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Albert Zhang. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Shuman, Kip) (Filed on 7/10/2018) Modified on 7/11/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Albert Zhang: Plaintiff Albert Zhang did not provide chambers copies of docket no. 2, Plaintiff's administrative motion to file under seal, as required by Civil Local Rules 5-1(e)(7) and 79-5(d)(2). Plaintiff shall submit chambers copies of these documents to be delivered by no later than 7/11/2018. Additionally, Plaintiff must comply with Civil Local Rule 79-5(d)(1)(D), and submit an unredacted version of the document sought to be filed under seal, which indicates the portions of the document that have been omitted from the redacted version. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/9/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Richard Chin, Irving M. Einhorn, Stephen Galliker, Stephen F. Ghiglieri, Sanford J. Hillsberg, Fabio Lopez, Rudolph Nisi, David A. Scheinberg, Mark W. Schwartz, Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. f/k/a/ Galena Biopharma, Inc., Angelos M. Stergiou, Robert L. Van Nostrand, John Varian, Jane Wasman. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 3, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Shuman, Kip) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2018. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 Declaration of Shahzeb Lari in Support of #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed bySellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. f/k/a/ Galena Biopharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Han, Edward) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Albert Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Part One to Motion to Seal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Part Two to Motion to Seal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Seal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Motion to Seal, #6 Declaration Declaration of Kip B. Shuman In Support of Motion to Seal, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Redacted Complaint, #9 SEALED COMPLAINT)(Shuman, Kip) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12465760.). Filed byAlbert Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shuman, Kip) (Filed on 6/26/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang v. Ashton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelos M. Stergiou
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark W. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. Ghiglieri
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving M. Einhorn
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford J. Hillsberg
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Galliker
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Van Nostrand
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Chin
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabio Lopez
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Ashton
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. f/k/a/ Galena Biopharma, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph Nisi
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Wasman
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Varian
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Scheinberg
Represented By: Edward Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Zhang
Represented By: Kip Brian Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?