Sheets et al v. F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Sheets and Kristie Sheets
Defendant: F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd, Genentech, Inc. and Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv04565
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand; Responses due by 9/25/2018. Replies due by 10/2/2018. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #15 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Andrew Sheets, Kristie Sheets. (Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 ERRATA re #10 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Andrew Sheets, Kristie Sheets. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination. Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/2/2018. If consent or declination is not filed by 10/2/2018, this case will be automatically reassigned without further notice. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/4/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Sheets, Kristie Sheets.. (Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Andrew Sheets, Kristie Sheets. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 9/10/2018. Replies due by 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jesse Creed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case Back to State Court, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Proposed Order, #31 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #7 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (JOINT) TO EXTEND TIME PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 6(b) AND CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(b) filed by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. OF FILING OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. OF JUDGE LAPORTE'S STANDING ORDERS (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/27/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/10/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C SECTION 1441(b); (NO PROCESS); from Sonoma County Superior. Their case number is SCV-262710. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12548904). Filed byHoffmann-La Roche Inc., Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration A. Guney (Exhibits 1 - 4 attached), #3 Declaration Gerald Bohm)(Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 7/27/2018) Modified on 7/30/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheets et al v. F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd
Represented By: Michael F. Healy, Esq.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Weissenberger Emily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Michael F. Healy, Esq.
Represented By: Weissenberger Emily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Michael F. Healy, Esq.
Represented By: Weissenberger Emily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Sheets
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Represented By: Gregory Michael Sonstein,
Represented By: Jesse Max Creed
Represented By: Benjamin Israel Siminou
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Sheets
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Represented By: Gregory Michael Sonstein,
Represented By: Jesse Max Creed
Represented By: Benjamin Israel Siminou
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?