Potter Handy, LLP v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Potter Handy, LLP
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv04214
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Handy, LLP. U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Thimesch, Timothy) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Dismiss Action filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/13/2018. Replies due by 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan M. Craig ISO, #2 Exhibit 1 to Craig Dec., #3 Exhibit 2 to Craig Dec., #4 Exhibit 3 to Craig Dec., #5 Exhibit 4 to Craig Dec.)(Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 17 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/17/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Bank, N.A... (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Potter Handy, LLP.. (Thimesch, Timothy) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 #Electronic filing error re: #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order; Please refer to document no. #12 for corrected scheduling order. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/20 18)
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by U.S. Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Other Affiliate U.S. Bank, N.A., Other Affiliate Potter Handy, LLP for U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 #Electronic filing error Re: #9 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by U.S. Bank, N.A. Please re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all association of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, or other entities that have a financial interest or could be substantially affected by the outcome of the proceeding. [err800] (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/21/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank, N.A. AND CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES LISTING POTTER HANDY, LLP AND U.S. BANK, N.A. (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byU.S. Bank, N.A.. (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/13/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank, N.A.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 *ERRONEOUS ENTRY - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #12 * Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Thimesch, Timothy) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Potter Handy, LLP . (Thimesch, Timothy) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Under Title V of the ADA for Retaliation) against U.S. Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12511148). Filed byPotter Handy, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Thimesch, Timothy) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified on 7/16/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potter Handy, LLP v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Potter Handy, LLP
Represented By: Timothy Squire Thimesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Ryan Moore Craig
Represented By: Benjamin Ross Trachtman, Trach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?