Laine et al v. Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Grace Huber, Joshua Laine, Daniel Huber, Jeremy Laine, Poppy Laine, Jared Laine, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino, Austin Marino, Debbie Laine, Danica Declue, Alan Declue, Merry Declue, Daniel Marino and Keith Laine
Defendant: Cheryl Hicks, Judicial Council, Barbara Barovsky, Rinda Topel, Martin Hoshino, Gregory Oravetz, Sarah Schulze, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Matthew Oliveri, Vickie Dutton, Law Offices fo Cristin Lowe, Administrative Office of the Courts of Alameda County, Cristin Loew, John Laettner, Chad Finke, Gregory Silva, County of Alameda, Anne Howell, Nancy Young, Christopher Bowen, Robyn Ginney, Stephen Nash, Cynthia Campanile, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Alameda County Department of Child Support Services, Boydine Hall, Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile, Oliveri Law LLP, State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Law Offices of Cheryl Hicks, Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, Administrative Office of the Courts of Contra Costa County, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Commissioner Jason Clay, Gregory Syren, Melissa Oravetz, Valerie Declue, Commission on Judicial Performance, County of Contra Costa, John Kincaid, Shannon Jones and Shannon Jones Law Group
Case Number: 3:2018cv04390
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 206 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Robert Stephen James Rogoyski (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rogoyski, Robert) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 205 REPLY (re #190 MOTION to Strike #152 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint (Notice) ) filed byCynthia Campanile, Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 1/8/2019) Modified on 1/9/2019 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2019 Filing 204 REPLY (re #187 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint per FRCP Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) ) filed byCynthia Campanile, Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 203 REPLY (re #186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1)(6) ) filed byGregory Oravetz, Melissa Oravetz. (Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 202 REPLY (re #185 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1)(6) ) filed byRobyn Ginney, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Sarah Schulze, Gregory Silva. (Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 201 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant California Department of Motor Vehicles' Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/16/2019. Replies due by 1/23/2019. (Beatty, Christopher) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 200 REPLY (re #182 MOTION for Joinder IN LOWE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO JOINDER IN LOWE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byShannon Jones, Shannon Jones Law Group. (Fine, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 199 REPLY (re #181 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byShannon Jones, Shannon Jones Law Group. (Fine, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 31, 2018 Filing 198 Statement of Non-Opposition re #169 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byJason Clay, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, Judicial Council, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. (Related document(s) #169 ) (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 31, 2018 Filing 197 REPLY (re #164 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA ) filed byContra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa. (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 31, 2018 Filing 196 NOTICE by Law Offices fo Cristin Lowe, Cristin Loew of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Everson, Janet) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Vacating Hearings. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2018 Filing 194 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Alameda County Department of Child Support Services, County of Alameda, Anne Howell. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service PROOF OF SERVICE RE MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Widen, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 193 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion , Brief, and LEM Decl. served on ECF and Mail Defendants on 12/13/18, filed by Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile re #190 MOTION to Strike #152 Amended Complaint,,,,, Second Amended Complaint (Notice), #191 Brief, #192 Declaration in Support, (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 192 Declaration of Laura E. Malkosky in Support of #190 MOTION to Strike #152 Amended Complaint,,,,, Second Amended Complaint (Notice), #191 Brief, filed byLaw Offices of Cynthia Campanile. (Related document(s) #190 , #191 ) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 191 Brief re #190 MOTION to Strike #152 Amended Complaint,,,,, Second Amended Complaint (Notice) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion filed byLaw Offices of Cynthia Campanile. (Related document(s) #190 ) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 190 MOTION to Strike #152 Amended Complaint,,,,, Second Amended Complaint (Notice) filed by Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile re #187 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint per FRCP Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #188 Brief, (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 188 Brief re #187 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint per FRCP Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion filed byLaw Offices of Cynthia Campanile. (Related document(s) #187 ) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 187 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint per FRCP Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 186 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1)(6) filed by Gregory Oravetz, Melissa Oravetz. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 185 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1)(6) filed by Robyn Ginney, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Sarah Schulze, Gregory Silva. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 184 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Cheryl Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edson, Mark) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 183 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Cheryl Hicks. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/26/2018. Replies due by 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edson, Mark) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 182 MOTION for Joinder IN LOWE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Shannon Jones Law Group. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 181 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Shannon Jones Law Group. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/26/2018. Replies due by 1/2/2019. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 180 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant California Department of Motor Vehicles' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memo of P&As in Support Thereof filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/26/2018. Replies due by 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beatty, Christopher) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Kincaid re #175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6), #176 Request for Judicial Notice, #178 Proposed Order, #177 Notice (Other) of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 178 Proposed Order re #176 Request for Judicial Notice, #177 Notice (Other) by John Kincaid. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE by John Kincaid re #175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6), #176 Request for Judicial Notice (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 176 Request for Judicial Notice re #175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6) filed byJohn Kincaid. (Related document(s) #175 ) (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6) filed by John Kincaid. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/24/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 174 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) AND TO STRIKE UNDER CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. SECTION 425.16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Rinda Topel. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/24/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service COS)(Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 173 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Oliveri Law LLP. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/24/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service COS)(Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 172 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) AND TO STRIKE UNDER CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. SECTION 425.16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Matthew Oliveri. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/24/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss 2A Complaint, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service COS)(Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 171 Request for Judicial Notice re #169 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byJason Clay, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. (Related document(s) #169 ) (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 170 Brief re #169 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byJason Clay, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. (Related document(s) #169 ) (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 169 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Jason Clay, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/24/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 168 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Law Offices fo Cristin Lowe, Cristin Loew. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/24/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018. (Everson, Janet) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 167 Joinder re #163 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Barbara Barovsky. (Howard, Colin) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 166 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Colin E. Howard (Howard, Colin) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 165 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa re #164 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 164 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA filed by Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/24/2018. Replies due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 163 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Commission on Judicial Performance. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/21/2018. Replies due by 12/28/2018. (Devine, John) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 162 Declaration of Keith Laine in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byKeith Laine. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 161 Declaration of Merry Declue in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byMerry Declue. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 160 Declaration of Joanne Marino in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byJoanne Marino. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 159 Declaration of Ricky Marino in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byRicky Marino. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 158 Declaration of Alan DeClue in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byAlan Declue. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 157 Declaration of Debbie Laine in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byDebbie Laine. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 156 Declaration of Daniel Marino in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byDaniel Marino. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 155 Declaration of Daniel Huber in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byDaniel Huber. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 154 Declaration of Joshua Laine in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byJoshua Laine. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 153 Declaration of Jeremy Laine in Support of #152 Amended Complaint filed byJeremy Laine. (Related document(s) #152 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 152 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Administrative Office of the Courts of Alameda County, Administrative Office of the Courts of Contra Costa County, Alameda County Department of Child Support Services, Barbara Barovsky, Christopher Bowen, Cynthia Campanile, Jason Clay, Commission on Judicial Performance, Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Alameda, County of Contra Costa, Valerie Declue, Vickie Dutton, Chad Finke, Robyn Ginney, Boydine Hall, Cheryl Hicks, Martin Hoshino, Anne Howell, Shannon Jones, Judicial Council, John Kincaid, John Laettner, Law Offices fo Cristin Lowe, Law Offices of Cheryl Hicks, Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Cristin Loew, Stephen Nash, Matthew Oliveri, Oliveri Law LLP, Gregory Oravetz, Melissa Oravetz, Sarah Schulze, Shannon Jones Law Group, Gregory Silva, State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Rinda Topel, Nancy Young. Filed byDebbie Laine, Joshua Laine, Ricky Marino, Joanne Marino, Jeremy Laine, Daniel Marino, Austin Marino, Jared Laine, Poppy Laine. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Philip Fickes (Fickes, Mark) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 150 USCA Case Number 18-17076 9th Circuit for #131 Notice of Appeal, filed by Poppy Laine, Joanne Marino, Debbie Laine, Merry Declue, Ricky Marino, Daniel Marino, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Austin Marino, Jeremy Laine, Alan Declue, Danica Declue, Joshua Laine, Jared Laine. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re Dkt. No. #132 . Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/9/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2018 Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Kincaid re #147 Notice (Other), Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE by John Kincaid re #132 MOTION, #136 Opposition/Response to Motion, #137 Opposition/Response to Motion, #135 Opposition/Response to Motion, of Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 146 Joinder in Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration by Rinda Topel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 145 AFFIDAVIT re #143 Joinder, #144 Joinder Certificate of Service by Matthew Oliveri, Oliveri Law LLP. (Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 144 Joinder in Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration by Matthew Oliveri. (Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 143 Joinder in Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration by Oliveri Law LLP. (Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 142 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #132 MOTION ) Notice of Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiffs' F.R.C.P. Rule 60 Motion for Reconsideration filed byRobyn Ginney, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Gregory Oravetz, Melissa Oravetz, Sarah Schulze, Gregory Silva. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 141 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #132 MOTION ) Plaintiffs Motion for Relief to Set Aside Orders Pursuant to FRCP Rule 60; Proof of Service filed byCounty of Alameda. (Widen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles re #138 Opposition/Response to Motion, Defendant California Department of Motor Vehicles' Reply to Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P., Rule 60 Motion (Beatty, Christopher) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 139 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #132 MOTION ) SHANNON B. JONES AND SHANNON B. JONES LAW GROUP, INC.'S JOINDER IN CAMPANILE DEFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RELIEF TO SET ASIDE ORDERS PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 60 filed byShannon Jones, Shannon Jones Law Group. (Fine, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 138 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #132 MOTION ) Defendant California Department of Motor Vehicles' Reply to Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P., Rule 60 Motion filed byState of California Department of Motor Vehicles. (Beatty, Christopher) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 137 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #132 MOTION ) filed byAdministrative Office of the Courts of Alameda County, Administrative Office of the Courts of Contra Costa County, Jason Clay, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 136 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #132 MOTION ) (Defendant County of Contra Costa and Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration) filed byContra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa. (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 135 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #132 MOTION ) FOR RELIEF TO SET ASIDE ORDERS PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 60 filed byCynthia Campanile, Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alan Declue, Danica Declue, Merry Declue, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Debbie Laine, Jared Laine, Joshua Laine, Poppy Laine, Jeremy Laine, Austin Marino, Daniel Marino, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino re #133 Declaration in Support, #132 MOTION (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 133 Declaration filed byAlan Declue, Danica Declue, Merry Declue, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Debbie Laine, Jared Laine, Joshua Laine, Poppy Laine, Jeremy Laine, Austin Marino, Daniel Marino, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION for Relief to Set Aside Orders Pursuant to FRCP Rule 60 filed by Alan Declue, Danica Declue, Merry Declue, Valerie Declue, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Debbie Laine, Jared Laine, Joshua Laine, Poppy Laine, Jeremy Laine, Austin Marino, Daniel Marino, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2018 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/5/2018. Replies due by 11/13/2018. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Alan Declue, Danica Declue, Merry Declue, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Debbie Laine, Jared Laine, Joshua Laine, Poppy Laine, Jeremy Laine, Austin Marino, Daniel Marino, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino. Appeal of Order, #128 , Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings #127 (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 34611137631.) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joshua Laine, and #3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Joshua Laine. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #20 Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint due 10/22/2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 126 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND TO STRIKE UNDER CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. SECTION 425.16; JOINDER IN OTHER DEFENDANTS ARGUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Rinda Topel. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/12/2018. Replies due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 130 MOTION to Strike #122 Reply to Opposition/Response, #124 Reply to Opposition/Response, #121 Reply to Opposition/Response, #123 Reply to Opposition/Response, #125 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Alan Declue, Danica Declue, Merry Declue, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Debbie Laine, Jared Laine, Joshua Laine, Poppy Laine, Jeremy Laine, Austin Marino, Daniel Marino, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/11/2018. Replies due by 10/18/2018. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Laine re #122 Reply to Opposition/Response, #124 Reply to Opposition/Response, #121 Reply to Opposition/Response, #123 Reply to Opposition/Response, #125 Reply to Opposition/Response (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 125 REPLY (re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6) ) Re: Non-Opposition filed byJohn Kincaid. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 124 REPLY (re #51 First MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint,,,, Special Motion to Strike ) in Support of Special Motion to Strike filed byGregory Oravetz, Melissa Oravetz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 123 REPLY (re #50 First MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint,,,, Special Motion to Strike ) in Support of Special Motion to Strike filed byRobyn Ginney, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Sarah Schulze, Gregory Silva. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 122 REPLY (re #49 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) in Support of Motion to Dismiss (FRCp Rule 12(b)(1)(6) filed byGregory Oravetz, Melissa Oravetz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 121 REPLY (re #48 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) in Support of Motion to Dismiss (FRCp Rule 12(b)(1)(6) filed byRobyn Ginney, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Sarah Schulze, Gregory Silva. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 118 Request for Judicial Notice re #32 MOTION to Strike Under FRCP 12(f) and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Civ Proc. Code Sec. 425.16; Motion for Attorney's Fees, #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byBarbara Barovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #32 , #26 , #38 ) (Weber, Howard) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 117 Joinder re #56 Notice (Other) of Defendant John Kincaid's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Barbara Barovsky. (Weber, Howard) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 116 REPLY (re #38 MOTION to Dismiss ) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION filed byBarbara Barovsky. (Weber, Howard) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 115 REPLY (re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION filed byBarbara Barovsky. (Weber, Howard) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 114 REPLY (re #52 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byLaw Offices fo Cristin Lowe, Cristin Loew. (Everson, Janet) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 120 Declaration of Joshua Laine & Each Plaintiff in Support of #119 Reply to Opposition filed byAlan Declue, Danica Declue, Merry Declue, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Debbie Laine, Jared Laine, Joshua Laine, Poppy Laine, Jeremy Laine, Austin Marino, Daniel Marino, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino. (Related document(s) #119 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 119 REPLY (re #62 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), #47 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #32 MOTION to Strike Under FRCP 12(f) and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Civ Proc. Code Sec. 425.16; Motion for Attorney's Fees, #76 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Matthew Oliveri Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) and FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #69 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion by Defendants County of Alameda, Alameda County Department of Child Support Services and Anne Howell, #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6), #38 MOTION to Dismiss , #52 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #50 First MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint,,,, Special Motion to Strike, #89 MOTION to Dismiss, #75 MOTION to Dismiss, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Purusuant to FRCP Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #54 MOTION to Dismiss , #48 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #74 MOTION to Dismiss , #77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #49 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #51 First MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint,,,, Special Motion to Strike ) filed byAlan Declue, Danica Declue, Merry Declue, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Debbie Laine, Jared Laine, Joshua Laine, Poppy Laine, Jeremy Laine, Austin Marino, Daniel Marino, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Oliveri, Oliveri Law LLP re #62 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), #76 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Matthew Oliveri Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) and FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) (Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia Campanile re #111 Reply to Opposition/Response re: Campanile Defendants' Motion to Strike (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 111 REPLY (re #32 MOTION to Strike Under FRCP 12(f) and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Civ Proc. Code Sec. 425.16; Motion for Attorney's Fees ) filed byCynthia Campanile. (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia Campanile re #109 Reply to Opposition/Response to Campanile Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 109 REPLY (re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Purusuant to FRCP Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) ) filed byCynthia Campanile. (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 108 REPLY (re #38 MOTION to Dismiss ) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byShannon Jones, Shannon Jones Law Group. (Fine, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Daniel Fine (Fine, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Delphine S. Adams (Adams, Delphine) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Clay, County of Alameda, County of Contra Costa, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young re #104 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 104 REPLY (re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) filed byJason Clay, County of Alameda, County of Contra Costa, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 21, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 94 CLERK'S NOTICE The Court will take the Motion For Preliminary Injunction under submission without oral argument. The hearing date has been vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCounty of Alameda, Anne Howell. (Widen, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byContra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa. (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 91 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCynthia Campanile. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 90 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byJason Clay, County of Alameda, County of Contra Costa, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles re #87 Opposition/Response to Motion, Amendment to Declaration of Service (Beatty, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 87 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) Defendant California Department of Motor Vehicles' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time on Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California Department of Motor Vehicles. (Beatty, Christopher) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 103 Declaration of Joanne Marino in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJoanne Marino. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 102 Declaration of Daniel Marino in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byDaniel Marino. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 101 Declaration of Ricky Marino in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byRicky Marino. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 100 Declaration of Jeremy Laine in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJeremy Laine. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 99 Declaration of Debbie Laine in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byDebbie Laine. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 98 Declaration of Keith Laine in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJoshua Laine. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 97 Declaration of Merry DeClue in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byMerry Declue. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 96 Declaration of Alan DeClue in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byAlan Declue. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 95 Declaration of Daniel Huber in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byDaniel Huber. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Laine re #85 Proposed Order, #84 Declaration in Support, #82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #83 Memorandum in Support, #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 85 Proposed Order re #82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joshua Laine. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 84 Declaration of Joshua Laine in Support of #82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJoshua Laine. (Related document(s) #82 , #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Support re #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJoshua Laine. (Related document(s) #81 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 82 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joshua Laine. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/1/2018. Replies due by 10/9/2018. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 81 Ex Parte Application for an Emergency Hearing for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Joshua Laine. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/1/2018. Replies due by 10/9/2018. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) Modified on 9/18/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. Defendants' request for a two-day extension to file a motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 68, is granted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/14/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia Campanile re #78 Joinder, (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 78 Joinder re #65 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant DMV Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Cynthia Campanile. (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles . Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/28/2018. Replies due by 10/5/2018. (Beatty, Christopher) (Filed on 9/14/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).*** TEXT MODIFIED PER FILERS REQUEST. ***
September 13, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Matthew Oliveri Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) and FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Matthew Oliveri. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/27/2018. Replies due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Mathew Oliveri's Motion to Dismiss Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) and FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6))(Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cheryl Hicks, Law Offices of Cheryl Hicks. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/27/2018. Replies due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edson, Mark) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cheryl Hicks, Law Offices of Cheryl Hicks. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/26/2018. Replies due by 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edson, Mark) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #54 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Alameda re #69 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion by Defendants County of Alameda, Alameda County Department of Child Support Services and Anne Howell (Widen, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 71 Proposed Order re #69 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion by Defendants County of Alameda, Alameda County Department of Child Support Services and Anne Howell by County of Alameda. (Widen, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 70 Request for Judicial Notice re #69 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion by Defendants County of Alameda, Alameda County Department of Child Support Services and Anne Howell filed byCounty of Alameda. (Related document(s) #69 ) (Widen, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion by Defendants County of Alameda, Alameda County Department of Child Support Services and Anne Howell filed by County of Alameda. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/25/2018. Replies due by 10/2/2018. (Widen, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANTS CRISTIN LOWE AND THE LAW OFFICE OF CRISTIN LOWE filed by Law Offices fo Cristin Lowe, Cristin Loew. (Attachments: #1 Supplement MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANTS CRISTIN LOWE AND THE LAW OFFICE OF CRISTIN LOWE, #2 Proposed Order)(Everson, Janet) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 67 Proposed Order re #65 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant DMV Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Proposed Order Granting DMV's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles . (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Beatty, Christopher) (Filed on 9/11/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).*** TEXT MODIFIED PER FILERS REQUEST. ***
September 11, 2018 Filing 66 Proposed Order re #55 Request for Judicial Notice, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [55-4] by Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant DMV Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles . Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/25/2018. Replies due by 10/2/2018. (Beatty, Christopher) (Filed on 9/11/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).*** TEXT MODIFIED PER FILERS REQUEST. ***
September 11, 2018 Filing 64 Renotice motion hearing re #54 MOTION to Dismiss filed byContra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa re #55 Request for Judicial Notice, #54 MOTION to Dismiss , #53 Notice (Other), (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #75 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Vickie Dutton. Responses due by 9/24/2018. Replies due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Oliveri Law LLP. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/24/2018. Replies due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT OLIVERI LAW, LLPS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6))(Cannata, Therese) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Kincaid re #56 Notice (Other), #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6), #59 Request for Judicial Notice, #60 Proposed Order, (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 60 Proposed Order re #56 Notice (Other), #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6), #59 Request for Judicial Notice, #20 Amended Complaint,,,, by John Kincaid. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 59 Request for Judicial Notice re #56 Notice (Other), #58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6), #20 Amended Complaint,,,, in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byJohn Kincaid. (Related document(s) #56 , #58 , #20 ) (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6) filed by John Kincaid. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/24/2018. Replies due by 10/1/2018. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Joinder in the Lowe Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Cynthia Campanile. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE by John Kincaid re #20 Amended Complaint,,,, Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6) (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 55 Request for Judicial Notice re #54 MOTION to Dismiss filed byContra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/24/2018. Replies due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE by Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Contra Costa re #20 Amended Complaint,,,, NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA AND CONTRA COSTA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (Mauck, Jason) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Law Offices fo Cristin Lowe, Cristin Loew. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/21/2018. Replies due by 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Everson, Janet) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 51 First MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint,,,, Special Motion to Strike filed by Gregory Oravetz, Melissa Oravetz. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/20/2018. Replies due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 50 First MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint,,,, Special Motion to Strike filed by Robyn Ginney, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Sarah Schulze, Gregory Silva. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/20/2018. Replies due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Robyn Ginney, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 49 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gregory Oravetz, Melissa Oravetz. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/20/2018. Replies due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 48 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robyn Ginney, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Sarah Schulze, Gregory Silva. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/20/2018. Replies due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Mires, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Commission on Judicial Performance. Responses due by 10/4/2018. Replies due by 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Devine, John) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE by Barbara Barovsky NOTICE OF ADDITION OF COUNSEL (Howard, Colin) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 45 Joinder re #32 MOTION to Strike Under FRCP 12(f) and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Civ Proc. Code Sec. 425.16; Motion for Attorney's Fees by Barbara Barovsky. (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 44 Joinder re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Purusuant to FRCP Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Barbara Barovsky. (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 43 Joinder re #38 MOTION to Dismiss by Barbara Barovsky. (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 42 Joinder re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Barbara Barovsky. (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Reuben B. Jacobson and Howard R. Weber (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #38 MOTION to Dismiss , #32 MOTION to Strike Under FRCP 12(f) and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Civ Proc. Code Sec. 425.16; Motion for Attorney's Fees, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Purusuant to FRCP Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 39 CROSSCLAIM against Daniel Huber. Filed byShannon Jones Law Group, Shannon Jones. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shannon Jones, Shannon Jones Law Group. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/18/2018. Replies due by 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion to Dismiss)(Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 37 FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-12650466). (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia Campanile re #30 Brief, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Purusuant to FRCP Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia Campanile re #32 MOTION to Strike Under FRCP 12(f) and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Civ Proc. Code Sec. 425.16; Motion for Attorney's Fees, #33 Declaration in Support, #34 Request for Judicial Notice, (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 34 Request for Judicial Notice re #32 MOTION to Strike Under FRCP 12(f) and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Civ Proc. Code Sec. 425.16; Motion for Attorney's Fees, #33 Declaration in Support, filed byCynthia Campanile. (Related document(s) #32 , #33 ) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 33 Declaration of Nathaniel R. Lucey in Support of #32 MOTION to Strike Under FRCP 12(f) and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Civ Proc. Code Sec. 425.16; Motion for Attorney's Fees filed byCynthia Campanile. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike Under FRCP 12(f) and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Civ Proc. Code Sec. 425.16; Motion for Attorney's Fees filed by Cynthia Campanile. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/21/2018. Replies due by 9/28/2018. (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia Campanile re #30 Brief, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Purusuant to FRCP Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 30 Brief re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Purusuant to FRCP Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion filed byCynthia Campanile. (Related document(s) #29 ) (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Purusuant to FRCP Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Cynthia Campanile. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/21/2018. Replies due by 9/28/2018. (Lucey, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 28 Request for Judicial Notice re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byJason Clay, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 27 Brief re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion To Dismiss filed byJason Clay, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Jason Clay, Chad Finke, Boydine Hall, Martin Hoshino, John Laettner, Stephen Nash, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Nancy Young. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/18/2018. Replies due by 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 25 Declaration of Lailoma Ghafoori in Support of Process Serving #23 Summons Returned Executed, #24 Summons Returned Executed, filed byPlaintiffs. (Related document(s) #23 , #24 ) (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merry Declue, Joshua Laine, Grace Huber, Ricky Marino, Joanne Marino, Daniel Huber, Alan Declue, Jeremy Laine, Daniel Marino, Austin Marino, Danica Declue, Jared Laine, Poppy Laine. Cheryl Hicks served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018; Law Offices of Cheryl Hicks served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Marino, Joanne Marino, Daniel Marino. Valerie Declue served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018; Rinda Topel served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merry Declue, Debbie Laine, Joshua Laine, Stephen Nash, Grace Huber, Ricky Marino, Joanne Marino, Daniel Huber, Alan Declue, Jeremy Laine, Daniel Marino, Danica Declue, Jared Laine, Poppy Laine. Stephen Nash served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Administrative Office of the Courts of Alameda County served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Administrative Office of the Courts of Contra Costa County served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018; Alameda County Department of Child Support Services served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018; Barbara Barovsky served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018; Christopher Bowen served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Cynthia Campanile served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018; Jason Clay served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018; Commission on Judicial Performance served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018; Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; County of Alameda served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018; County of Contra Costa served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Vickie Dutton served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Chad Finke served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018; Robyn Ginney served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018; Boydine Hall served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018; Anne Howell served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018; Shannon Jones served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018; Judicial Council served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018; John Kincaid served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; John Laettner served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Law Offices fo Cristin Lowe served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018; Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018; Law Ofices of Silva and Associates served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018; Cristin Loew served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018; Matthew Oliveri served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; Oliveri Law LLP served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Gregory Oravetz served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018; Melissa Oravetz served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Sarah Schulze served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018; Shannon Jones Law Group served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018; Gregory Silva served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018; State of California Department of Motor Vehicles served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018; Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018; Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Gregory Syren served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018; Nancy Young served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Administrative Office of the Courts of Alameda County, Administrative Office of the Courts of Contra Costa County, Alameda County Department of Child Support Services, Barbara Barovsky, Christopher Bowen, Cynthia Campanile, Jason Clay, Commission on Judicial Performance, Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services, County of Alameda, County of Contra Costa, Valerie Declue, Vickie Dutton, Chad Finke, Robyn Ginney, Boydine Hall, Cheryl Hicks, Martin Hoshino, Anne Howell, Judicial Council, John Laettner, Law Offices fo Cristin Lowe, Law Offices of Cheryl Hicks, Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile, Law Ofices of Silva and Associates, Cristin Loew, Stephen Nash, Matthew Oliveri, Oliveri Law LLP, Gregory Oravetz, Melissa Oravetz, Sarah Schulze, Gregory Silva, State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice, Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center, Gregory Syren, Rinda Topel, Nancy Young, Shannon Jones Law Group, Shannon Jones, John Kincaid. Filed byJoshua Laine. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 19 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 34611135597. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to re #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by Poppy Laine, Joanne Marino, Debbie Laine, Merry Declue, Ricky Marino, Daniel Marino, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Austin Marino, Jeremy Laine, Alan Declue, Danica Declue, Joshua Laine, by Alan Declue, Danica Declue, Merry Declue, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Debbie Laine, Jared Laine, Joshua Laine, Poppy Laine, Jeremy Laine, Austin Marino, Daniel Marino, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2018.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/24/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by Poppy Laine, Joanne Marino, Debbie Laine, Merry Declue, Ricky Marino, Daniel Marino, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Austin Marino, Jeremy Laine, Alan Declue, Danica Declue, Joshua Laine, Jared Laine, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joshua Laine, #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by Poppy Laine, Joanne Marino, Debbie Laine, Merry Declue, Ricky Marino, Daniel Marino, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Austin Marino, Jeremy Laine, Alan Declue, Danica Declue, Joshua Laine, Objections due by 8/3/2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint and #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Objections due by August 3, 2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 20, 2018. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 7/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 12 (****DISREGARD-DOCUMENT POSTED IS IN ERROR-DISREGARD****) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018) Modified on 7/19/2018 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2018 Filing 11 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joshua Laine. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 8 Declaration of Aaron Hill in Support of #1 Complaint, filed by Joshua Laine. (Related document(s) #1 ) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 7 Declaration of Daniel Huber in Support of #1 Complaint, filed by Daniel Huber. (Related document(s) #1 ) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 Declaration of Daniel Marino in Support of #1 Complaint, filed byDaniel Marino. (Related document(s) #1 ) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of Alan Declue in Support of #1 Complaint, filed byAlan Declue. (Related document(s) #1 ) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Declaration of Joshua Laine in Support of #1 Complaint, filed byAlan Declue, Danica Declue, Merry Declue, Daniel Huber, Grace Huber, Jared Laine, Joshua Laine, Poppy Laine, Jeremy Laine, Austin Marino, Daniel Marino, Joanne Marino, Ricky Marino. (Related document(s) #1 ) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Joshua Laine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joshua Laine. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Merry Declue, Debbie Laine, Joshua Laine, Grace Huber, Ricky Marino, Joanne Marino, Daniel Huber, Alan Declue, Jeremy Laine, Daniel Marino, Austin Marino, Danica Declue, Jared Laine, Poppy Laine. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laine et al v. Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Hicks
Represented By: Mark Perry Edson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judicial Council
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Barovsky
Represented By: Colin E. Howard
Represented By: Reuben B. Jacobson
Represented By: Howard Roy Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rinda Topel
Represented By: Therese Yvonne Cannata
Represented By: Mark Philip Fickes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hoshino
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Oravetz
Represented By: Geoffrey Allan Mires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Schulze
Represented By: Geoffrey Allan Mires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of Contra Costa County Spinetta Family Law Center
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Oliveri
Represented By: Therese Yvonne Cannata
Represented By: Mark Philip Fickes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices fo Cristin Lowe
Represented By: Janet Lynn Everson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Office of the Courts of Alameda County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristin Loew
Represented By: Janet Lynn Everson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Laettner
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Finke
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Silva
Represented By: Geoffrey Allan Mires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Howell
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Young
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Ginney
Represented By: Geoffrey Allan Mires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Nash
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Campanile
Represented By: Nathaniel R Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Ofices of Silva and Associates
Represented By: Geoffrey Allan Mires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Department of Child Support Services
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boydine Hall
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Cynthia Campanile
Represented By: Nathaniel R Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliveri Law LLP
Represented By: Therese Yvonne Cannata
Represented By: Mark Philip Fickes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles
Represented By: Christopher David Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Cheryl Hicks
Represented By: Mark Perry Edson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Department of Child Support Services
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Office of the Courts of Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of Alameda County Hayward Hall of Justice
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Jason Clay
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Syren
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Oravetz
Represented By: Geoffrey Allan Mires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Declue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commission on Judicial Performance
Represented By: John P. Devine
Represented By: Robert Stephen James Rogoyski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Represented By: Jason William Mauck
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kincaid
Represented By: Kathleen M Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Jones
Represented By: Shannon Ball Jones
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Fine
Represented By: Delphine S. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Jones Law Group
Represented By: Shannon Ball Jones
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Fine
Represented By: Delphine S. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poppy Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danica Declue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Declue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merry Declue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?