Roberson v. Apple Inc
Plaintiff: Tyrone Roberson
Defendant: Unknown and Apple Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv05087
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
2 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 Letter dated 9/19/18 from Tyrone Roberson re service of summons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Funds in Prisoner's Account filed by Tyrone Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 Letter dated 8/27/18 from Tyrone Roberson. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tyrone Roberson. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Tyrone Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 29, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tyrone Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/27/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/27/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 9/27/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018) Modified on 8/21/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 Letter dated 8/9/18 from Tyrone Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018) Modified on 9/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson v. Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?