Patacsil v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Shortly after Google admitted that it tracks the location history of users even after they have turned off location services, this lawsuit was filed alleging that Google's practice violates California's Invasion of Privacy Act and the state's constitutional right to privacy.

Plaintiff: Napoleon Patacsil
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05062
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File , MOTION for Reconsideration re 113 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Aichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 128 Order granting 127 Stipulation Re Scheduling. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/24/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiffs to File Further Amended Complaint and for Google to Respond filed by Aichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 126 Order DENYING 120 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify the Court's Dismissal Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed byAichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 120 ) (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER SUBMITTING 120 MOTION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/18/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE by Leslie Lee, Stacy Smedley of Withdrawal of Ivy T. Ngo (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 122 REPLY (re 120 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Notice of Motion & Motion to Certify Order (ECF No. 113) for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b); Memorandum of Points & Authorities ) filed byAichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 121 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 120 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Notice of Motion & Motion to Certify Order (ECF No. 113) for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b); Memorandum of Points & Authorities ) filed byGoogle, LLC. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Notice of Motion & Motion to Certify Order (ECF No. 113) for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b); Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Aichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 119 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-21-19, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580; lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 114 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2020. (Related documents(s) 114 ) (las, ) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 118 Order granting 117 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 14, 2020. The Hearing set for January 16, 2020 is VACATED.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiffs to File Further Amended Complaint and Staying Discovery filed by Aichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Steven Sun (Sun, Christopher) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 115 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/21/19 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Google, LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 19, 2019 Filing 113 Order granting 87 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on December 19, 2019.Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by January 23, 2020 as to their constitutional and common law privacy claims. Plaintiffs may not add new causes of action or parties without a stipulation or order of the Court under Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to cure the deficiencies addressed in this Order will result in dismissal with prejudice.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/9/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing re 87 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint held on 11/21/2019. Oral argument held and the Court took the motion under submission. Court to issue order. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Sobol, Tina Wolfson,Theodore Maya, Melissa Gardner, Michael Levin-Gesunheit. Defendant Attorney: Benjamin Berkowitz, Christopher Sun. Total Time in Court:3:00-4:15pm(1Hr.15Mins.) Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Joint Stipulated Protective Order filed by Napoleon Patacsil. (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 108 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING TIME. Please take NOTICE that the Motion Hearing as to 87 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint set for 11/21/2019 is HEREBY RESET to 3:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
October 29, 2019 ***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF 107 Order: as to 87 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Continuing Hearing for 87 MOTION to Dismiss to 11/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 106 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARINGS. Motion 87 to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Complaint Hearing previously set for 10/3/2019 is CONTINUED to 11/7/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 10/24/2019 is CONTINUED to 1/16/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE by Google, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Benedict Y. Hur (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Tina Wolfson (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 103 RESPONSE re 99 Request for Judicial Notice, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Google's Reply Brief by Aichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION for Leave to File Two Exhibits with Joint Discovery Statement 97 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATED ORDER RE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION 96 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 100 REPLY (re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint ) In Support of Request for Judicial Notice [Dkt. 88] filed byGoogle, LLC. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 99 Request for Judicial Notice re 98 Reply to Opposition/Response (Supplemental) filed byGoogle, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bright Y. Kellogg ISO of Supplemental RJN, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Related document(s) 98 ) (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 98 REPLY (re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint ) filed byGoogle, LLC. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE TWO EXHIBITS WITH JOINT DISCOVERY STATEMENT filed by Aichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Aichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Benedict Y. Hur (Notice of Withdrawal of Kathryn Bowen) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 94 OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES 88 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLES MOTION TO DISMISS -- WITH RESPECT TO EXHIBIT NO. 1 ONLY by Aichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 7/2/2019) Modified on 7/3/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2019 Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT filed byAichi Ali, Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER APPROVAL re 91 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Fredrick Davis. Plaintiff Fredrick Davis ONLY is dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/27/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fredrick Davis (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 90 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Motion Hearing as to 87 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint previously set for 9/5/2019 is HEREBY CONTINUED to 10/3/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 89 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 6/13/2019 is HEREBY RESET for 10/24/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 88 Request for Judicial Notice re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint filed byGoogle, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Exhibit 1-6 to the Declaration of Christina Lee)(Related document(s) 87 ) (Lee, Christina) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint filed by Google, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/2/2019. Replies due by 7/30/2019. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 86 Order Granting 85 Stipulation to Extend Time Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/22/2019. Defendant's Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss is due by 7/30/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Defendants Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by Google, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ben Berkowitz)(Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 14, 2019 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF 84 Order: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 84 Order Granting 83 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/14/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Google, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benedict Y. Hur in Support of Stipulation to Continue CMC)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 82 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2019 is HEREBY CONTINUED to 5/23/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 81 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Initial Case Management Statement. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 80 Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Google, LLC. Filed by Richard Dixon, Napoleon Patacsil, Aichi Ali, Mahon Nurudaaym, Mark Carson, Najat Oshana. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits and Exhibits 1-51)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2019) Modified on 4/30/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 79 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Aichi Ali (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 78 Order Denying 74 Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 77 Declaration of Tina Wolfson in Support of 76 Opposition/Response to Motion to Continue Case Management Conference filed byAichi Ali, Napoleon Patacsil. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 76 ) (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 76 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 74 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Case Management Conference, et al. ) filed byAichi Ali, Napoleon Patacsil. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 74 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Case Management Conference, et al. filed by Alphabet Inc., Google, LLC, XXVI Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathryn Bowen, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 73 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/28/2019, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2019. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 54 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; Denying 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying 53 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Denying 55 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Denying 56 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/28/2019 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Alphabet Inc., Google, LLC, XXVI Holdings, Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bowen, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila. Hearing held on 3/28/2019 re: Motions for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel 52 , 53 , 54 , 55 , 56 . Court takes motions under submission. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Melissa Emerit, Andrew Brown, Michael Sobol, Hank Bates, Tina Wolfson, Rosemary Rivas, Paul Wood. Attorneys for Defendants: Ben Berkowitz, Kathryn Bower. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Total Time in Court: 50 minutes. Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE by Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil of Withdrawal of Counsel (Abbye R. Klamann) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Paul R. Wood, Counsel for Leslie Lee, Stacy Smedley, Fredrick Davis. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/12/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13164997.) filed by Fredrick Davis, Leslie Lee, Stacy Smedley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate)(Wood, Paul) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the deadline for Joint Case Management Statement is NOW due by 5/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 5/16/2019 is HEREBY ADVANCED AND RESET for 5/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 20, 2019 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF 65 Order: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Regarding 63 Administrative Motion to Continue Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila. The Case Management Conference currently set for 3/28/2019 is CONTINUED until 5/16/2019. The Parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than 5/6/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 64 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 63 MOTION to Continue (Administrative Motion) Case Management Conference ) filed byAichi Ali. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Continue (Administrative Motion) Case Management Conference filed by Alphabet Inc., Google, LLC, XXVI Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Christina Lee, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE by Google, LLC, XXVI Holdings, Inc., Alphabet Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 61 REPLY (re 56 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) to Defendants Omnibus Response to Plaintiffs Motions to Appoint Interim Counsel filed byFredrick Davis, Leslie Lee, Stacy Smedley. (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY (re 55 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTMENT OF ROSEMARY M. RIVAS OF LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP AS INTERIM COUNSEL filed byGeorge Jack. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 59 REPLY (re 54 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel and to Appoint Michael Sobol, Hank Bates, and Tina Wolfson as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, and for entry of Case Management Order, ) filed byMark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 27, 2018 Filing 58 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 55 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 53 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 56 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , 54 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel and to Appoint Michael Sobol, Hank Bates, and Tina Wolfson as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, and for entry of Case Management Order, ) filed byGoogle, LLC. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Lee (Lee, Christina) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 ***Set Motion on Calendar as to 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel Plaintiff Ronnie Kaufman. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Fredrick Davis, Leslie Lee, Stacy Smedley. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ivy T. Ngo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Declaration of Leslie Lee, # 4 Declaration of Stacy Smedley, # 5 Proposed Order)(Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by George Jack. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas with Exhibits A & B, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel and to Appoint Michael Sobol, Hank Bates, and Tina Wolfson as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, and for entry of Case Management Order, filed by Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Sobol and Exhibit 1, # 2 Declaration of Hank Bates and Exhibit 1, # 3 Declaration of Tina Wolfson and Exhibit 1, # 4 Proposed Pre-Trial Order No. 1)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Domenic Lombardo. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew J. Brown in Support, # 2 Declaration of Thomas J. Brandi in Support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Brown, Andrew) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ronnie Kaufman. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa R. Emert, # 2 Declaration of Ronnie Kaufman, # 3 Proposed Order)(Emert, Melissa) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 51 Order granting (50) Stipulation in case 5:18-cv-05062-EJD (*modified). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/11/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-05062-EJD, 5:18-cv-05288-EJD, 5:18-cv-06262-EJD, 5:18-cv-06416-EJD, 5:18-cv-06652-EJD, 5:18-cv-06685-EJD(ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Cases filed by Google, LLC. (Gorman, Thomas) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Administrative Motion Related Case to 18-cv-06685-NC. It is hereby ordered that Case 5:18-cv-05062-EJD is hereby related to case 5:18-cv-06685-NC and such case shall be reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/5/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 48 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Mark Carson, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym, Najat Oshana, Napoleon Patacsil. Responses due by 11/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Kaufman v. Google LLC et al. Complaint, # 2 Declaration of Michael W. Sobol, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google, LLC. Filed byNapoleon Patacsil, Mark Carson, Najat Oshana, Richard Dixon, Mahon Nurudaaym. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits 1-32, # 2 Exhibits 1-16, # 3 Exhibits 17-32)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 43 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases. It is hereby ordered that Case 5:18-cv-05062-EJD Patacsil v Google, LLC is related to cases 5:18-cv-06416-NC Lee v Google, Inc. AND 5:18-cv-06652-NC, and such cases shall be reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/13/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 45 Statement of Non-Opposition re 43 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Are Related and re 44 Unopposed MOTION to Relate Case filed byNapoleon Patacsil. (Related document(s) 43 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION to Relate Case PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 AND 7-11 filed by George Jack. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/6/2018) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2018 Filing 43 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Are Related filed by Leslie Lee, Stacy Smedley, Fredrick Davis. Responses due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 42 Order granting 41 Stipulation to change time on amended complaint and motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change Time on Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss filed by Google, LLC. (Gorman, Thomas) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Napoleon Patacsil (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RELATING CASE. It is hereby ordered that 5:18-cv-05062-EJD Patacsil v Google, Inc. is RELATED to 3:18-cv-06262-JST Ali v Google, Inc. and such case shall be reassigned to Judge Edward J Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/29/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 Stipulation and Order to Reflect name change 34 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/25/2018.(ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 11/29/2018 is HEREBY RESET for 2/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 35 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP re 3:18-cv-06262-JST Ali v. Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Reflect Name Change From Google Inc. To Google LLC filed by Google, Inc.. (Gorman, Thomas) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 33 Request for Judicial Notice re 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1A, # 3 Exhibit 1B, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Bowen, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 11/5/2018. Replies due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Elise Bowen (Bowen, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Gorman (Gorman, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Berkowitz (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Benedict Y Hur (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RELATING CASE case Lombardo v. Google, Inc., Case No. C18-cv-05288-LB be related to the first filed action, Patacsil v. Google, Inc., Case No. C18-cv-05062-EJD.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 25 Statement of Non-Opposition re 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate cases filed byNapoleon Patacsil. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ann Gardner (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION OF RESPONSE DEADLINE. Please take NOTICE that Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11(b) Responses due by 9/18/2018 as to 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate cases. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate cases filed by Domenic Lombardo. Responses due by 10/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Andrew) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 21 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 8/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Defendant Google LLC's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Napoleon Patacsil. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Napoleon Patacsil.. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Nicholas Diamand Pro Hac Vice 15 representing Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Nicholas Diamand ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12636188.) filed by Napoleon Patacsil. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of good standing)(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Napoleon Patacsil. Google, Inc. served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed. Re: 12 Certificate of Service filed by Napoleon Patacsil (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Napoleon Patacsil (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 Filing Error. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Napoleon Patacsil (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/24/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney David Slade Pro Hac Vice 9 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Allen Carney Pro Hac Vice 5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David Slade ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12612769.) filed by Napoleon Patacsil. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Slade, David) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Henry Bates, III (Bates, Joseph) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Allen Carney ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12608611.) filed by Napoleon Patacsil. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carney, Allen) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbye Rose Klamann (Klamann, Abbye) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12606124.). Filed byNapoleon Patacsil. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patacsil v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Napoleon Patacsil
Represented By: Abbye Rose Klamann
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?