Perkins v. Quicken Loans Inc.
Plaintiff: Cecelia Anne Perkins
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv04901
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE RE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FACTORS. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KIM RICHMAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/31/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kim Richman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12640473.) filed by Cecelia Anne Perkins. (Richman, Kim) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quicken Loans Inc. (Raffetto, John) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 26, 2018 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Judge Alsup's standing orders may be downloaded via court's web page at: www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2018)
August 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DOUGLAS BLANKINSHIP PRO HAC VICE. By Judge William Alsup on 8/26/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12620672.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/23/2018 filed by Cecelia Anne Perkins. (Blankinship, Douglas) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #15 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/23/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12620672.) filed by Cecelia Anne Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blankinship, Douglas) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOSEPH F. YENOUSKAS PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/22/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN C. RAFFETTO PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/22/2018.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12612908.) filed by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Yenouskas, Joseph) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12612840.) filed by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Raffetto, John) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byQuicken Loans Inc.. (Brown, Brooks) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Alexandra Stoll (Stoll, Laura) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Quicken Loans Inc... (Brown, Brooks) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quicken Loans Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Brown, Brooks) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quicken Loans Inc. (No parent corporation or publicly held corporation owns 10 percent or more of the stock of Quicken Loans) (Brown, Brooks) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CIV03639. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12589103). Filed byQuicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Brooks) (Filed on 8/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Quicken Loans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: Brooks Russell Brown
Represented By: Laura Alexandra Stoll
Represented By: Joseph F. Yenouskas
Represented By: John C. Raffetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelia Anne Perkins
Represented By: Jaimie Mak
Represented By: Douglas Gregory Blankinship
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?