Johnson v. Kasss LLC

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Kasss LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv04195
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Vince Chhabria
1 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2018 15 NOTICE by Scott Johnson of Withdrawal of Counsel Khushpreet Mehton (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kasss LLC (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byKasss LLC. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J Morin (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 19, 2018 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 1/31/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 10 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Vince Chhabria. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael N. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 9 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 16, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Kasss LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12509460.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kasss LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Khushpreet R. Mehton
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasss LLC
Represented By: Richard J Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?