Lauren Von Blohn v. Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Lauren von Blohn
Defendant: Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company and California Physician's Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv04228
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 18 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 4, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 30, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ketakee Rajiv Kane as Counsel for Defendant California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California (Kane, Ketakee) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Neil Pimstone Counsel for Defendant California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California (Pimstone, Gregory) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 13 STIPULATION re #9 Amended Complaint, Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by California Physician's Service, Inc.. (Laska, Joseph) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Physician's Service, Inc... (Laska, Joseph) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Laska as Counsel for Defendant California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California (Laska, Joseph) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carri Maas as Counsel for Defendant California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California (Maas, Carri) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 10, 2018 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BENEFITS AND FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT INCOME SECURITY ACT OF 1974 ("ERISA"); against All Defendants. Filed byLauren Von Blohn. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2018 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company. (Laska, Joseph) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
July 20, 2018 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lauren Von Blohn - Certification of No Reportable Interests (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lauren Von Blohn.. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 16, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 4 Featured Case Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/16/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Lauren von Blohn Plaintiff Entered Incorrectly. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR BENEFITS AND FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT INCOME SECURITY ACT OF 1974 ("ERISA"); against Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12512948.). Filed by Lauren Von Blohn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified on 7/16/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauren Von Blohn v. Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren von Blohn
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Edward Laska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Physician's Service, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Laska
Represented By: Gregory Neil Pimstone
Represented By: Carri Maas
Represented By: Ketakee Rajiv Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?