Corralejo et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Plaintiff: Tracey Trammell, Angel Corralejo, Kristine Lawless, Jainnon Hearn, Jacob Howze, Shaun Cheatham, Shelley Mauger, Vincent Davis, Benita Dersookias, Brenda Cantrell, Jacob Batten, Julien Moe, Deborah Schockley, Marcella Jacaruso, Brian Campbell, Michelle Anderson, Robin Wagner, Channell Lobato, Kia Wheeler, Rose Boyd Tolver, Eugene Jorski, Jamieka Lowe, Lisa Lyons, Margaret McClease, Alisa Fast, Margery Doyle, Brian Darland, Trent Johnson, Robert West, Kathi Vela, James Smith, Jr., Jonathan Martinez, Linda Woods, Brenda McGee, Angela Smith, Cheryl McPherson, Virginia Ayala-Garcia, Derrick Richardson, Alice Diebner, Smittie Peterson, Stephanie Nichols, Sueli Da Luz Serpa, Renee Ford-Thomas, Brenda Davies, Marlon Keller, Johnita Guidry, Ryan Henson, Michelle Preston, Crystal Welch, Suzanne Fudesco, Maria Petro, Tashina Jemes, Marva McLaughlin, Vincent Cordovano, Parvatie Sukhram, Darryl Hardin, Jacqueline Juliano, La'Tasha Graham, Connie Balch, Donald Carrillo, Rita Spencer, Leon Mettlier, Lanyetta Nole-DuPree, Marlene Freely-Carlton, Nina Cook, Charlotte Harper, Beverly Lawson, Vivian Lamb, Tonya Sliger, Twila Butler, Michael Kendle, Vickie Fulmer, Craig Vaccaro, Kenneth Kovein, Abrigale Worthy, Scott Cox, Susan McCammon, Ronald Labeaud, Marquita Embrey and Shirley Kirkpatrick
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05021
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Case e-transferred to the Northern District of Florida and opened as case# 3:18-cv-2062. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-23) IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLOE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2734 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING CASE, Motions terminated: #10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.. Signed by Judge Susan illston on 8/24/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/23/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 ERRATA re #4 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd... (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-568917. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-12601859). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/16/2018) Modified on 8/22/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corralejo et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Trammell
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Corralejo
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Lawless
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jainnon Hearn
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Howze
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Cheatham
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Mauger
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Davis
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita Dersookias
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Cantrell
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Batten
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julien Moe
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Schockley
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Jacaruso
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Campbell
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Anderson
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Wagner
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Channell Lobato
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kia Wheeler
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Boyd Tolver
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Jorski
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamieka Lowe
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lyons
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret McClease
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Fast
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margery Doyle
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Darland
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent Johnson
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert West
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathi Vela
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Martinez
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Woods
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda McGee
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Smith
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl McPherson
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Ayala-Garcia
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Richardson
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Diebner
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smittie Peterson
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Nichols
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sueli Da Luz Serpa
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Ford-Thomas
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Davies
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Keller
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnita Guidry
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Henson
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Preston
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Welch
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Fudesco
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Petro
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashina Jemes
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marva McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Cordovano
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parvatie Sukhram
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Hardin
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Juliano
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Tasha Graham
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Balch
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Carrillo
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Spencer
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Mettlier
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanyetta Nole-DuPree
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Freely-Carlton
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Cook
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Harper
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Lawson
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Lamb
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Sliger
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twila Butler
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kendle
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Fulmer
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Vaccaro
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kovein
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abrigale Worthy
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Cox
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan McCammon
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Labeaud
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquita Embrey
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Ryan Scott Gramacy
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Scott Gramacy
Represented By: Krista M. Enns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Ryan Scott Gramacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?